American Family Insurance Company v. Salazar, Eric Estate of et al
Plaintiff: American Family Insurance Company
Defendant: Sergio Biasetti, Engineered Wall Systems, Tom Salazar, Jesus Fernando-Gutierrez, Mario Zapata, Randolph Rivera, Alan Torres-Flores, Rosanne Salazar, Salazar, Eric Estate of and Vladimir Laldez-Rincon
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Hector Centeno, Jose Marcano, Manuel Nery Morales and Gilberto Chirinos
3Rd Party Defendant: Ruben Urena
Case Number: 2:2020cv00734
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 47 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT As against Ruben Urena filed by Gilberto Chirinos, Jose Marcano, Hector Centeno, Manuel Nery Morales. (Acosta, Sylvia)
December 15, 2020 Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint For Interpleader filed by Manuel Nery Morales.(Acosta, Sylvia)
December 15, 2020 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint For Interpleader filed by Jose Marcano.(Acosta, Sylvia)
December 15, 2020 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint For Interpleader filed by Gilberto Chirinos.(Acosta, Sylvia)
December 15, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #40 #41 and #42 Answers to Complaint. The Answers need to have name of correct represented party at header and at signature line. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (alf)
December 15, 2020 ANSWER DEADLINE UPDATED per Certificate of Service #37 and #38 for Jesus Fernando-Gutierrez and Alan Torres-Flores: answer due 1/4/2021. (alf)
December 14, 2020 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint For Interpleader filed by Jose Marcano.(Acosta, Sylvia) Modified on 12/15/2020 - document improperly filed, Notice of Deficiency sent(alf).
December 14, 2020 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint For Interpleader filed by Manuel Nery Morales.(Acosta, Sylvia) Modified on 12/15/2020 - documents improperly filed, Notice of Deficiency sent (alf).
December 14, 2020 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint For Interpleader filed by Gilberto Chirinos.(Acosta, Sylvia) Modified on 12/15/2020 - document improperly filed, Notice of Deficiency sent (alf).
December 14, 2020 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint For Interpleader filed by Hector Centeno.(Acosta, Sylvia)
December 14, 2020 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Family Insurance Company re #23 Acknowledgment of Service Errata to Return of Service (Remkes, Nicholas)
December 14, 2020 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Family Insurance Company re #19 Acknowledgment of Service Errata to Return of Service (Remkes, Nicholas)
November 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated to 12/11/20 for All Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 11/28/20. (alf)
November 27, 2020 Filing 35 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendants Hector Centeno, Gilberto Chirinos, Jose Marcano, Manuel Nery Morales. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Stipulation To Extend Time To Respond to Complaint to Interpleader) Attorney Sylvia G. Acosta added to party Hector Centeno(pty:dft), Attorney Sylvia G. Acosta added to party Gilberto Chirinos(pty:dft), Attorney Sylvia G. Acosta added to party Jose Marcano(pty:dft), Attorney Sylvia G. Acosta added to party Manuel Nery Morales(pty:dft)(Acosta, Sylvia)
November 16, 2020 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint for Interpleader filed by Rosanne Salazar, Tom Salazar, Salazar, Eric Estate of. Attorney Trevor C. Sanders added to party Rosanne Salazar(pty:dft), Attorney Trevor C. Sanders added to party Tom Salazar(pty:dft), Attorney Trevor C. Sanders added to party Salazar, Eric Estate of(pty:dft)(Sanders, Trevor)
November 16, 2020 Filing 33 Randolph Rivera ANSWER to Complaint for Interpleader filed by Randolph Rivera. Attorney Michael A. Worel added to party Randolph Rivera(pty:dft)(Worel, Michael)
November 10, 2020 Filing 32 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Sergio Biasetti. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
November 10, 2020 Filing 31 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Mario Zapata. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
October 27, 2020 Filing 30 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Summons and Complaint Acknowledgment filed by American Family Insurance Company.Tom Salazar served on 10/26/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Remkes, Nicholas)
October 27, 2020 Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Summons and Complaint Acknowledgment filed by American Family Insurance Company.Sergio Biasetti served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Remkes, Nicholas)
October 27, 2020 Filing 28 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Summons and Complaint Acknowledgment filed by American Family Insurance Company.Randolph Rivera served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Remkes, Nicholas)
October 27, 2020 Filing 27 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Summons and Complaint Acknowledgment filed by American Family Insurance Company.Rosanne Salazar served on 10/26/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Remkes, Nicholas)
October 27, 2020 Filing 26 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Summons and Complaint Acknowledgment filed by American Family Insurance Company.Mario Zapata served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Remkes, Nicholas)
October 27, 2020 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Summons and Complaint Acknowledgment filed by American Family Insurance Company.Manuel Nery Morales served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Remkes, Nicholas)
October 27, 2020 Filing 24 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Summons and Complaint Acknowledgment filed by American Family Insurance Company.Jose Marcano served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Remkes, Nicholas)
October 27, 2020 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Summons and Complaint Acknowledgment filed by American Family Insurance Company.Jesus Fernando-Gutierrez served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Remkes, Nicholas)
October 27, 2020 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Summons and Complaint Acknowledgment filed by American Family Insurance Company.Hector Centeno served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Remkes, Nicholas)
October 27, 2020 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Summons and Complaint Acknowledgment filed by American Family Insurance Company.Gilberto Chirinos served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Remkes, Nicholas)
October 27, 2020 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Summons and Complaint Acknowledgment filed by American Family Insurance Company.Salazar, Eric Estate of served on 10/26/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Remkes, Nicholas)
October 27, 2020 Filing 19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Summons and Complaint Acknowledgment filed by American Family Insurance Company.Alan Torres-Flores served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Remkes, Nicholas)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/26/20. (alf)
October 26, 2020 Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Manuel Nery Morales. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Rosanne Salazar. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Tom Salazar. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Sergio Biasetti. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Vladimir Laldez-Rincon. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Randolph Rivera. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Mario Zapata. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jose Marcano. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jesus Fernando-Gutierrez. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Hector Centeno. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Gilberto Chirinos. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Salazar, Eric Estate of. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Engineered Wall Systems. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 Modification of Docket: Error: Summons was incorrectly filled out. Correction: Fixed Summons. re #3 Summons Issued Electronically. (jl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Alan Torres-Flores. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2020: #1 Corrected Summons) (jl).
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3770004) filed by American Family Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Remkes, Nicholas)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiff American Family Insurance Company is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Family Insurance Company v. Salazar, Eric Estate of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Biasetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Engineered Wall Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Salazar
Represented By: Trevor C. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Fernando-Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Zapata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph Rivera
Represented By: Michael A. Worel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Torres-Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosanne Salazar
Represented By: Trevor C. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salazar, Eric Estate of
Represented By: Trevor C. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vladimir Laldez-Rincon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Hector Centeno
Represented By: Sylvia G. Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Jose Marcano
Represented By: Sylvia G. Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Manuel Nery Morales
Represented By: Sylvia G. Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Gilberto Chirinos
Represented By: Sylvia G. Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristin A. VanOrman
Represented By: Nicholas R. Remkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Ruben Urena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?