Consumer Financial Protection Bureau v. OLP.com Inc
Plaintiff: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Defendant: Olp.Com Inc
Case Number: 2:2020mc00643
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred in from USDC of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:20-mc-00006. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins.
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Ruling on the motion to compel, ECF No. #1 , is DEFERRED. Defendants request to transfer the motion to compel, ECF No. #1 , to the United States District Court for the District of Utah, is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall take all necessary steps to transfer this case to the District of Utah. re #1 Petition for Miscellaneous Relief,, filed by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 9/14/2020. (rcb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 9/15/2020.]
September 13, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #9 Response in Opposition to Motion,. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 9/15/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 BUREAU OF CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO OLP.COMS REQUEST TO TRANSFER AND MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Emails Between Bureau Counsel and OLP Counsel) (REISCHL, JONATHAN) Modified to edit title on 9/13/2020 (rcb). [Transferred from Florida Northern on 9/15/2020.]
September 10, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #8 OLP.com, Inc.s Initial Response to Motion to Compel Production,Consent to Transfer, and Alternative Motion to Extend Time to Respond Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 9/15/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 OLP.com, Inc.'s Initial Response to Motion to Compel Production, Consent to Transfer, and Alternative Motion to Extend Time to Respond (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Kyle Brownell, #2 Exhibit B Counsel Emails) (HEALY, DAVID) Modified to edit title on 9/10/2020 (rcb). Modified on 9/11/2020 to indicate this filing contains a motion. (cle). [Transferred from Florida Northern on 9/15/2020.]
August 27, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #6 Certificate of Service, #7 Certificate of Service. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 9/15/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU re #2 Notice of Appearance (REISCHL, JONATHAN) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 9/15/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU re #1 Petition for Miscellaneous Relief,, (REISCHL, JONATHAN) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 9/15/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall take whatever steps are necessary to ensure this Order is provided to counsel for the Defendant. See ECF No. #1 -3. Defendant has until 9/9/2020), to file a response to the motion to compel, ECF No. #1 . The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Defendant's response or no later than 9/9/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 8/26/2020. (rcb) **ECF #6 forwarded as directed (Retrieved attorney information from ECF #1 -7 page 1 of 10)** Modified on 8/26/2020 (rcb). [Transferred from Florida Northern on 9/15/2020.]
August 26, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #4 Notice of Appearance of Counsel. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 9/15/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by TRACY L HILMER on behalf of CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU (HILMER, TRACY) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 9/15/2020.]
August 25, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Notice of Appearance, #1 Petition for Miscellaneous Relief,,. (vkm) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 9/15/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MAUREEN E MCOWEN on behalf of CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (MCOWEN, MAUREEN) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 9/15/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN H REISCHL on behalf of CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU (REISCHL, JONATHAN) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 9/15/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 (MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW) PETITION for Order to Compel Production of Documents , filed by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Subpoena, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 Feb Letter OLP, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 Feb Emails, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 Jul Letter OLP, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 Jul Letter BCFP, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 Jul Email OLP, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 Utah Order 1, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9 Utah Order 2, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10 Joint Status Report, #11 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (REISCHL, JONATHAN) Modified to edit title on 8/26/2020 (rcb). [Transferred from Florida Northern on 9/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau v. OLP.com Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olp.Com Inc
Represented By: David P. Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Represented By: Tracy L. Hilmer
Represented By: Jonathan H. Reischl
Represented By: Maureen E. McOwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?