Thompson v. Chief Medical Doctor
Plaintiff: Wesley Thompson
Defendant: Chief Medical Doctor
Case Number: 2:2021cv00053
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #8 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: Chief Medical Doctor filed by Plaintiff Wesley Thompson. (kpf)
March 11, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #8 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: Chief Medical Doctor filed by Plaintiff Wesley Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
March 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: Chief Medical Doctor filed by Plaintiff Wesley Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING of Supplemental Pleading re #2 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Wesley Thompson. (kpf)
February 10, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Mis joinder and Non Joinder of Parties re #2 Notice of Removal,, filed by Plaintiff Wesley Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Envelope)(kpf)
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs Service of Process and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Chief Medical Doctor. (Walsh, Vanessa)
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 File downloaded from Third District Court, Salt Lake County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Affidavit, Return of Service, Summons Return and Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Affidavit, #3 Return of Service, #4 Summons Return, #5 Notice of Removal) (alf)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chief Medical Doctor re #2 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Walsh, Vanessa)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third District, Salt Lake County, case number 200907608, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3890713) filed by Chief Medical Doctor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit Summons) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Walsh, Vanessa)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Defendant Chief Medical Doctor is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Chief Medical Doctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Medical Doctor
Represented By: Vanessa R. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?