Mukantagara et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Ebenezer Shyaka and Agnes Mukantagara
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Andrew Lambrecht, Kin Ma, Mark Koumans and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 2:2020cv00897
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Referring Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 2/5/21. (dla)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 2/4/2021. (mjm)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Andrew Lambrecht. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Chad F. Wolf. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kin Ma. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Mark Koumans. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Modification of Docket: Error: Counsel filed complaint against plaintiff instead of defendant. Correction: Docket text has been modified to reflect complaint is filed against defendants rather than plaintiff; answer records corrected. re #2 Complaint. (dw)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Mark Koumans, Andrew Lambrecht, and Kin Ma (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3844627) filed by Agnes Mukantagara, Ebenezer Shyaka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachments 1 thru 8, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (Black, Daniel) Modified on 12/22/2020 to reflect complaint is filed against defendants rather than plaintiff; answer records corrected (dw).
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Plaintiffs Agnes Mukantagara and Ebenezer Shyaka are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mukantagara et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kin Ma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Koumans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebenezer Shyaka
Represented By: Adam L. Crayk
Represented By: Daniel R. Black
Represented By: Marti L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agnes Mukantagara
Represented By: Adam L. Crayk
Represented By: Daniel R. Black
Represented By: Marti L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?