Cedar Mountain Environmental v. Secur LPT
Plaintiff: Cedar Mountain Environmental
Defendant: Secur LPT
Case Number: 2:2020cv00713
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Plaintiff Cedar Mountain Environmental, Defendant Secur LPT. (alf)
December 10, 2020 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Cedar Mountain Environmental. (alf)
December 4, 2020 Filing 10 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Secur LPT. (alf)
November 27, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Judd, C.)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Travis A. Knobbe for Secur LPT.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 11/25/20. (jwt)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Cedar Mountain Environmental, Defendant Secur LPT. Form due by 12/10/2020. (alf)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Travis A. Knobbe , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3809401,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Secur LPT. (Affleck, Adam)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S. Affleck on behalf of Secur LPT (Affleck, Adam)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/20/2020. (nl)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cedar Mountain Environmental as to Secur LPT Waiver sent on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (Judd, C.)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3757361) filed by Cedar Mountain Environmental. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Judd, C.)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiff Cedar Mountain Environmental is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cedar Mountain Environmental v. Secur LPT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedar Mountain Environmental
Represented By: Jeffrey Weston Shields
Represented By: C. Michael Judd
Represented By: Jon Colby Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secur LPT
Represented By: Adam S. Affleck
Represented By: Travis A. Knobbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?