Sugarmont v. Zurich American Insurance et al
Plaintiff: Sugarmont
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Zurich American Insurance
Case Number: 2:2021cv00182
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Referring Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Third District Court of case remand. (alf)
April 27, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been transferred to Third District Court, Salt Lake County via via USPS Remand letter, docket sheet, remand order sent. (alf)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Remand to State Court. Case Closed. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 4/27/21. (alf)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying #22 Motion to Stay all court deadlines. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 4/27/21. (alf)
April 22, 2021 Filing 23 Motion No Longer Referred: #22 Stipulated MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support All Case Deadlines. This motion will be handled by District Judge Jill N. Parrish. (nam)
April 22, 2021 Filing 22 Stipulated MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support All Case Deadlines filed by Plaintiff Sugarmont. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Parrish, Jennifer)
April 22, 2021 Filing 21 Stipulated MOTION to Remand to State Court Third Judicial District Court, State of Utah and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Sugarmont. (Parrish, Jennifer)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO CONDUCT JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY - the court HEREBY ORDERS Zurich to conduct limited discovery regarding the domicile of Sugarmonts members. Zurich shall have until May 27, 2021 to complete discovery and file a document alleging the complete citizenship of all the parties. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 4/15/21. (alf)
April 14, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #16 filed by Defendants Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance (Cantrell, Connor)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 4/14/21. (ss)
April 14, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #16 filed by Plaintiff Sugarmont (Magleby, James)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 4/13/21. (ss)
April 5, 2021 Filing 15 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
April 2, 2021 Filing 14 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Sugarmont. (alf)
April 2, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand And Affirmative Defenses filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance.(Cantrell, Connor)
April 2, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay filed by Defendants Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bonds, #2 Exhibit 2 - Zurich's Denial to Sugarmont, #3 Exhibit 3 - Ascent's Demand for Arbitration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ascent's Motion to Compel, #5 Exhibit 5 - Order on Ascent's Motion to Compel, #6 Exhibit 6 - Zurich's Motion to Intervene, #7 Exhibit 7 - Order on Zurich's Motion to Intervene, #8 Exhibit 8 - Letter from Ascent's Atty to Sugarmont's Atty)(Cantrell, Connor)
April 2, 2021 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance. (alf)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER GRANTING #9 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Zurich to File Its Response to Plaintiff Sugarmont's Complaint. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to April 2, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/31/2021. No attached document. (med)
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to file Answer to Sugarmont's Complaint filed by Defendants Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension)(Cantrell, Connor)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET TEXT ORDER: If the parties want to extend the answer deadline, they must seek leave of the court. Accordingly, the parties are instructed to file a motion requesting the relief stated in their #7 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Zurich to File its Response to Plaintiff Sugarmont's Complaint. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/31/2021. (eh)
March 30, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance. (Cantrell, Connor)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days. Within twenty-eight (28) days parties shall meet and confer. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/26/21. (alf)
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 File downloaded from Third District Court, Salt Lake County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Returns of Service, Notice of Removal Packets 1 & 2, Notice of Removal, Supplemental Notice of Removal and applicable State Court Returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint Return of Electronic Notification, #3 Return of Service Fidelity & Deposit Co MD, #4 Return of Service Zurich Amer Ins Co, #5 Returns of Service Return of Electronic Notification, #6 Notice of Removal Packet 1, #7 Notice of Removal, #8 Notice of Removal and Packet 1 Return of Electronic Notification, #9 Notice of Removal Packet 2, #10 Supplemental Notice of Removal, #11 Notice of Removal Packet 2 and Supplemental Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification) (alf)
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance, Plaintiff Sugarmont. Form due by 4/9/2021. (nmt)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance, Plaintiff Sugarmont. (nmt)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 210901156, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3961088) filed by Zurich American Insurance, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit 2 - Preliminary Injunction Transcript, #4 Exhibit 3 - Sugarhouse Development, #5 Exhibit 4 - J. Vitek Resume, #6 Exhibit 5 -Cottonwood Residential, #7 Exhibit 6 - Registered Principals, #8 Exhibit 7 - Cottonwood Registered Agent Info, #9 Exhibit 8 - Summons on Zurich and Fidelity Deposit Company, #10 Exhibit 9 - State Court Docket Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Cantrell, Connor)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Defendants Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sugarmont v. Zurich American Insurance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: Connor L. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance
Represented By: Connor L. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sugarmont
Represented By: Jennifer F. Parrish
Represented By: James E. Magleby
Represented By: Adam Alba
Represented By: Yevgen Kovalov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?