Johnson v. Gill et al
Plaintiff: Bryce Johnson
Defendant: Rosie Rivera, Andrew Conklin, Sean Reyes, Che Arguello, Sim Gill, Dianne Orcutt and Steve DeBry
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2021cv00112
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT TO COLLECTION OF FEES from Inmate Trust Account filed by Bryce Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(kpf)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Seal Documents Exhibit C,D, and R. It is therefore ordered that: Though the Court has already granted Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis, Plaintiff must still eventually pay $350.00, the full amount of the filing fee. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $31.69 within thirty day s of the date of this Order, or the complaint will be dismissed. Plaintiff shall complete the consent to collection of fees and submit it to the inmate funds accounting office at Plaintiff's correctional facility and also submit a copy of the signed consent to this Court within thirty days from the date of this order, or the complaint will be dismissed. See order for details. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 04/12/2021. (kpf)
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 **SEALED DOCUMENT** Inmate Statement filed by Plaintiff Bryce Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(kpf)
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 **SEALED DOCUMENT** Sealed exhibits C, D and R re #4 Complaint (Originally filed 02/24/2021) filed by Plaintiff Bryce Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit R)(mh)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Exhibits C, D and R re #4 Complaint (Originally received by the court on 02/24/2021) filed by Plaintiff Bryce Johnson. (mh)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Originally received by the court on 02/24/2021). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Bryce Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Probable Cause Statement, #2 Exhibit A-2 U-Haul Receipt, #3 Exhibit B-1 Information, #4 Exhibit B-2 USP Contract Attorney Correspondence, #5 Exhibit B-3 ID, Credit Card, Cash Acknowledgment, #6 Exhibit C-Sealed, #7 Exhibit D-Sealed, #8 Exhibit E-Power of Attorney, #9 Exhibit F-Grand Valley Bank Withdrawal, #10 Exhibit G-Accounting from Family, #11 Exhibit H- Bryce Johnson Items Returned, #12 Exhibit I-Attorney Email Requesting Accounting, #13 Exhibit J-Email from Family, #14 Exhibit K-Email Wayne to Defense Attorney, #15 Exhibit L-Check to A1 Group Inc, #16 Exhibit M-Email and Blank Revocation, #17 Exhibit N-Letter to Marcela from Bryce, #18 Exhibit O-Letter to Bryce from Marcela, #19 Exhibit P-Revocation of Power of Attorney, #20 Exhibit Q-Inmate Deposits from Marcela Wardle, #21 Exhibit R-Sealed, #22 Exhibit S-Email Soliciting Plaintiff's Property, #23 Exhibit T-Reference Letter to BOPP, #24 Exhibit U-Notice Sent to marcel with Exhibit A and B, #25 Exhibit V-Constible Return of Service, #26 Exhibit W-District Attorney Complaint, #27 Exhibit X-Attorney General Complaint, #28 Exhibit Y-Grant Morrison Letter, #29 Exhibit Z-Court Ruling and Order, #30 Exhibit AA-Court Order, #31 Exhibit BB-Unified Police Complaint, #32 Exhibit CC-GRAMA Request Attorney General, #33 Exhibit DD-GRAMA Request Assistant Attorney General, #34 Exhibit EE-GRAMA Request District Attorney, #35 Exhibit FF-GRAMA Request Unified Police, #36 Exhibit GG-Letter to SLC Sheriff, #37 Exhibit HH-Affidavit in Support of Probable Cause with Exhibit A and B, #38 Exhibit II-Certified Mail Receipt, #39 Exhibit JJ-Unified Police Respose, #40 Exhibit KK-Deputy District Attorney Response, #41 Exhibit LL-Letter to Deputy District Attorney, #42 Exhibit MM-Attorney General Response, #43 Appendix Filing List, #44 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #45 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (mh)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No; denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 03/08/2021. (mh)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (originally filed on 02/24/2021) filed by Plaintiff Bryce Johnson. (mh)
February 24, 2021 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 02/24/2021) filed by Plaintiff Bryce Johnson. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Gill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosie Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Conklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Che Arguello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sim Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianne Orcutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve DeBry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryce Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?