Nielson v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Stacy Nielson
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00719
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
2 Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE AFFIRMING PRIOR ORDER OF REFERENCE re 14 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Orders of the prior judge are affirmed including the order of reference to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A). (alf)
December 10, 2020 Filing 16 Case Reassigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Judge Dee Benson no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/20/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 4/20/2021. Discovery due by 10/12/2021. Motions due by 11/8/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/28/2022 at 02:30 PM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. 4 Day Jury Trial set for 4/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 11/13/2020. (lnp)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 11/13/2020. (reb)
November 12, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mansfield, Robert)
November 5, 2020 Filing 12 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (alf)
November 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #5 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/22/20. (alf)
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 File Received from Third District Court, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Errata to Complaint, Return of Service, Notice of Removal, Exhibit to Notice of Removal and all applicable State Court Returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint Return of Electronic Notification, #3 Errata to Complaint, #4 Errata Return of Electronic Notification, #5 Return of Service, #6 Return of Service Return of Electronic Notification, #7 Notice of Removal, #8 Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification, #9 Exhibit to Notice of Removal, #10 Exhibit to Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification) (alf)
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Stacy Nielson. (nl)
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Plaintiff Stacy Nielson. Form due by 11/4/2020. (nl)
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company and Plaintiff Stacy Nielson. (dw)
October 19, 2020 Filing 3 Owners Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Barlow, Peter)
October 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 200905817, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BUTDC-3762248) filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Barlow, Peter) Modified on 10/22/2020 to correct state court case number (alf).
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nielson v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Nielson
Represented By: Megan E. Garrett
Represented By: Robert E. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter H. Barlow
Represented By: Karmen Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?