Oblad v. Parrish et al
Plaintiff: Brian Oblad
Defendant: Sean Reyes, Judge Dee Benson, SLC Metro Jail, Ted Stewart and Justice Jill N. Parrish
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 2:2020cv00732
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Fast Track of Deadlines, Motion to Schedule Preliminary Hearing filed by Plaintiff Brian Oblad. (dla)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Hearing Online Zoom or Webex Hearing Conference Call document transfer filed by Plaintiff Brian Oblad. (jwt)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Judge David Barlow recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 11/24/20. (jrj)
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of add important documents to case by Brian Oblad (jrj)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Hearing re Pretrial Conference filed by Plaintiff Brian Oblad. (jrj)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Judge Dee Benson recused. Case reassigned to Judge David Barlow for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 11/13/20. (jwt)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge Jill N. Parrish recused. Case reassigned to Judge Dee Benson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 11/13/20. (jwt)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 10/23/2020) filed by Plaintiff Brian Oblad. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oblad v. Parrish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Dee Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLC Metro Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice Jill N. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Oblad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?