1st Class Staffing v. Campos-Garcia
Plaintiff: 1st Class Staffing
Defendant: Silvia Campos-Garcia and Silvia K. Campos-Garcia
Case Number: 2:2021cv00487
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Daphne A Oberg
2 Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DOCKET TEXT ORDER denying #19 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Plaintiff seeks leave to file under seal Exhibit B to its #18 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, solely on the basis of Defendant's designation of the document as "confidential." Defendant has not filed a separate motion to seal as required to maintain the document under seal pursuant to DUCivR 5-3(b)(2)(C)(i). Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion is DENIED and Exhibit B (Doc. No. 20) shall be unsealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 10/8/2021. No attached document. (med)
September 29, 2021 Filing 28 Supplemental BRIEF re #22 Stipulated MOTION for Initial Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff 1st Class Staffing. (Rice, Robert)
September 29, 2021 Filing 27 Supplemental BRIEF re #22 Stipulated MOTION for Initial Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant Silvia K. Campos-Garcia. (Shurman, Lauren)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DOCKET TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal #19 states the sole basis for seeking to file the document at issue under seal is because it contains information that Defendant designated as "Confidential." Accordingly, if Defendant seeks to have the document sealed, she must comply with DUCivR 5-3(b)(2)(C)(i) ("[I]f the sole basis for proposing that the Document be sealed is that another party designated it as confidential or for attorneys eyes only, then so state that reason in the motion. If the designating party seeks to have the Document sealed, the designating party must file a Motion for Leave to File Under Seal in accordance with DUCivR 5-3(b)(2)." Defendant's motion must be filed within seven (7) days of this order. If no motion is filed, the original motion may be denied, and the document may be unsealed without further notice. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 9/15/2021. (eh)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. The parties are ORDERED to submit supplemental briefing on #22 Stipulated Motion for Scheduling Conference. Each party is ordered to file a short brief regarding its position on the disputes as set forth in the Attorney Planning Meeting Report. The briefs are limited to five pages and must be filed by September 29, 2021. No opposition or reply briefs are permitted unless ordered by the court. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 9/15/2021. (eh)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 9/13/21. (ep)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DOCKET TEXT ORDER finding as moot #9 Motion to Expedite. Since the filing of this motion, Plaintiff has withdrawn its motion for a preliminary injunction. As such, the motion to expedite discovery is moot. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 9/13/2021. No attached document. (ep)
September 10, 2021 Filing 22 Stipulated MOTION for Initial Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff 1st Class Staffing. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rice, Robert)
September 10, 2021 Filing 21 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Rice, Robert)
September 9, 2021 Filing 20 **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #18 Notice (Other), filed by Plaintiff 1st Class Staffing NOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Offer Letter)(Rice, Robert) Modified by striking per 29 DOCKET TEXT ORDER on 10/8/2021 (jl).
September 9, 2021 Filing 19 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re #18 Notice (Other), filed by Plaintiff 1st Class Staffing. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rice, Robert)
September 9, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by 1st Class Staffing re #8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction REDACTED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Depo Excerpts, #2 Exhibit Offer Letter) (Rice, Robert)
August 30, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Silvia K. Campos-Garcia.(Shurman, Lauren)
August 23, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING ON MOTION re: #8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Per ECF No. 14, Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2021 at 01:30 PM in Rm 8.300 before Judge David Barlow. The court will e-mail Zoom hearing instructions to counsel and the court reporter. Members of the public or media who wish to attend should contact utdecf_barlow@utd.uscourts.gov at least 24 hours in advance of the hearing to request hearing instructions. (tcs)
August 20, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley F. Harward on behalf of Silvia K. Campos-Garcia (Harward, Wesley)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DOCKET TEXT ORDER No attached document. A status conference was held on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Expedited Discovery. Plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Discovery is granted in part and denied in part. The parties may each immediately propound five interrogatories and five requests for production related to the issues raised by the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses will be exchanged within seven days of service. Each side may immediately take one deposition before September 1, 2021. Defendant will have until September 15, 2021 to file her response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff will have until September 29 to file a reply, if any. All evidentiary materials on which the parties intend to rely must be included in the briefing. The court will tentatively set a zoom hearing during the first week of October for the purposes of attorney argument on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. After the court reviews the parties briefs, it may vacate the hearing and decide the motion on the briefs. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 8/18/2021. (ep)
August 18, 2021 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Barlow: Status Conference held on 8/18/2021 re: #8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff 1st Class Staffing. Discussion and argument heard regarding a discovery and briefing schedule. The Court orders that both parties are allowed 5 interrogatories, 5 RFP's, and 1 deposition to be concluded by 9/1/2021. Defendants response is due by 9/15/2021. Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due 14 days after the filing of the response. A hearing will be set shortly after the briefing is filed and may be canceled if the Court deems it can rule from the briefs. Attorney for Plaintiff: Robert Rice, Katherine Priest, Attorney for Defendant: Lauren Shurman. Court Reporter: Laura Robinson.(rlr)
August 16, 2021 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to District Judge per Docket Text Order 10 . Case randomly assigned to Judge David Barlow. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to court policy, Plaintiff's filing of a motion for immediate injunctive relief renders this case ineligible for consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge. See, #8 . Accordingly, the court orders that this case be reassigned to a District Court Judge through the random reassignment process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 08/16/2021.
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Plaintiff 1st Class Staffing. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rice, Robert)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff 1st Class Staffing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decl. of Elizabeth Mobley, #2 Exhibit Agreement, #3 Exhibit Decl. of Joel Steadman, #4 Exhibit LinkedIn Message, #5 Exhibit Text message, #6 Exhibit Email, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Rice, Robert)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/13/21. (alf)
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff 1st Class Staffing, Defendant Silvia Campos-Garcia. Form due by 8/27/2021. (alf)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 File downloaded from Third District Court, Salt Lake County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Motion Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery, Proposed and Not Signed Preliminary Injunction Order, Not signed and Proposed Expedited Discovery Order, Scheduling Conference Notice, Acceptance of Service, Notice of Removal and all applicable state court returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint Return of Electronic Notification, #3 Motion for Prelimnary Injunction and Expedited Discovery, #4 Motion Return of Electronic Notification, #5 Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order, #6 Proposed Order Prelim Inj Return of Electronic Notification, #7 Proposed Order for Expedited Discovery, #8 Proposed Discovery Order Return of Electronic Notification, #9 Scheduling Conference Notice, #10 Telephonic Scheduling Conference Notice, #11 Scheduling Conference Notice Return of Electronic Notification, #12 Acceptance of Service, #13 Acceptance of Service Return of Electronic Notification, #14 Notice of Removal, #15 Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification, #16 Not Signed Expedited Discovery Order, #17 Not Signed Discovery Order Return of Electronic Notification, #18 Not signed Prelim Injunction Order, #19 Not signed Prelim Inj Order Return of Electronic Notification) (alf)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff 1st Class Staffing, Defendant Silvia Campos-Garcia. (nmt)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Lauren A Shurman re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Silvia Campos-Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A docket, #2 Exhibit B complaint, #3 Exhibit C Summons, #4 Exhibit D Motion for PI and proposed, #5 Exhibit E Arizona Corporation Commission, #6 Exhibit F Articles - 1ST CLASS STAFFING LLC, #7 Exhibit G change of agent)(Shurman, Lauren)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 210904137, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4078780) filed by Silvia Campos-Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Shurman, Lauren)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Defendant Silvia Campos-Garcia is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1st Class Staffing v. Campos-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1st Class Staffing
Represented By: Robert O. Rice
Represented By: Katherine E. Priest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvia Campos-Garcia
Represented By: Lauren A. Shurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvia K. Campos-Garcia
Represented By: Lauren A. Shurman
Represented By: Wesley F. Harward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?