Residential Warranty Services v. Goyo Media et al
Plaintiff: Residential Warranty Services
Defendant: John Hard, Goyo Media, Clear Satellite and Clear Home
Case Number: 2:2020cv00898
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Clear Home, Clear Satellite, Goyo Media, John Hard. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John Hard, #2 Affidavit of Paul Southam) Attorney Cole S. Cannon added to party Clear Home(pty:dft), Attorney Cole S. Cannon added to party Clear Satellite(pty:dft), Attorney Cole S. Cannon added to party John Hard(pty:dft)(Cannon, Cole)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Goyo Media's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Goyo Media. Attorney Cole S. Cannon added to party Goyo Media(pty:dft)(Cannon, Cole)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ** RESTRICTED DOCUMENT ** WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Residential Warranty Services as to John Hard Waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (French, Alexandra)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ** RESTRICTED DOCUMENT ** WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Residential Warranty Services as to Goyo Media Waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (French, Alexandra)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** RESTRICTED DOCUMENT ** WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Residential Warranty Services as to Clear Home Waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (French, Alexandra)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** RESTRICTED DOCUMENT ** WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Residential Warranty Services as to Clear Satellite Waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (French, Alexandra)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 12/30/20 (alt)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alexandra R. French for Residential Warranty Services.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 12/30/20 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alexander P. Orlowski for Residential Warranty Services.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 12/30/20 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alexandra R. French , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3848120,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Residential Warranty Services. (Attachments: #1 Supplement PHV application, #2 Text of Proposed Order PHV Order)(Babych, Eric)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alexander P. Orlowski , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3848073,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Residential Warranty Services. (Attachments: #1 Supplement PHV application, #2 Text of Proposed Order PHV Order)(Babych, Eric)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Residential Warranty Services identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Babych, Eric)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Babych on behalf of Residential Warranty Services (Babych, Eric)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Alexander P. Orlowski & Alexandra R. French, for Plaintiff Residential Warranty Services. (dw)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT Residential Warranty Services against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3846812) filed by Residential Warranty Services. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Service and Marketing Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - RWS Demand Letter) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (Babych, Eric)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Plaintiff Residential Warranty Services is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Residential Warranty Services v. Goyo Media et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Residential Warranty Services
Represented By: Eric Babych
Represented By: Alexandra R. French
Represented By: Alexander P. Orlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hard
Represented By: Cole S. Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goyo Media
Represented By: Cole S. Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Satellite
Represented By: Cole S. Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Home
Represented By: Cole S. Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?