Aaron Cordero v. C.R. England, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Cordero
Defendant: C.R. England, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00280
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Referring Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 43 REQUEST to Submit for Decision filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Hagen, Scott)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re #34 Request to Submit for Decision filed by C.R. England, Inc. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 6/8/21. (alf)
June 7, 2021 Filing 41 Motions No Longer Referred: #35 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Stay All Proceedings and Memorandum in Support (eh)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 6/4/21. (ss)
June 2, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #37 filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc. (Hagen, Scott)
May 28, 2021 Filing 38 SECOND NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Edwin Aiwazian and Randolph David Greenwald, for Plaintiff Aaron Cordero - sent at request of chambers. (alf)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/27/21. (ss)
May 19, 2021 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Lisa Callister in Support re #35 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Stay All Proceedings and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - agreement)(Hagen, Scott)
May 19, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Stay All Proceedings and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hagen, Scott)
May 12, 2021 Filing 34 REQUEST to Submit for Decision filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Hagen, Scott)
May 4, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron C. Hinton on behalf of C.R. England, Inc. (Hinton, Aaron)
May 4, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney Hulet Krogue on behalf of C.R. England, Inc. (Krogue, Whitney)
May 4, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Hagen on behalf of C.R. England, Inc. (Hagen, Scott)
April 30, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Drew R Hansen and J Randall Boyer, for Defendant C.R. England, Inc. (nl)
April 30, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Edwin Aiwazian and Randolph David Greenwald, for Plaintiff Aaron Cordero. (nl)
April 30, 2021 Filing 28 Case transferred in from USDC of California Central; Case Number 5:20-cv-02675. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. District of Utah case assigned 2:21-cv-00280-JNP. Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish.
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order (1) GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue (Dkt. No. #21 ); (2) DENYING AS MOOT Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. #22 ); and (3) VACATING the May 10, 2021 Hearing by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. For the reasons above, the Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion to Transfer. The Clerk is directed to transfer this action to United States District Court for the District of Utah. Accordingly, Defendants Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. The May 10, 2021 hearing is VACATED. Case transferred to the District of Utah. Case transferred electronically. [MD JS-6. Case Terminated.] (et) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #22 filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Boyer, J) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Utah #21 filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Boyer, J) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Filing 24 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #22 filed by Plaintiff Aaron Cordero. (Greenwald, Randolph) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Filing 23 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Utah #21 filed by Plaintiff Aaron Cordero. (Greenwald, Randolph) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Randall Boyer, #2 Proposed Order) (Boyer, J) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Utah filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Randall Boyer, #2 Declaration of Janis Pressley, #3 Proposed Order) (Boyer, J) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTES Order (1) DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Remand (Dkt. No. #15 ); (2) DENYING Defendant's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Sur-Reply (Dkt. No. #18 ); and (3) VACATING the April 5, 2021 Hearing (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
March 29, 2021 Filing 19 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant C.R. England, Inc.'s Ex Parte Application In opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Sur-Reply #18 filed by Plaintiff Aaron Cordero. (Greenwald, Randolph) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 18 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Sur-Reply filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Randall Boyer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order) (Boyer, J) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
March 22, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY In Support of Motion to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino County Superior Court #15 filed by Plaintiff Aaron Cordero. (Greenwald, Randolph) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
March 8, 2021 Filing 16 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino County Superior Court #15 filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration - Second Declaration of Janis Pressley in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Janis Pressley, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Janis Pressley)(Boyer, J) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Aaron Cordero. Motion set for hearing on 4/5/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Randolph Greenwald in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447) (Greenwald, Randolph) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Aaron Cordero, (Greenwald, Randolph) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Randolph David Greenwald counsel for Plaintiff Aaron Cordero. Adding Randolph Greenwald as counsel of record for Plaintiff Aaron Cordero for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Aaron Cordero. (Attorney Randolph David Greenwald added to party Aaron Cordero(pty:pla))(Greenwald, Randolph) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON INITIAL MOTIONS AND TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #11 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The Parties shall file and brief the initial motions according to the following schedule and Defendant's deadline to respond to the initial Complaint is as follows: Plaintiff to file Motion to Remand. February 22, 2021; Defendant to file Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. March 8, 2021; Plaintiff to file Reply in Support of Motion to Remand. March 22, 2021;Hearing on Motion to Remand. April 5, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. See order for details. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyer, J) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
January 5, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to C.R. England, Inc. answer now due 2/5/2021, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc..(Boyer, J) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
December 31, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants C.R. England, Inc., Does 1 through 100, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Aaron Cordero. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/21/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
December 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Drew R Hansen on behalf of Defendant C.R. England, Inc. (Attorney Drew R Hansen added to party C.R. England, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hansen, Drew) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
December 31, 2020 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on December 31, 2020. (Boyer, J) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
December 31, 2020 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties (Boyer, J) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
December 31, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc. (Boyer, J) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Boyer, J) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIVDS2023623 Receipt No: ACACDC-29804682 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration of Janis Pressley) (Attorney J Randall Boyer added to party C.R. England, Inc.(pty:dft))(Boyer, J) [Transferred from California Central on 4/30/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron Cordero v. C.R. England, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Cordero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. England, Inc.
Represented By: Scott A. Hagen
Represented By: Whitney Hulet Krogue
Represented By: Aaron C. Hinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?