Klein v. Egan et al
Plaintiff: Melvin Klein
Defendant: Brent Satterfield, Co-Diagnostics, Richard S. Serbin, Edward Murphy, Reed L. Benson, Eugene Durenard, James Nelson and Dwight H. Egan
Case Number: 2:2020cv00850
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Jared C Bennett
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Charles Claudio Simpkins for Reed L. Benson,Charles Claudio Simpkins for Co-Diagnostics,Charles Claudio Simpkins for Eugene Durenard,Charles Claudio Simpkins for Dwight H. Egan,Charles Claudio Simpkins for Edward Murphy,Charles Claudio Simpkins for James Nelson,Charles Claudio Simpkins for Brent Satterfield,Charles Claudio Simpkins for Richard S. Serbin.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 1/25/21. (jrj)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael D. Nacht for Reed L. Benson,Michael D. Nacht for Co-Diagnostics,Michael D. Nacht for Eugene Durenard,Michael D. Nacht for Dwight H. Egan,Michael D. Nacht for Edward Murphy,Michael D. Nacht for James Nelson,Michael D. Nacht for Brent Satterfield,Michael D. Nacht for Richard S. Serbin.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 1/11/21. (jrj)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher P. Milazzo for Reed L. Benson,Christopher P. Milazzo for Co-Diagnostics,Christopher P. Milazzo for Eugene Durenard,Christopher P. Milazzo for Dwight H. Egan,Christopher P. Milazzo for Edward Murphy,Christopher P. Milazzo for James Nelson,Christopher P. Milazzo for Brent Satterfield,Christopher P. Milazzo for Richard S. Serbin.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice.. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 1/11/21. (jrj)
January 8, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael David Nacht , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3869075,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Reed L. Benson, Co-Diagnostics, Eugene Durenard, Dwight H. Egan, Edward Murphy, James Nelson, Brent Satterfield, Richard S. Serbin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael David Nacht, #2 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Hancey, Ryan)
January 8, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher P. Milazzo , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3869074,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Reed L. Benson, Co-Diagnostics, Eugene Durenard, Dwight H. Egan, Edward Murphy, James Nelson, Brent Satterfield, Richard S. Serbin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Christopher P. Milazzo, #2 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Hancey, Ryan)
January 8, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles Claudio Simpkins , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3869065,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Reed L. Benson, Co-Diagnostics, Eugene Durenard, Dwight H. Egan, Edward Murphy, James Nelson, Brent Satterfield, Richard S. Serbin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Pro Hace Vice Admission of Charles Claudio Simpkins, #2 Exhibit Application for Pro Hace Vice Admission) Attorney Ryan B. Hancey added to party Co-Diagnostics(pty:dft)(Hancey, Ryan)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 1/8/21. (jrj)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 1/7/2021. (atk)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF STIPULATION - granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline updated for Co-Diagnostics answer due 2/8/2021. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 1/6/21. (jrj)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendants Reed L. Benson, Eugene Durenard, Dwight H. Egan, Edward Murphy, James Nelson, Brent Satterfield, Richard S. Serbin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer, #2 Exhibit Waiver of Service - James Nelson, #3 Exhibit Waiver of the Service of Summons - Richard Serbin)(Hancey, Ryan)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Joint #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline updated for Reed L. Benson answer due 2/8/2021; Eugene Durenard answer due 2/8/2021; Dwight H. Egan answer due 2/8/2021; Edward Murphy answer due 2/8/2021; James Nelson answer due 2/8/2021; Brent Satterfield answer due 2/8/2021; Richard S. Serbin answer due 2/8/2021. See Order for details. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 1/4/21. (jrj)
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendants Reed L. Benson, Eugene Durenard, Dwight H. Egan, Edward Murphy, James Nelson, Brent Satterfield, Richard S. Serbin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Join Motion for Approval of Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer, #2 Exhibit Waiver of the Service of Summons - Brent Satterfield, #3 Exhibit Waiver of the Service of Summons - Dwight Egan, #4 Exhibit Waiver of the Service of Summons - Edward Murphy, #5 Exhibit Waiver of the Service of Summons - Eugene Durenard, #6 Exhibit Waiver of the Service of Summons - James Nelson, #7 Exhibit Waiver of the Service of Summons - Reed Benson) Attorney Ryan B. Hancey added to party Reed L. Benson(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan B. Hancey added to party Eugene Durenard(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan B. Hancey added to party Dwight H. Egan(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan B. Hancey added to party Edward Murphy(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan B. Hancey added to party James Nelson(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan B. Hancey added to party Brent Satterfield(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan B. Hancey added to party Richard S. Serbin(pty:dft)(Hancey, Ryan)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melvin Klein as to Co-Diagnostics served on 12/4/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Greene, Jason)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Co-Diagnostics. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Thomas J. McKenna, for Plaintiff Melvin Klein (jl)
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3818506) filed by Melvin Klein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Barlow (Greene, Jason)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Barlow. Plaintiff Melvin Klein is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein v. Egan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Satterfield
Represented By: Michael D. Nacht
Represented By: Christopher P. Milazzo
Represented By: Charles Claudio Simpkins
Represented By: Ryan B. Hancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Co-Diagnostics
Represented By: Michael D. Nacht
Represented By: Christopher P. Milazzo
Represented By: Charles Claudio Simpkins
Represented By: Ryan B. Hancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Serbin
Represented By: Michael D. Nacht
Represented By: Christopher P. Milazzo
Represented By: Charles Claudio Simpkins
Represented By: Ryan B. Hancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Murphy
Represented By: Michael D. Nacht
Represented By: Christopher P. Milazzo
Represented By: Charles Claudio Simpkins
Represented By: Ryan B. Hancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed L. Benson
Represented By: Michael D. Nacht
Represented By: Christopher P. Milazzo
Represented By: Charles Claudio Simpkins
Represented By: Ryan B. Hancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Durenard
Represented By: Michael D. Nacht
Represented By: Christopher P. Milazzo
Represented By: Charles Claudio Simpkins
Represented By: Ryan B. Hancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Nelson
Represented By: Michael D. Nacht
Represented By: Christopher P. Milazzo
Represented By: Charles Claudio Simpkins
Represented By: Ryan B. Hancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight H. Egan
Represented By: Michael D. Nacht
Represented By: Christopher P. Milazzo
Represented By: Charles Claudio Simpkins
Represented By: Ryan B. Hancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Klein
Represented By: Jason E. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?