Williamson v. State of Utah et al
Plaintiff: Darrell John Williamson
Defendant: Salt Lake County, Third District Court for Salt Lake County, The, Adam T. Mow, State of Utah and Jennifer K. Zeleny
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2021cv00180
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of 3rd District Court Docket case #181908159. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
May 5, 2021 Filing 7 **SEALED DOCUMENT**Inmate Statement and Certificate filed by Plaintiff Darrell John Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
April 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: All defendants, (Originally received by the court on 03/22/2021) filed by Plaintiff Darrell John Williamson. (mh) Modified on 4/9/2021 to add original received date. (nl).
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Adam T. Mow, Salt Lake County, State of Utah, Third District Court for Salt Lake County, The, Jennifer K. Zeleny (Originally received by the court on 03/22/2021). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Darrell John Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Envelope 1, #3 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (mh)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Collection of Fees Sent: No; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel on 04/09/2021. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from today to file with the Court a certified copy of Plaintiff's inmate trust fund account statement(s). If Plaintiff does not fully comply, the complaint will be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead(mh) Modified on 4/9/2021 to add request for account statement (nl).
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Originally received by the court on 3/22/2021) filed by Plaintiff Darrell John Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Proposed Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel)(mh) Modified on 4/9/2021 to add original received date (nl).
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Darrell John Williamson received from Correctional Institution (mh)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 03/22/2021) filed by Plaintiff Darrell John Williamson. (mh) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/24/2021) (nl). Modified on 3/24/2021 to correct the filing date.(nl). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (nl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. State of Utah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Third District Court for Salt Lake County, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam T. Mow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer K. Zeleny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell John Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?