Securities and Exchange Commission v. Mine Shaft Brewing et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Mine Shaft Brewing, Timothy A. Nemeckay, John A. Logan and Charlie V. Whittington
Case Number: 2:2021cv00457
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0077
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Charlie V. Whittington served on 8/25/2017, answer due 9/15/2017. (Fronk, Casey)
August 30, 2021 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Timothy A. Nemeckay served on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Fronk, Casey)
August 30, 2021 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Mine Shaft Brewing served on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Fronk, Casey)
August 30, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #10 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #11 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #12 Summons Returned Executed as to USA: The document was incorrectly filed under the wrong event. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading by choosing the event Summons Returned Executed. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (jl)
August 27, 2021 Filing 12 ***STRICKEN-DISREGARD*** **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Charlie V. Whittington served on 8/25/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Fronk, Casey) Modified by striking as wrong event used on 8/30/2021 (jl).
August 27, 2021 Filing 11 ***STRICKEN-DISREGARD*** **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Timothy A. Nemeckay served on 8/17/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (Fronk, Casey) Modified by striking as wrong event chosen on 8/30/2021 (jl).
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 ***STRICKEN-DISREGARD*** **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Mine Shaft Brewing served on 8/17/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (Fronk, Casey) Modified by striking as wrong event used on 8/30/2021 (jl).
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Mine Shaft Brewing. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Charlie V. Whittington. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
July 29, 2021 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Timothy A. Nemeckay. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT TO ENTRY of Judgment of John A. Logan filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment)(Fronk, Casey)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge David Barlow. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to the case. Case number will now read 2:21-cv-00457-DBB. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (jwt)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. The procedural posture of the case, including the fact that not all Defendants appeared and the pending #3 Consent to Entry of Judgment, warrant reassignment of this case to district judge. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 7/27/2021. (eh)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 ***STRICKEN-DISREGARD***CONSENT TO ENTRY of Judgment of John A. Logan filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment)(Fronk, Casey) Modified by striking per conversation with counsel as wrong version was uploaded on 7/28/2021 (jl).
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants No Filing Fee filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Fronk, Casey)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) by the end of the business day. Filing Fee waived (Waived)NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Mine Shaft Brewing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Casey Fronk
Represented By: Tracy Schloss Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Shaft Brewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy A. Nemeckay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie V. Whittington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?