Ol Private Counsel v. Olson
Plaintiff: Ol Private Counsel
Defendant: Ephraim Olson
Case Number: 2:2021cv00455
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for Joinder and Memorandum in Support (Motion to Join Thomas Olson as a Counterclaim Defendant) filed by Defendant Ephraim Olson. (Lilja, Scott)
August 31, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Joinder and Memorandum in Support (Motion to Join Thomas Olson as a Counterclaim Defendant) filed by Plaintiff Ol Private Counsel. (Jordan, David)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/10/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 12/3/2021. Discovery due by 9/23/2022. Motions due by 10/21/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 10/26/2022 at 02:45 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge David Barlow. See order for other deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/26/2021. (jwt)
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Jordan, David)
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #15 Complaint Counterclaim filed by Ol Private Counsel.(Jordan, David) Modified by striking complaint and adding counterclaim text and linking to counterclaim on 9/1/2021 (jl).
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #9 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Motion to Join Thomas Olson as a Counterclaim Defendant. Plaintiff's deadline is extended to August 31, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/17/2021. No attached document. (eh)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION for Joinder and Memorandum in Support (Motion to Join Thomas Olson as a Counterclaim Defendant) filed by Plaintiff Ol Private Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Motion to Join Thomas Olson as a Counterclaim Defendant) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Jordan, David)
August 3, 2021 Filing 15 COUNTERCLAIM against Ol Private Counsel filed by Ephraim Olson. (jl)
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Joinder and Memorandum in Support (Motion to Join Thomas Olson as a Counterclaim Defendant) filed by Defendant Ephraim Olson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through E) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Lilja, Scott)
August 3, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint) filed by Ephraim Olson.(Lilja, Scott)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report, available on the District of Utah's website at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/civil-case-scheduling, within fourteen (14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 07/29/2021. (jl)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 7/28/2021. (ath)
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Exhibit B of #2 Notice of Removal) filed by Ephraim Olson.(nmt)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Ol Private Counsel, Defendant Ephraim Olson. (nmt)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third Judicial District Court, Salt Lake County, case number 210901401, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4067228) filed by Ephraim Olson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A through F) Assigned to Judge David Barlow (Lilja, Scott)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Barlow. Defendant Ephraim Olson is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ol Private Counsel v. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ol Private Counsel
Represented By: David J. Jordan
Represented By: Jordan Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ephraim Olson
Represented By: Scott M. Lilja
Represented By: Sarah C. Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?