Nutraceutical et al v. High Level Hemp
Plaintiff: Nutraceutical and NutraMarks
Defendant: High Level Hemp a California limited liability company doing business as High Level
Case Number: 2:2021cv00408
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default as to High Level Hemp LLC filed by Plaintiffs NutraMarks, Nutraceutical. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Military Sevice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Clerks Default Certificate) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Nate, Kennedy)
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiffs NutraMarks, Nutraceutical identifying Nutraceutical International Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Nate, Kennedy)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/16/21. (alf)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/15/21. (ss)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/14/21. (ss)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nutraceutical, NutraMarks as to High Level Hemp served on 7/8/2021, answer due 7/29/2021. (Nate, Kennedy)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint) (nmt)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to High Level Hemp. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against High Level Hemp (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4046246) filed by Nutraceutical, NutraMarks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit 2 - Second Demand Letter) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Nate, Kennedy)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiffs NutraMarks, Nutraceutical is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nutraceutical et al v. High Level Hemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Level Hemp a California limited liability company doing business as High Level
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nutraceutical
Represented By: Brian Scott Allen
Represented By: Jason A. McNeill
Represented By: Kennedy D. Nate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NutraMarks
Represented By: Brian Scott Allen
Represented By: Jason A. McNeill
Represented By: Kennedy D. Nate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?