Ludvik Electric Company v. Vanderlande Industries
Plaintiff: Ludvik Electric Company
Defendant: Vanderlande Industries
Case Number: 2:2021cv00462
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Daphne A Oberg
2 Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/24/2023. Motions due by 4/5/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 4/13/2023 at 02:45 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge David Barlow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 09/23/2021. (jl)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DOCKET TEXT ORDER ORDER TO SUBMIT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. The court is in receipt of #23 Attorney Planning Meeting Report. As previously directed in paragraph 2(a) of the #5 Order to Propose Schedule, the parties are ordered to submit a proposed scheduling order in Microsoft Word format directly to chambers email at utdecf_romero@utd.uscourts.gov within three days from the date of this order. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/21/2021. (cvm)
September 20, 2021 Filing 23 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Morris, Mark)
September 17, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyson Prisbrey on behalf of Ludvik Electric Company (Prisbrey, Tyson)
September 17, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Vanderlande Industries (Heiner, Kevin)
September 9, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Vanderlande Industries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Collier, Jonathan)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DOCKET TEXT ORDER TO COMPLY WITH ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE. The deadline to comply with Paragraph 2 of the #5 Order to Propose Schedule has expired. The parties are hereby ordered to meet and confer and submit an attorney planning meeting report and proposed scheduling order to the court within fourteen (14) of the date of this order. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/3/2021. (cvm)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 09/02/21. (rep)
September 2, 2021 Filing 17 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge David Barlow. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
September 2, 2021 Filing 16 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Vanderlande Industries. (alf)
August 25, 2021 Filing 15 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Ludvik Electric Company. (alf)
August 18, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Ludvik Electric Company, Defendant Vanderlande Industries. Form due by 9/2/2021. (alf)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #12 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant's deadline to respond is extended to September 9, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/18/2021. No attached document. (eh)
August 17, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant Vanderlande Industries. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Jonathan Collier added to party Vanderlande Industries (pty:dft)(Collier, Jonathan)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kory D. George for Ludvik Electric Company.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/6/21. (alf)
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kory D. George , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4071717,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Ludvik Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Morris, Mark)
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kory D. George , The document was not signed by counsel, has been stricken and the motion terminated. Please resubmit motion with signature. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (alf)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joel D. Heusinger for Ludvik Electric Company.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/3/21. (alf)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joel D. Heusinger , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4071737,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Ludvik Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Morris, Mark)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kory D. George , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4071717,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Ludvik Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Morris, Mark) Modified on 8/4/2021 - stricken as motion is not signed by counsel (alf).
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 7/29/21. (jwt)
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ludvik Electric Company as to Vanderlande Industries served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Morris, Mark)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Vanderlande Industries. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Vanderlande Industries (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4068500) filed by Ludvik Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Morris, Mark)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff Ludvik Electric Company is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ludvik Electric Company v. Vanderlande Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ludvik Electric Company
Represented By: Mark O. Morris
Represented By: Joel D. Heusinger
Represented By: Tyson Prisbrey
Represented By: Kory D. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanderlande Industries
Represented By: Jonathan Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?