Cook v. Rain International, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christina Rahm Cook
Defendant: Rain International, LLC, Travis Parry and Byron Belka
Case Number: 2:2021cv00542
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Referring Judge: Jill N Parrish
2 Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Travis Parry. (White, Juliette)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Byron Belka, Rain International, LLC. (Grimmer, Matthew)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Byron Belka, Rain International, LLC.(Grimmer, Matthew)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order filed by Defendants Byron Belka, Rain International, LLC (Grimmer, Matthew)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #71 filed by Defendant Travis Parry (White, Juliette)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #71 filed by Plaintiff Christina Rahm Cook (Martinez, Christopher)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/13/21. (ss)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/12/21. (ss)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Matthew G. Grimmer replacing Jonathan H. Love as counsel on behalf of Byron Belka. (Grimmer, Matthew)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Juliette P. White on behalf of Travis Parry (White, Juliette)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish for all further proceedings. Judge Bruce S. Jenkins no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 10/04/2021. (kpf)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Matthew G. Grimmer replacing Jonathan H. Love and Juliette P. White as counsel on behalf of Rain International, LLC. (Grimmer, Matthew)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer/respond. Answer deadline updated for Byron Belka answer due 10/26/2021; Travis Parry answer due 10/26/2021; Rain International, LLC answer due 10/26/2021. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 09/28/2021. (kpf)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Christopher J. Martinez as counsel on behalf of Christina Rahm Cook. (Martinez, Christopher)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #40 Amended Complaint,,, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Byron Belka, Travis Parry, Rain International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond) Attorney Jonathan H. Love added to party Byron Belka(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan H. Love added to party Travis Parry(pty:dft)(Love, Jonathan)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint) (mh)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Kathryn Hannen Walker and Paige Waldrop Mills, for Defendants Byron Belka, Travis Parry, Rain International, LLC (nl)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Jeffrey S. Strickland, for Plaintiff Christina Rahm Cook. (nl)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Case transferred in from USDC of Tennessee Middle; Case Number 3:20-cv-00850. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. USDC of Utah; Case Number 2:21-cv-00542-BSJ. Assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins.
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum, Defendants' motions #48 and #50 are GRANTED in part, and this matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Utah. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/14/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/14/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPLY to Response to re #50 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #48 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint - SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY filed by Byron Belka, Travis Parry, Rain International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer and Counterclaim in Utah Action)(Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPLY filed by Byron Belka, Travis Parry, Rain International, LLC re #50 Motion to Dismiss filed by Byron Belka, Travis Parry, #48 Motion to Dismiss filed by Rain International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum and Order in Utah Case)(Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REPLY to Response to re #50 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Byron Belka, Travis Parry. (Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPLY to Response to re #48 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Rain International, LLC. (Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #48 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Christina Rahm Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Multiple Emails, #2 Exhibit Utah Secretary of State Pages, #3 Exhibit Tennessee Secretary of State Page)(Strickland, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Byron Belka, Travis Parry, Rain International, LLC re #50 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #51 Memorandum in Support, #49 Memorandum in Support, #48 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Conformed Certificate of Service for Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Memoranda in Support (Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#48 , #49 , #50 , and #51 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc) Modified on 2/23/2021 (kc). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Support of #50 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Byron Belka, Travis Parry . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Utah Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Utah Motion to Dismiss)(Mills, Paige)[Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Byron Belka, Travis Parry. (Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Support of #48 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Rain International, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Utah Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Utah Motion to Dismiss)(Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Rain International, LLC. (Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: Pending before the Court are motions to dismiss filed by Defendant Rain International, LLC #21 and Defendants Travis Parry and Byron Belka #19 . Plaintiff filed an amended complaint on February 8, 2021 #40 . Accordingly, the motions to dismiss the original Complaint #1 are MOOT. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/9/2021. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SECOND DECLARATION of Travis Parry filed by Byron Belka, Travis Parry re: #44 Reply to Response to Motion. (Mills, Paige) Modified on 2/9/2021 (kc). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SECOND DECLARATION of Byron Belka filed by Byron Belka, Travis Parry re: #44 Reply to Response to Motion. (Mills, Paige) Modified on 2/9/2021 (kc). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPLY to Response to re #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Byron Belka, Travis Parry. (Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 DECLARATION of Russell Cowley filed by Rain International, LLC re: #41 Reply to Response to Motion. (Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SECOND DECLARATION of Byron Belka filed by Rain International, LLC re: #41 Reply to Response to Motion. (Mills, Paige) Modified on 2/9/2021 (kc). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY to Response to re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rain International, LLC. (Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Christina Rahm Cook. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Verification - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Copyright Cook Explains, #3 Exhibit Copyright Discover Soul, #4 Exhibit Copyright BEND, #5 Exhibit Copyright Rain Pure, #6 Exhibit Copyright BRYT, #7 Exhibit Copyright Doctors on Core, #8 Exhibit Copyright Dr. Cook Explains, #9 Exhibit Copyright Health and Wellness, #10 Exhibit App Screenshot, #11 Exhibit Copyright Opportunity Video, #12 Exhibit Copyright BRYT, #13 Exhibit Copyright Soul Red, #14 Exhibit Copyright Rain, #15 Exhibit Copyright BEND, #16 Exhibit Copyright Doctors on Core, #17 Exhibit Press Release, #18 Exhibit Independent Contractor Services Agreement)(Strickland, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: #38 MOTION GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to strike the erroneously filed Response (Doc. No. 33). The Court will consider the corrected Response (Doc. No. 36) in ruling on the pending Motions to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/3/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss , #21 MOTION to Dismiss by Christina Rahm Cook. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Plaintiff's Memorandum, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Strickland, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: #34 MOTION GRANTED. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby CANCELLED. If necessary, the conference will be reset after ruling on the motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 2/2/2021. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss , #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Christina Rahm Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Cook, #2 Exhibit Emails re Negotiations, #3 Exhibit Rain Int'l Sec of St Record, #4 Exhibit Rain Int'l Sec of St Record, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Thomas, #6 Exhibit Rain Int'l Sec of St Record, #7 Exhibit Emails re Rain w/ Belka Event in TN, #8 Exhibit Unreported Case, Ian v. Bottom Line Record Co, No. 3:16-cv-00187)(Strickland, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#33 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Support of #34 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery and Continue the Initial Case Management Conference filed by Byron Belka, Travis Parry, Rain International, LLC . (Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery and Continue the Initial Case Management Conference by Byron Belka, Travis Parry, Rain International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ***DISREGARD. WRONG DOCUMENT FILED***RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss , #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Christina Rahm Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Cook, #2 Exhibit Emails re Negotiations, #3 Exhibit Rain Int'l Sec of St Record, #4 Exhibit Rain Int'l Sec of St Record, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Thomas, #6 Exhibit Rain Int'l Sec of St Record, #7 Exhibit Emails re Rain w/ Belka Event in TN, #8 Exhibit Unreported Case, Ian v. Bottom Line Record Co, No. 3:16-cv-00187)(Strickland, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/3/2021 (kc). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #27 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan H. Love is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 1/28/2021. (vk) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #26 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Juliette White is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 1/28/2021. (vk) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order UT State Bar status verified as active for Jonathan H. Love and Juliette P. White not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE by Byron Belka, Travis Parry, Rain International, LLC re #25 Declaration, Notice Identifying Exhibits Attached to Declaration #25 (Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE by Rain International, LLC re #22 Memorandum in Support Notice Identifying Exhibits Attached to Memorandum in Support #22 (Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE by Byron Belka, Travis Parry re #20 Memorandum in Support Notice Identifying Exhibits Attached to Memorandum in Support #20 (Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for attorney Jonathan H. Love to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3299574) by Rain International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for attorney Juliette White to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3299570) by Rain International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#20 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#22 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#25 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
January 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DECLARATION of Byron Belka (Corrected with Exhibits) filed by Byron Belka, Travis Parry, Rain International, LLC re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss , #21 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
January 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DECLARATION of Byron Belka filed by Byron Belka, Travis Parry, Rain International, LLC re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss , #21 MOTION to Dismiss . (Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
January 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DECLARATION of Travis Parry filed by Byron Belka, Travis Parry re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss . (Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
January 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rain International, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
January 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Rain International, LLC. (Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
January 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Byron Belka, Travis Parry . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
January 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Byron Belka. (Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Byron Belka answer due 1/18/2021; Travis Parry answer due 1/18/2021; and Rain International, LLC answer due 1/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 12/22/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS returned executed by Christina Rahm Cook. Byron Belka served on 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certified Mail Return Card)(Strickland, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#16 : This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word or WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Christina Rahm Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mailings, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Strickland, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Paige Waldrop Mills and Kathryn Hannen Walker admitted to this court. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Rain International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Waldrop Mills on behalf of All Defendants (Mills, Paige) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed by Christina Rahm Cook. Travis Parry served on 11/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certified Mail Return Card)(Strickland, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Christina Rahm Cook. Rain International, LLC served on 11/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certified Mail Return Card)(Strickland, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: MOTION GRANTED #9 . The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby reset to 2/5/2021 at 10:00 a.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Case Management Conference. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. A proposed case management order shall be filed three (3) days before the conference. Additionally, the proposed order shall also be emailed to chambers at frensleychambers@tnmd.uscourts.gov in Word format. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 12/2/2020. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by Christina Rahm Cook re #9 First MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference Proposed Order (Strickland, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 First MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Christina Rahm Cook. (Strickland, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons issued as to Byron Belka, Travis Parry, and Rain International, LLC. (service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (vh) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Byron Belka, Travis Parry, Rain International, LLC. (Strickland, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/1/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey S. Strickland (Strickland, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (vh) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Byron Belka, Travis Parry, and Rain International, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3226086), filed by Christina Rahm Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Copyright Cook Explains, #2 Exhibit B-Copyright Discover Soul, #3 Exhibit C-Copyright BEND, #4 Exhibit D-Copyright Rain Pure, #5 Exhibit E-Copyright BRYT, #6 Exhibit F-Copyright Doctors on Core, #7 Exhibit G-Copyright Dr. Cook Explains, #8 Exhibit H-Copyright Health and Wellness, #9 Exhibit I-App Screenshot, #10 Exhibit J-Copyright Opportunity Video, #11 Exhibit K-Copyright BRYT, #12 Exhibit L-Copyright Soul Red, #13 Exhibit M-Copyright Rain, #14 Exhibit N-Copyright BEND, #15 Exhibit O-Copyright Doctors on Core, #16 Exhibit P- Press Release, #17 Exhibit Q-Independent Contractor Services Agreement, #18 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Jeffrey S. Strickland admitted to this court. (vh) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/15/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Rain International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Rahm Cook
Represented By: Christopher J. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rain International, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan H. Love
Represented By: Juliette P. White
Represented By: Matthew G. Grimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Parry
Represented By: Jonathan H. Love
Represented By: Juliette P. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Belka
Represented By: Jonathan H. Love
Represented By: Matthew G. Grimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?