Radonna Matchett v. BSI Financial Services
Plaintiff: Radonna Matchett
Defendant: BSI Financial Services
Case Number: 2:2021cv00211
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Dale A Kimball
2 Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #7 MOTION to Dismiss the First, Second, Third and Fifth Causes of Action With Prejudice filed by Defendant BSI Financial Services. (Huber, Joshua)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss the First, Second, Third and Fifth Causes of Action With Prejudice filed by Defendant BSI Financial Services. (Huber, Joshua)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re Defendant's #7 MOTION to Dismiss the First, Second, Third and Fifth Causes of Action With Prejudice (Notice generated by DAK Chambers): Motion Hearing is set for 7/20/2021 at 02:00 PM in Rm 3.400 before Judge Dale A. Kimball. (eat)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Amended MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss the First, Second, Third and Fifth Causes of Action With Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Radonna Matchett. (Baczynski, Daniel)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Stipulated Motion to Amend/Correct #19 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Plaintiff is ordered to file his proposed corrected brief within one day of the date of this Order. Defendant will then have the requisite 14 days from the date the corrected brief is filed to submit a reply. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 5/24/2021. (eat)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct #19 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Radonna Matchett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Proposed Corrected Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Baczynski, Daniel)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss the First, Second, Third and Fifth Causes of Action With Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Radonna Matchett. (Baczynski, Daniel)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Dismiss the First, Second, Third and Fifth Causes of Action With Prejudice. Plaintiff's responses is due by 5/19/2021. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 5/19/2021. (eat)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss the First, Second, Third and Fifth Causes of Action With Prejudice and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Radonna Matchett. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Baczynski, Daniel)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re Defendant's #7 MOTION to Dismiss the First, Second, Third and Fifth Causes of Action With Prejudice. Plaintiff's response is due by 5/18/2021. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 5/12/2021. (eat)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss the First, Second, Third and Fifth Causes of Action With Prejudice and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Radonna Matchett. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Baczynski, Daniel)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 5/6/2021. (eat)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Radonna Matchett. (alf)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #6 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant BSI Financial Services. (alf)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Fourth Cause of Action to 14 days after the Court has resolved Defendants pending Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 4/13/21. (alf)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Fourth Cause of Action filed by Defendant BSI Financial Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huber, Joshua)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss the First, Second, Third and Fifth Causes of Action With Prejudice filed by Defendant BSI Financial Services. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joshua A. Huber, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Huber, Joshua)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant BSI Financial Services, Plaintiff Radonna Matchett. Form due by 4/21/2021. (alf)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 File downloaded from Third District Court, Salt Lake County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Notice of Appearance, Motions to Dismiss 1 & 2 with Supporting Memorandum, Affidavit in support of Motion to Dismiss, Exhibits A-C, Amended Complaint and all applicable state court returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint Return of Electronic Notification, #3 Notice of Appearance, #4 Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum, #5 Motion to Dismiss Return of Electronic Notification, #6 Motion to Dismiss 2 and Supporting Memorandum, #7 Motion to Dismiss 2 Return of Electronic Notification, #8 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #9 Affidavit Return of Electronic Notification, #10 Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit A Return of Electronic Notification, #12 Exhibit B, #13 Exhibit B Return of Electronic Notification, #14 Exhibit C, #15 Exhibit C Return of Electronic Notification, #16 Amended Complaint, #17 Amended Complaint Return of Electronic Notification) (alf)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant BSI Financial Services, Plaintiff Radonna Matchett. (nmt)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant BSI Financial Services. (Huber, Joshua)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd Judicial Circuit Court Salt Lake County, case number 200905775, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3971084) filed by BSI Financial Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Huber, Joshua)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Defendant BSI Financial Services is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radonna Matchett v. BSI Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radonna Matchett
Represented By: Daniel M. Baczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSI Financial Services
Represented By: Joshua Andrew Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?