C.R. England v. Green
Plaintiff: C.R. England
Defendant: R. Gardner Green
Case Number: 2:2021cv00263
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Howard C Nielson
2 Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/17/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 9/17/2021. Expert Discovery due by 6/30/2022. Dispositive or Potentially Dispositive Motions due by 9/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 6/23/21. (dla)
June 22, 2021 Filing 21 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Williams, Jeffery)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DOCKET TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #19 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. Pursuant to DUCivR 26-2, the District of Utah's Standard Protective Order available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/usdc-forms governs in every civil case unless the court enters a different protective order, and it need not be entered in the docket of a specific case. Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order does not state whether or how the protective order Plaintiff seeks is different from the Standard Protective Order. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion is DENIED without prejudice. If Plaintiff seeks entry of an order which differs from the Standard Protective Order, Plaintiff may file a new motion explaining those differences and the basis for the request. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 6/16/2021. No attached document. (med)
June 15, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff C.R. England. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A-Proposed) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Williams, Jeffery)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #17 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order and Exchange Initial Disclosures. The deadline to comply with paragraphs 2 and 4 of the #15 Order to Propose Schedule is extended to June 25, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 6/7/2021. No attached document. (med)
June 4, 2021 Filing 17 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order, and Exchange Initial Disclosures filed by Counter Defendant C.R. England, Plaintiff C.R. England. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to File Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order, and Exchange Initial Disclosures) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Williams, Jeffery)
June 4, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #8 Counterclaim filed by C.R. England.(Williams, Jeffery)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 5/12/21. (dla)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #12 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Counterclaim. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the counterclaim is extended to June 7, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 5/12/2021. No attached document. (med)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 5/12/21. (dla)
May 11, 2021 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff C.R. England. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response)(Williams, Jeffery)
May 6, 2021 Filing 11 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
May 6, 2021 Filing 10 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant R. Gardner Green. (alf)
May 6, 2021 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff C.R. England. (alf)
May 5, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand Affirmative and Other Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against C.R. England filed by R. Gardner Green. (Bruchs, Amy)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Amy O. Bruchs for R. Gardner Green.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 5/3/21. (alf)
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amy O. Bruchs , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3995612,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant R. Gardner Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Joffee, Steven)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff C.R. England, Defendant R. Gardner Green. Form due by 5/14/2021. (alf)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 File downloaded from Third District Court, Salt Lake County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Exhibit A, Summons Return, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal and all applicable state court returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Complaint, Exhibit Return of Electronic Notification, #4 Summons Return, #5 Summons Return Return of Electronic Notification, #6 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification, #7 Notice of Filing Return of Electronic Notification) (alf)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff C.R. England, Defendant R. Gardner Green. (mh)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 210901674, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3991632) filed by R. Gardner Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Joffee, Steven)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Defendant R. Gardner Green is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.R. England v. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Gardner Green
Represented By: Steven J. Joffee
Represented By: Amy O. Bruchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.R. England
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?