Axcess Global Sciences et al v. New U Life Disc et al
Plaintiff: Pruvit Ventures and Axcess Global Sciences
Defendant: New U Life Disc and New U Life Corp
Case Number: 2:2021cv00407
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Referring Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pruvit Ventures, Axcess Global Sciences as to New U Life Disc served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (Platt, Brian)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pruvit Ventures, Axcess Global Sciences as to New U Life Corp served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (Platt, Brian)
August 18, 2021 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to New U Life Corp. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
August 18, 2021 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to New U Life Disc. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
July 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #4 filed by Plaintiffs Axcess Global Sciences, Pruvit Ventures (Lorimer, Brent)
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #4 filed by Plaintiffs Axcess Global Sciences, Pruvit Ventures (Platt, Brian)
July 20, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Pruvit Ventures. (Platt, Brian)
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Axcess Global Sciences. (Platt, Brian)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant Plaintiffs must propose a schedule to defendants within (7) days after the filing of the first answer. Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 1.2, the parties shall hold their conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) no later than thirty-five (35) days after the filing of the first answer to discuss and address those matters found in the form scheduling order located on the court's website. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 7/16/21. (alf)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/15/21. (ss)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/14/21. (ss)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mh)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement- Jury Trial Demanded against New U Life Corp, New U Life Disc (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4045682) filed by Pruvit Ventures, Axcess Global Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Platt, Brian)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff Axcess Global Sciences is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Axcess Global Sciences et al v. New U Life Disc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New U Life Disc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New U Life Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pruvit Ventures
Represented By: Brian N. Platt
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axcess Global Sciences
Represented By: Brian N. Platt
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?