Ariix LLC v. Nutonic Corporation
Plaintiff: Ariix LLC
Defendant: Nutonic Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv00580
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2021 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ariix LLC as to Nutonic Corporation served on 10/8/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Horton, Kenneth)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Ariix LLC identifying NewAge, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Horton, Kenneth)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF POSSIBLE ERROR re #4 Affidavit of Service. Description of possible error: Affidavit of Service used for request of unissued summons. The entry has been adjusted by being stricken, summons issued at docket #7 . (nl)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Nutonic Corporation. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 Modification of Docket: Error: Complaint was emailed to the court on 10/01/2021 but the filing fee was not paid until 10/04/2021. Correction: Changed filing date and fee date to 10/04/2021. The date the complaint was e-filed and paid re #2 Complaint. (nmt)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nmt)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 STRICKEN - WRONG EVENT USED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Summons in a Civil Action served on Nutonic Corporation, filed by Plaintiff Ariix LLC. (Horton, Kenneth) Modified on 10/5/2021 stricken, counsel used wrong event to request summons to be issued. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. Summons issued see docket #7 (nl).
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 ERRATA to #2 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Ariix LLC -- Civil Cover Sheet (erroneously left off of filing). (Horton, Kenneth)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Nutonic Corporation (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4129999) filed by Ariix LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Horton, Kenneth)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff Ariix LLC is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ariix LLC v. Nutonic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariix LLC
Represented By: Kenneth E. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutonic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?