Vivint v. ADT LLC of Delaware
Plaintiff: Vivint
Defendant: ADT LLC of Delaware a Delaware limited liability company doing business as ADT Security Services
Counter Claimant: ADT LLC of Delaware
Case Number: 2:2021cv00115
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
2 Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 0271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2022 Filing 128 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Vivint. (Brennan, Sterling)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #99 Motion to Stay Pending Inter Parties Review. IT IS ORDERED that the case is stayed in view of IPR proceedings before the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, except that plaintiff Vivint, Inc.s discovery and review of source code for accused instrumentalities is not stayed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than October 21, 2022, the parties shall submit a joint status report, following which the Court may set a conference to address the status of the stay in view of intervening developments in the IPR proceedings. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 06/16/2022. (kpf)
June 16, 2022 Filing 125 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Zoom Hearing on Motion to Stay held on 06/07/2022 before Judge Clark Waddoups. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura W. Robinson, RPR, FCRR, CSR, CP, Telephone number (801)328-4800. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. To redact additional information a Motion to Redact must be filed. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/7/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2022. (jl)
June 7, 2022 Filing 124 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Clark Waddoups: Motion Hearing held on 6/7/2022 re #99 MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support filed by ADT LLC of Delaware. Counsel, court, and court reporter present by Zoom video conference. Argument heard on the pending motion to stay #99 . Court made findings on the record and GRANTED the motion (with qualifications). ADT counsel to prepare and submit an order. Court adjourned. Attorney for Plaintiff: Charles Barquist, Sterling Brennan, Lannie Sears, Attorney for Defendant: Sharonmoyee Goswami, David Simons, Mark Bettilyon. Court Reporter: Laura Robinson.(Time Start: 11:00, Time End: 11:40, Room Video Conference.)(asb)
June 1, 2022 Filing 123 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #99 MOTION to Stay : Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, 6/7/2022 at 11:00 AM in US District Court-SLCU *virtual Court Via Zoom Conference* before Judge Clark Waddoups. Video conference link emailed to counsel, USMS, probation, and court reporter by Outlook calendar invitation. All others instructed to email utdecf_waddoups@utd.uscourts.gov to obtain video link. (asb)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting Stipulated #121 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order. Fact Discovery before claim construction due by 8/17/2022. Dispositive Motions required to be filed with claim construction due by 8/22/2022. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/10/22. (jrj)
May 10, 2022 Filing 121 Stipulated MOTION for Amended Scheduling Order filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware, Counter Claimant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Bettilyon, Mark)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Scheduling Order granting #118 Stipulated MOTION for Amended Scheduling Order to Extend Deadlines filed by ADT LLC of Delaware. Fact Discovery due by 6/17/2022, Motions due by 6/21/2022. See order for other dates and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 04/20/2022. (kpf)
April 20, 2022 Filing 119 NOTICE of SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ADT LLC of Delaware re #99 MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Bettilyon, Mark)
April 20, 2022 Filing 118 Stipulated MOTION for Amended Scheduling Order filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Bettilyon, Mark)
April 12, 2022 Filing 117 ANSWER to #110 Counterclaim filed by Vivint.(Brennan, Sterling)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #115 Motion for Protective Order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/11/22. (jrj)
April 11, 2022 Filing 115 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Brennan, Sterling)
April 7, 2022 Filing 114 REPLY to Response to Motion re #99 MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware, Counter Claimant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Allison Kempf, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Bettilyon, Mark)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadlines: granting #111 Motion for Extension of Time Deadlines: Close of Fact Discovery before claim construction LPR 1.3(a) due by 6/10/2022, Dispositive Motions required to be filed with claim construction, LPR 6.3 due by 6/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 03/25/2022. (kpf)
March 24, 2022 Filing 112 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #99 MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support - Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brennan, Sterling)
March 24, 2022 Filing 111 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to extend Deadlines filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Brennan, Sterling) Modified to correct text on 3/25/2022 (kpf).
March 22, 2022 Filing 110 ANSWER to #95 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Vivint filed by ADT LLC of Delaware.(Bettilyon, Mark)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER terminating #103 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Charles S. Barquist for Vivint.; granting #106 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Charles S. Barquist for Vivint.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/22/22. (jrj)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER terminating #104 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christina Trinh for Vivint.; granting #107 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christina Trinh for Vivint.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/22/22. (jrj)
March 21, 2022 Filing 107 Supplemental MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christina L. Trinh , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4279284,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brennan, Sterling)
March 21, 2022 Filing 106 Supplemental MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles Barquist , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4279287,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brennan, Sterling)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Consistent with this District's Local Rules, an attorney seeking pro hac vice admission must certify that the attorney is not a member of the Utah State Bar, does not maintain a law office in Utah and has not been admitted pro hac vice in three unrelated cases in this District in the previous 5 years. See, DUCivR 83-1.1(1)(A)(i-iii). Accordingly, attorneys Charles Barquist and Christina Trinh are requested, no later than March 25, 2022, to supplement their Motions for Pro Hac Vice Admission #103 , #104 consistent with local rule requirements. A proposed Motion, Application and Order may be found on the Court's website at: https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/usdc-forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 03/18/2022.
March 17, 2022 Filing 104 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christina L. Trinh , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4279287,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brennan, Sterling)
March 17, 2022 Filing 103 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles Barquist , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4279284,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brennan, Sterling)
March 16, 2022 Filing 102 Motions No Longer Referred: #99 MOTION to Stay will be addressed by the District Court.
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES - granting #100 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order. Close of fact discovery before claim construction, LPR 1.3(a) due by 6/3/2022. Deadline to file reply to dispositive motions filed with claim construction, LPR 6.2 due by 7/28/2022. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/14/22. (jrj)
March 14, 2022 Filing 100 Stipulated MOTION for Amended Scheduling Order filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Bettilyon, Mark)
March 10, 2022 Filing 99 MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Bettilyon, Mark)
March 9, 2022 Filing 98 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of David Wright; Michael Manookin; Taylor Wright; Kevin Malaney; Jack Carroll; Kadmiel Perez filed by Jack T. Carroll on behalf of Vivint (Carroll, Jack)
March 9, 2022 Filing 96 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Zoom Motion Hearing on Judgment on the Pleadings held on February 22, 2022 before Judge Clark Waddoups. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura W. Robinson, RPR, FCRR, CSR, CP, Telephone number (801)328-4800. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. To redact additional information a Motion to Redact must be filed. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/30/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2022. (jrj)
March 8, 2022 Filing 95 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended) against ADT LLC of Delaware with Jury Demand. filed by Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-US Patent 10,235,159, #2 Exhibit 2-US Patent 9,349,262, #3 Exhibit 3-US Patent 7,956,739, #4 Exhibit 4-US Patent 8,700,769, #5 Exhibit 5-US Patent 8,392,552) (Brennan, Sterling)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jack T. Carroll for Vivint.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 2/22/22. (jrj)
February 22, 2022 Filing 93 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jack T. Carroll , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4256718,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Manookin, Michael)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER re 91 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Motion Hearing. Follows oral order of 2/22/22. For the reasons stated on the record, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #38 is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint #56 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file its Second Amended Complaint within 14 days from the date of this order, no later than March 8, 2022. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 2/22/22. (jrj)
February 22, 2022 Filing 91 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Clark Waddoups: Counsel present for parties by Zoom video conference. Argument heard on the Rule 12 motions. Court made findings on the record that the record has not yet been fully developed and DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE the motion. Court granted the motion to file a 2nd amended complaint to develop and complete the record. The 2nd amended complaint to be filed by March 8, 2022. Court adjourned.granting #56 Motion for Leave to File; denying #38 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings ; Motion Hearing held on 2/22/2022 re #56 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Its First Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Vivint, #38 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support filed by ADT LLC of Delaware. Attorney for Plaintiff: Sterling Breenan, Jim Lundberg, Michael Manookin, Rick Sears, Attorney for Defendant Sharonmoyee Goswami, Mark Bettilyon, Matthew Boggess, Allison Kempf, Michael Zeliger. Court Reporter: Laura Robinson.(Time Start: 10:00, Time End: 12:30, Room Video Conference.) (asb)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #87 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kadmiel E. Perez for Vivint.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 2/22/22. (jrj)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #86 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kevin J. Malaney for Vivint.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 2/22/22. (jrj)
February 18, 2022 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Lannie Rex Sears on behalf of Vivint (Sears, Lannie)
February 18, 2022 Filing 87 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kadmiel E. Perez , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4221654,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Manookin, Michael)
February 18, 2022 Filing 86 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin J. Malaney , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4221660,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Manookin, Michael)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 DOCKET TEXT ORDER denying #82 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kadmiel E. Perez and #83 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin J. Malaney. The motions are denied without prejudice for failure to comply with the court's January 18, 2022 Order (ECF No. 84) in a timely manner. Plaintiff may refile the motions after reviewing and complying with DUCivR 83-1.1(1)(A)(i-iii). Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 1/25/2022. No attached document. (lrh)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Consistent with this District's Local Rules, an attorney seeking pro hac vice admission must certify that he is not a member of the Utah State Bar, does not maintain a law office in Utah and has not been admitted pro hac vice in three unrelated cases in this District in the previous 5 years. See, DUCivR 83-1.1(1)(A)(i-iii). Accordingly, attorneys Kadmiel Perez and Kevin Malaney are requested to re-file their Motions for Pro Hac Vice Admission #82 , #83 , consistent with local rule requirements. A proposed Motion, Application and Order may be found on the Court's website at: https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/usdc-forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 01/18/2022. (amn)
January 14, 2022 Filing 83 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin J. Malaney , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4221660,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wright, Taylor)
January 14, 2022 Filing 82 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kadmiel E. Perez , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4221654,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Taylor J. Wright added to party Vivint(pty:pla)(Wright, Taylor)
January 6, 2022 Filing 81 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #56 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Its First Amended Complaint , #38 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Court Reporter required Y. Interpreter required N. Is this an In-person Hearing N. Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, 2/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in US District Court-SLCU *virtual Court Via Zoom Conference* before Judge Clark Waddoups. Video conference link emailed to counsel by Outlook calendar invitation. All others instructed to email utdecf_waddoups@utd.uscourts.gov to obtain video link. (asb)
January 4, 2022 Filing 80 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Richard J. Stark filed by Mark M. Bettilyon on behalf of ADT LLC of Delaware (Bettilyon, Mark)
December 23, 2021 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan A. Cook on behalf of Vivint (Cook, Ryan)
December 10, 2021 Filing 78 NOTICE: The court received a bounce-back notification that a secondary email address of sali@cravath.com, for attorney Richard J. Stark as invalid. As a result, the court has removed the invalid secondary email address from CM/ECF. Going forward, the court will not send email notifications to sali@cravath.com. To learn how to update your secondary email address, please visit https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/update-your-address-court. (nl)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #76 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Keith R. Hummel for ADT LLC of Delaware.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/2/2021. (kpf)
December 2, 2021 Filing 76 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Keith R. Hummel , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4179248,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Text of Proposed Order)(Bettilyon, Mark)
November 16, 2021 Filing 75 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Mr. David A. Simons. (jrj)
November 1, 2021 Filing 74 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #56 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Its First Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Manookin, Michael)
October 29, 2021 Filing 73 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #38 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Bettilyon, Mark)
October 26, 2021 Filing 72 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael A. Manookin (Manookin, Michael)
October 14, 2021 Filing 71 REPLY to Response to Motion re #56 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Its First Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Wright, David)
October 8, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE of Change of Address by David R. Wright (Wright, David)
October 7, 2021 Filing 69 NOTICE: The court has received notification that the primary email has been updated attorney David R. Wright. Accordingly, the court has restored efiling privileges for attorney David R. Wright. (nl)
October 5, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE: The court received a bounce-back notification indicating that the primary email address dwright@mabr.com, for attorney David R. Wright is invalid. Under DUCivR 83-1.2(e) and 83-1.3(e), attorneys must maintain valid and current contact information in PACER and with the court. Consistent with the CM/ECF Procedures Manual, the court has inactivated the attorneys efiling privileges. When the attorney updates their contact information in PACER, the court will reactivate their efiling privileges. Instructions for updating an address can be found at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/update-your-address-court. (nl)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES - granting #66 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order. ADT's Initial Non-Infringement, Unenforceability, and Invalidity Contentions, LPR 2.4 due October 21, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/5/21. (jrj)
October 5, 2021 Filing 66 Stipulated MOTION for Amended Scheduling Order to Extend Deadlines filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Bettilyon, Mark)
October 4, 2021 Filing 65 Motions No Longer Referred: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend #56 .
September 30, 2021 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #56 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Its First Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Bettilyon, Mark)
September 30, 2021 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Bettilyon, Mark)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order. To Extend Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 09/17/2021. (kpf)
September 16, 2021 Filing 61 Stipulated MOTION for Amended Scheduling Order filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Bettilyon, Mark)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David A. Simons for ADT LLC of Delaware.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/8/21. (jrj)
September 8, 2021 Filing 59 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David A. Simons , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4104728,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Text of Proposed Order)(Bettilyon, Mark)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response is extended to 9/30/2021. re #56 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Its First Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support Responses due by 9/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 09/07/2021. (kpf)
September 7, 2021 Filing 57 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #56 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Its First Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Bettilyon, Mark)
August 26, 2021 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Its First Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2nd Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Comparison) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Manookin, Michael)
August 26, 2021 Filing 55 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Dr. Matthew B. Shoemake in Opposition re #38 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Shoemake CV, #2 Exhibit 2 RFC 2778)(Manookin, Michael)
August 26, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Request for Judicial Notice by Vivint re #53 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Manookin, Michael)
August 26, 2021 Filing 53 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #38 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Manookin, Michael)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING NON-PARTY DEFENDANT ADT LLC AND DEFENDANT ALARM.COM INCORPORATED'S MOTION TO TRANSFER RELATED CASE PURSUANT TO DUCIVR 83-2(g) re #19 Notice (Other) filed by ADT LLC of Delaware. The court finds that Vivint v. ADT LLC, 2:21-cv-00115-CMR (D. Utah, filed Feb. 25, 2021) (Vivint v. ADT) is related to the above-captioned, lower-numbered case and that transfer to the undersigned is appropriate under the circumstances pursuant to DUCivR 83-2(g). The court therefore GRANTS the motion and directs the Clerk of Court to reassign Vivint v. ADT to the undersigned judge. Vivint v. ADT will not be consolidated with Vivint v. Alarm.com, Inc. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 8/12/21. (jrj)
August 12, 2021 Judge Clark Waddoups added. Judge Jill N. Parrish no longer assigned to case. (jrj)
August 6, 2021 Filing 51 STIPULATION for Dismissal of Vivint, Inc.'s Second Claim of Relief by Vivint. (Manookin, Michael)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order Motions due by 5/31/2022. See order for other dates and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/15/21. (alf)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Retley G. Locke, Jr for ADT LLC of Delaware.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/15/21. (alf)
July 14, 2021 Filing 48 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time of Deadlines/for Amended Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Manookin, Michael) Modified on 7/15/2021 to change event type (alf).
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Marc J Khadpe for ADT LLC of Delaware.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 06/30/2021. (jl)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Allison N. Kempf for ADT LLC of Delaware.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 06/30/2021. (jl)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew J. Boggess for ADT LLC of Delaware.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 06/30/2021. (jl)
June 29, 2021 Filing 44 Supplemental RESPONSE to Motion re #36 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marc J. Khadpe , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4042577,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Text of Proposed Order)(Bettilyon, Mark)
June 29, 2021 Filing 43 Supplemental RESPONSE to Motion re #35 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Allison N. Kempf , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4042566,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of cas filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Text of Proposed Order)(Bettilyon, Mark)
June 29, 2021 Filing 42 Supplemental RESPONSE to Motion re #34 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew J. Boggess , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4042560,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of c filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Text of Proposed Order)(Bettilyon, Mark)
June 29, 2021 Filing 41 Supplemental RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Retley G. Locke, Jr. , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4042582,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Text of Proposed Order)(Bettilyon, Mark)
June 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 DOCKET TEXT ORDER Taking Under Advisement Defendant's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Retley G. Locke Jr. ("Motion") #37 . Defendant is instructed to supplement the Motion with the completed current application for pro hac vice admission form, available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/usdc-forms. Defendant's Motion does not certify that Mr. Locke is not a member of the Utah State Bar, does not maintain a law office in Utah and has not been admitted pro hac vice in any case in this district in the previous 5 years. The deadline for Defendant to supplement its Motion is no later than July 2, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/26/2021.
June 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Taking Under Advisement Defendant's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew J. Boggess ("Motion") #34 . Defendant is instructed to supplement the Motion with the completed current application for pro hac vice admission form, available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/usdc-forms. Defendant's Motion does not certify that Mr. Boggess is not a member of the Utah State Bar, does not maintain a law office in Utah and has not been admitted pro hac vice in any case in this district in the previous 5 years. The deadline for Defendant to supplement its Motion is no later than July 2, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/26/2021.
June 25, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Bettilyon, Mark)
June 25, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Retley G. Locke, Jr. , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4042582,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Text of Proposed Order)(Bettilyon, Mark)
June 25, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marc J. Khadpe , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4042577,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Text of Proposed Order)(Bettilyon, Mark)
June 25, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Allison N. Kempf , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4042566,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Text of Proposed Order)(Bettilyon, Mark)
June 25, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew J. Boggess , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4042560,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Text of Proposed Order)(Bettilyon, Mark)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael E. Zeliger for ADT LLC of Delaware.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/14/21. (alf)
May 13, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE re 31 Order,,,Defendant's Supplementation Regarding Motion for PHV Admission of Michael E. Zeliger [ECF No. 30] filed by ADT LLC of Delaware. (Bettilyon, Mark)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTATION. Defendant is instructed to supplement #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael E. Zeliger to certify that Mr. Zeliger is not a member of the Utah State Bar, does not maintain a law office in Utah and has not been admitted pro hac vice in any case in this District in the previous 5 years. The current Motion and Application form for pro hac vice admission in this District is available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/usdc-forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 05/13/2021. (amn)
May 12, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael E. Zeliger , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4004651,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Text of Proposed Order)(Bettilyon, Mark)
May 7, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #23 filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware (Bettilyon, Mark)
May 7, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #23 filed by Plaintiff Vivint (Manookin, Michael)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PATENT SCHEDULING ORDER: See order for dates and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/7/21. (alf)
May 6, 2021 Filing 26 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brennan, Sterling)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/6/21. (ss)
April 30, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint, filed by ADT LLC of Delaware.(Bettilyon, Mark)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 4/30/21. (ss)
April 26, 2021 Filing 22 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
April 26, 2021 Filing 21 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Vivint. (alf)
April 22, 2021 Filing 20 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (alf)
April 22, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion to Transfer Related Case by ADT LLC of Delaware (Bettilyon, Mark)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sharonmoyee Goswami for ADT LLC of Delaware.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 4/21/21. (alf)
April 20, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sharonmoyee Goswami , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3983710,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Text of Proposed Order)(Bettilyon, Mark)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard J. Stark for ADT LLC of Delaware.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 4/16/21. (alf)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant ADT's answer to First Amended Complaint due 4/30/21. Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/6/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 4/16/21. (alf)
April 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware, Plaintiff Vivint. Form due by 5/3/2021. (alf)
April 16, 2021 ANSWER DEADLINE UPDATED for ADT LLC of Delaware answer due 4/30/2021 per order #15 . (alf)
April 15, 2021 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Answer and Attorney Planning Meeting Report filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadlines)(Brennan, Sterling)
April 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard J. Stark , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3980822,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Text of Proposed Order)(Bettilyon, Mark)
April 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark M. Bettilyon on behalf of ADT LLC of Delaware (Bettilyon, Mark)
April 13, 2021 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vivint as to ADT LLC of Delaware served on 3/18/2021, answer due 4/8/2021. (Manookin, Michael)
March 24, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against ADT LLC of Delaware with Jury Demand. filed by Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 10,235,159, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 10,228,151, #3 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent No. 9,349,262, #4 Exhibit 4 - U.S. Patent No. 7,956,739, #5 Exhibit 5 - U.S. Patent No. 8,700,769, #6 Exhibit 6 - U.S. Patent No. 8,392,552) (Brennan, Sterling)
March 17, 2021 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Reissued Electronically as to ADT LLC of Delaware. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Vivint identifying Vivint Smart Home, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Manookin, Michael)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vivint as to ADT LLC of Delaware served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021. (Harris, Kirk)
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to ADT LLC of Delaware. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 2/26/21. (alf)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mh)
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ADT LLC of Delaware (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3932636) filed by Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Brennan, Sterling)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiff Vivint is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vivint v. ADT LLC of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT LLC of Delaware a Delaware limited liability company doing business as ADT Security Services
Represented By: Richard J. Stark
Represented By: Sharonmoyee Goswami
Represented By: Mark M. Bettilyon
Represented By: Allison N. Kempf
Represented By: Keith R. Hummel
Represented By: Matthew J. Boggess
Represented By: Michael E. Zeliger
Represented By: Retley G. Locke
Represented By: David A. Simons
Represented By: Marc J. Khadpe
Represented By: Retley G. Locke, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivint
Represented By: Michael A. Manookin
Represented By: Sterling Arthur Brennan
Represented By: David R. Wright
Represented By: Kirk R. Harris
Represented By: Jack T. Carroll
Represented By: Kadmiel E. Perez
Represented By: Kevin J. Malaney
Represented By: Taylor J. Wright
Represented By: Lannie Rex Sears
Represented By: Ryan A. Cook
Represented By: Charles S. Barquist
Represented By: Christina Trinh
Represented By: Christina Le Trinh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: ADT LLC of Delaware
Represented By: Allison N. Kempf
Represented By: Keith R. Hummel
Represented By: Mark M. Bettilyon
Represented By: Matthew J. Boggess
Represented By: Michael E. Zeliger
Represented By: Retley G. Locke
Represented By: Richard J. Stark
Represented By: Sharonmoyee Goswami
Represented By: David A. Simons
Represented By: Marc J. Khadpe
Represented By: Retley G. Locke, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?