AMICA Mutual Insurance v. Frank et al
Plaintiff: AMICA Mutual Insurance
Defendant: SMR, Richard B. Frank an individual, as Trustee of the 64K Trust, dated the 15th of January, 2015 doing business as SMR and Sarah Frank
Case Number: 2:2020cv00706
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff AMICA Mutual Insurance, Defendants Richard B. Frank, Sarah Frank, SMR. Form due by 12/21/2020. (alf)
December 3, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Richard B. Frank, Sarah Frank, SMR. Attorney Landon A. Allred added to party Richard B. Frank(pty:dft), Attorney Landon A. Allred added to party Sarah Frank(pty:dft), Attorney Landon A. Allred added to party SMR(pty:dft)(Allred, Landon)
November 13, 2020 Filing 21 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMICA Mutual Insurance as to SMR served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (Turner, Folasade)
November 13, 2020 Filing 20 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMICA Mutual Insurance as to Sarah Frank served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (Turner, Folasade)
November 13, 2020 Filing 19 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMICA Mutual Insurance as to Richard B. Frank served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (Turner, Folasade)
November 13, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #13 , #14 , #15 and #16 Returns of Service. The documents were improperly filed. Please choose the event Summons Returned Executed. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (alf)
November 12, 2020 Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal Service served on Brandon Frank for SMR, LLC on 11/12/2020, filed by Plaintiff AMICA Mutual Insurance. (Turner, Folasade) Modified on 11/13/2020 stricken improperly filed, notce of deficiency sent(alf).
November 12, 2020 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal Service served on Brandon Frank for SMR, LLC as Trustee of 64K Trust on 11/12/2020, filed by Plaintiff AMICA Mutual Insurance. (Turner, Folasade) Modified on 11/13/2020 sticken improperly filed, notice of deficiency sent(alf).
November 12, 2020 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal Service served on Sarah Frank on 11/12/2020, filed by Plaintiff AMICA Mutual Insurance. (Turner, Folasade) Modified on 11/13/2020 - improperly filed, notice of deficiency sent (alf).
November 12, 2020 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal Service served on Richard B. Frank; Trustee on 11/12/2020, filed by Plaintiff AMICA Mutual Insurance. (Turner, Folasade) Modified on 11/13/2020 - stricken as improperly filed. Notice of deficiency sent (alf).
November 12, 2020 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal Service served on Richard B. Frank on 11/12/2020, filed by Plaintiff AMICA Mutual Insurance. (Turner, Folasade) Modified on 11/13/2020 - sticken as improperly filed. Notice of deficiency sent. (alf).
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to SMR as trustee. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Richard B. Frank as trustee. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to SMR. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Richard B. Frank. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Sarah Frank. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 10/14/20. (alf)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 EXHIBITS filed by AMICA Mutual Insurance re #2 Complaint,. (Schmid, Karmen)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 EXHIBITS filed by AMICA Mutual Insurance re #2 Complaint,. (Schmid, Karmen)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 EXHIBITS filed by AMICA Mutual Insurance re #2 Complaint,. (Schmid, Karmen)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 EXHIBITS filed by AMICA Mutual Insurance re #2 Complaint,. (Schmid, Karmen)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3752552) filed by AMICA Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Schmid, Karmen)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiff AMICA Mutual Insurance is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMICA Mutual Insurance v. Frank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMR
Represented By: Landon A. Allred
Represented By: Bruce R. Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard B. Frank an individual, as Trustee of the 64K Trust, dated the 15th of January, 2015 doing business as SMR
Represented By: Landon A. Allred
Represented By: Bruce R. Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Frank
Represented By: Landon A. Allred
Represented By: Bruce R. Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMICA Mutual Insurance
Represented By: Folasade A. Turner
Represented By: Karmen Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?