Richfield v. Polarityte et al
Plaintiff: Marc Richfield
Defendant: Polarityte, David B. Seaburg, Jacob Alexander Patterson and Richard Hague
Case Number: 2:2021cv00561
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Referring Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM: Status Report and Scheduling Conference, if appropriate, set for 12/10/2021 at 01:15 PM before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. The parties should not appear in person at the courthouse. The Zoom participation information is as follows: Join ZoomGov Meetinghttps://www.zoomgov.com/j/1600221523?pwd=ajljZ3FKdFJ3VWlJbDlzRTMvcHdtZz09Meeting ID: 160 022 1523Passcode: 466859One tap mobile+16692545252,,1600221523#,,,,*466859# US (San Jose)+16692161590,,1600221523#,,,,*466859# US (San Jose)Dial by your location +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 669 216 1590 US (San Jose) +1 646 828 7666 US (New York) +1 551 285 1373 USMeeting ID: 160 022 1523Passcode: 466859Find your local number: https://www.zoomgov.com/u/acIwVtOge9 (kms)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael J. Biles for Richard Hague,Michael J. Biles for Jacob Alexander Patterson,Michael J. Biles for Polarityte,Michael J. Biles for David B. Seaburg.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 11/18/2021. (kpf)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Paul R. Bessette for Richard Hague,Paul R. Bessette for Jacob Alexander Patterson,Paul R. Bessette for Polarityte,Paul R. Bessette for David B. Seaburg.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 11/18/2021. (kpf)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Biles , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4165877,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Richard Hague, Jacob Alexander Patterson, Polarityte, David B. Seaburg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application PHV, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Corey, Jeffrey)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul R. Bessette , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4165837,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Richard Hague, Jacob Alexander Patterson, Polarityte, David B. Seaburg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application PHV, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Corey, Jeffrey)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Case Reassigned to District Judge per Docket Text Order 18. Case randomly assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED: Because this case is a proposed class action, it is not feasible to obtain consent from all parties to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge. Accordingly, the court orders that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/15/2021. (med)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion regarding schedule to file response to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/15/21. (alf)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Richard Hague, Jacob Alexander Patterson, Polarityte, David B. Seaburg. (alf)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION Regarding schedule for filing response to complaint re #2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Richard Hague, Jacob Alexander Patterson, Polarityte, David B. Seaburg. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corey, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Richard Hague, Jacob Alexander Patterson, Polarityte, David B. Seaburg, Plaintiff Marc Richfield. Form due by 11/23/2021. (alf)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Corey on behalf of Richard Hague, Jacob Alexander Patterson, Polarityte, David B. Seaburg (Corey, Jeffrey)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Errata by Marc Richfield re #2 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PSLRA Certification, #2 Exhibit Schedule A) (Harper, Jon)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik A. Christiansen on behalf of Richard Hague, Jacob Alexander Patterson, Polarityte, David B. Seaburg (Christiansen, Erik)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas H. Przybylowski for Marc Richfield.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/2/21. (alf)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas H. Przybylowski , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4134040,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Marc Richfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Harper, Jon)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order denying #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 10/25/2021. (jl)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy A. Lieberman , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4134040,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Marc Richfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Admission)(Harper, Jon)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Amendments to DUCivR 83-1.1 became effective on December 1, 2020. Plaintiff's motion is denied for failure to comply with DUCivR 83-1.1(c). Plaintiff may file a renewed motion after reviewing the revised rule and utilizing the new motion form and application form for pro hac vice status available on the court's website. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 10/8/2021. No attached document. (med)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy A. Lieberman , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4134040,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Marc Richfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Admission)(Harper, Jon)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Jeremy A. Lieberman and J. Alexander Hood II, for Plaintiff Marc Richfield. (mh)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendants in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report, available on the District of Utahs website at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/civil-case-scheduling, within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 09/27/2021. (jl)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint for Violations of Federal Securities Laws against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4121709) filed by Marc Richfield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Harper, Jon)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff Marc Richfield is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richfield v. Polarityte et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Richfield
Represented By: Jon V. Harper
Represented By: Thomas H. Przybylowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polarityte
Represented By: Erik A. Christiansen
Represented By: Michael J. Biles
Represented By: Paul R. Bessette
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Seaburg
Represented By: Erik A. Christiansen
Represented By: Michael J. Biles
Represented By: Paul R. Bessette
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Alexander Patterson
Represented By: Erik A. Christiansen
Represented By: Michael J. Biles
Represented By: Paul R. Bessette
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hague
Represented By: Erik A. Christiansen
Represented By: Michael J. Biles
Represented By: Paul R. Bessette
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?