Walker v. Stake Center Locating
Plaintiff: Dustin Walker
Defendant: Stake Center Locating
Case Number: 2:2021cv00183
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel D. Stratton for Stake Center Locating.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 5/12/21. (alf)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Denis E. Jacobson for Stake Center Locating.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 5/12/21. (alf)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alan B. Felts for Stake Center Locating.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 5/12/21. (alf)
May 12, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel D. Stratton , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4003919,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Stake Center Locating. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hilton, Jordan)
May 12, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Denis E. Jacobson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4003917,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Stake Center Locating. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hilton, Jordan)
May 12, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alan B. Felts , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4003908,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Stake Center Locating. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hilton, Jordan)
May 10, 2021 Filing 25 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Stake Center Locating. (alf)
May 10, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Hilton on behalf of Stake Center Locating (Hilton, Jordan)
May 10, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Stake Center Locating, Plaintiff Dustin Walker. Form due by 5/25/2021. (alf)
May 7, 2021 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Stake Center Locating identifying S&N Communications, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Menssen, Michael)
May 7, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Stake Center Locating. Attorney Michael Richard Menssen added to party Stake Center Locating(pty:dft)(Menssen, Michael)
May 4, 2021 Filing 20 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Walker as to Stake Center Locating served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Moulton, David)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard M. Schreiber for Dustin Walker.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 4/26/21. (alf)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David I. Moulton for Dustin Walker.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 4/26/21. (alf)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael A. Josephson for Dustin Walker.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 4/26/21. (alf)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew W. Dunlap for Dustin Walker.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 4/26/21. (alf)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard J. Burch for Dustin Walker.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 4/26/21. (alf)
April 23, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard M. Schreiber , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3988230,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Dustin Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Benjamin, M.)
April 23, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard J. (Rex) Burch , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3988227,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Dustin Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Benjamin, M.)
April 23, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Josephson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3988222,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Dustin Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Benjamin, M.)
April 23, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David I. Moulton , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3979819,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Dustin Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Benjamin, M.)
April 23, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew W. Dunlap , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3988199,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Dustin Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Benjamin, M.)
April 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Notice of Filing Consent by Dustin Walker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Norsworthy, Krystle Notice of Consent) (Benjamin, M.)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET TEXT ORDER denying #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Amendments to DUCivR 83-1 became effective on December 1, 2020. Defendant's motion is denied for failure to comply with DUCivR 83-1.1(c). Defendant may file a renewed motion after reviewing the revised rule and utilizing the new motion form and application form for pro hac vice status available on the court's website. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 4/15/2021. No attached document. (lrh)
April 14, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David I. Moulton , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3979819,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Dustin Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contact information, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Benjamin, M.)
April 1, 2021 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Stake Center Locating. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Notice of Filing Consent by Dustin Walker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jones, Joel D. Notice of Consent) (Benjamin, M.)
March 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Michael A. Josephson, Andrew W. Dunlap and Richard M. Schreiber, for Plaintiff Dustin Walker. (mh)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Richard J Burch and David I Moulton, for Plaintiff Dustin Walker. (mh)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Stake Center Locating (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3962332) filed by Dustin Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dustin Walker Notice of Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Benjamin, M.)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiff Dustin Walker is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Stake Center Locating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stake Center Locating
Represented By: Alan B. Felts
Represented By: Jordan Hilton
Represented By: Daniel D. Stratton
Represented By: Denis E. Jacobson
Represented By: Michael Richard Menssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Walker
Represented By: M. Paige Benjamin
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Represented By: Richard M. Schreiber
Represented By: Richard J. Burch
Represented By: David I. Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?