Campbell v. Whitear et al
Plaintiff: Roger Campbell
Defendant: FNU Whitear, FNU Moulton, Bountiful City, North Salt Lake City, Davis County, J. Whitear and T. Moulton
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 2:2021cv00421
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER-IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Though the Court has already granted Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis, Plaintiff must still eventually pay $350.00, the full amount of the filing fee. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $27.63 within thirty days of the date of this Order, or the complaint will be dismissed. Plaintiff shall complete the consent to collection of fees and submit it to the inmate funds accounting office at Plaintiff's correctional facility and also submit a copy of the signed consent to this Court within thirty days from the date of this Order, or the complaint will be dismissed. See Order for additional details and instructions. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/1/21. (jrj)
August 30, 2021 Filing 12 **SEALED DOCUMENT**Inmate Statement filed by Plaintiff Roger Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(kpf)
August 27, 2021 Filing 11 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Summons;. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (kpf)
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to file accounting statement filed by Plaintiff Roger Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to file accounting statement filed by Plaintiff Roger Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Request for Admission to be served by mail to T. Moulton by Roger Campbell. (kpf)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Request for Admission to J. Whitear filed by Roger Campbell. (kpf)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: First Set of Interrogatories filed by Roger Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/Declaration of Roger Campbell in Support re #4 Complaint filed by Roger Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Bountiful City, Davis County, T. Moulton, North Salt Lake City, Prisoner Litigation Unit, J. Whitear (Originally received by the court on 07/12/2021). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Roger Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (nmt)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: Yes Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 07/14/2021. (nmt)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Envelope. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(nmt)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 07/12/2021) filed by Plaintiff Roger Campbell. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Whitear et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Whitear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bountiful City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Salt Lake City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Whitear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?