Herring v. State of Utah et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Glen Herring
Defendant: Spencer Cox, State of Utah Government Employees and State of Utah
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2021cv00087
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Kelly Glen Herring. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to the Court; (No criminal charges filed with the court). Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Letter Written to Mr. Herring re: Pleading filed, #2 Envelope)(kpf)
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 **SEALED DOCUMENT**Inmate Statement filed by Plaintiff Kelly Glen Herring. (kpf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2021: #1 Envelope ) (kpf). Modified Attached envelope image on 3/2/2021 (kpf).
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to whom it may concern. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (kpf)
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Spencer Cox, State of Utah, State of Utah Government Employees (Originally received by the court on 02/11/2021). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Kelly Glen Herring. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2021: #3 rescanned for ocr) (jl).
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 02/22/2021. (mh)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 02/11/2021) filed by Plaintiff Kelly Glen Herring. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herring v. State of Utah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Utah Government Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Glen Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?