Valles v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Petitioner: Andrew Valles
Respondent: Federal Bureau of Prisons, State of Utah and California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 2:2020cv00774
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew Valles re #6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement and petition (not yet filed). (alf)
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT/CASE STATUS UPDATE by Andrew Valles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(alf)
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement and other documents for Andrew Valles received from Correctional Institution (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(alf)
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 **SEALED DOCUMENT**Trust Account Withdrawal Authorization and History filed by Petitioner Andrew Valles. (kpf)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE re #2 Order Requesting certificate filed by Andrew Valles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request, #2 Exhibit Copy of Nef re: Order, #3 Envelope)(kpf)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 Case Reassigned to Judge David Barlow. Judge Dee Benson no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that within thirty days Petitioner must file a certificate from the warden or other appropriate officer of the place of confinement showing the amount of money or securities that the petitioner has in any account in the institution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 11/16/2020. (jl)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 11/02/2020). (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valles v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andrew Valles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?