Neese v. Longman et al
Plaintiff: Susan Neese
Defendant: Tyler Longman, Colleen Jacobs, West Valley City, West Valley City Police Department, Taylor Atkin, Matthew Lane, Raymond Wilhelm and Jaron Averett
Case Number: 2:2021cv00500
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/16/2022. Motions due by 2/3/2023. See order for other dates and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 9/23/21. (alf)
September 22, 2021 Filing 15 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Mason, Walter)
September 20, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Taylor Atkin, Jaron Averett, Colleen Jacobs, Matthew Lane, Tyler Longman, West Valley City, West Valley City Police Department, Raymond Wilhelm.(White, Heather)
September 8, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendants Taylor Atkin, Jaron Averett, Colleen Jacobs, Matthew Lane, Tyler Longman, West Valley City, West Valley City Police Department, Plaintiff Susan Neese. (alf)
September 7, 2021 Filing 12 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Susan Neese. (alf)
September 2, 2021 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Taylor Atkin, Jaron Averett, Colleen Jacobs, Matthew Lane, Tyler Longman, West Valley City, West Valley City Police Department, Raymond Wilhelm. (alf)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Danica N. Cepernich on behalf of Taylor Atkin, Jaron Averett, Colleen Jacobs, Matthew Lane, Tyler Longman, West Valley City, West Valley City Police Department, Raymond Wilhelm (Cepernich, Danica)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Taylor Atkin, Jaron Averett, Colleen Jacobs, Matthew Lane, Tyler Longman, West Valley City, West Valley City Police Department, Raymond Wilhelm, Plaintiff Susan Neese. Form due by 9/15/2021. (alf)
August 30, 2021 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Complaint Acknowledgment filed by Colleen Jacobs, Raymond Wilhelm, West Valley City, Taylor Atkin, Jaron Averett, West Valley City Police Department, Matthew Lane, Tyler Longman. All Defendants. (White, Heather)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather S. White on behalf of Taylor Atkin, Jaron Averett, Colleen Jacobs, Matthew Lane, Tyler Longman, West Valley City, West Valley City Police Department, Raymond Wilhelm (White, Heather)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/23/21. (alf)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Amended Bond (corrected receipt number) by Susan Neese re #3 Notice (Other) (Mason, Walter)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Undertaking by Susan Neese (Mason, Walter)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Bond by Susan Neese (Mason, Walter)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4088973) filed by Susan Neese. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Mason, Walter)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiff Susan Neese is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neese v. Longman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Neese
Represented By: Colin P. King
Represented By: Paul M. Simmons
Represented By: Walter M. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Longman
Represented By: Heather S. White
Represented By: Danica N. Cepernich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Jacobs
Represented By: Heather S. White
Represented By: Danica N. Cepernich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Valley City
Represented By: Heather S. White
Represented By: Danica N. Cepernich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Valley City Police Department
Represented By: Heather S. White
Represented By: Danica N. Cepernich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Atkin
Represented By: Heather S. White
Represented By: Danica N. Cepernich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Lane
Represented By: Heather S. White
Represented By: Danica N. Cepernich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Wilhelm
Represented By: Heather S. White
Represented By: Danica N. Cepernich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaron Averett
Represented By: Heather S. White
Represented By: Danica N. Cepernich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?