Cricut v. Enough For Everyone et al
Plaintiff: Cricut
Defendant: Enough For Everyone and Desiree Tanner
Case Number: 2:2021cv00601
Filed: October 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Lannie Rex Sears on behalf of Enough For Everyone, Desiree Tanner (Sears, Lannie)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Sterling Arthur Brennan on behalf of Enough For Everyone, Desiree Tanner (Brennan, Sterling)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cricut as to Enough For Everyone Waiver sent on 10/18/2021, answer due 12/17/2021. (Stewart, Jeremy)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cricut as to Desiree Tanner Waiver sent on 10/18/2021, answer due 12/17/2021. (Stewart, Jeremy)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Paul J. Reilly for Cricut.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 10/20/2021. (jl)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul J. Reilly , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4143397,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Cricut. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stewart, Jeremy)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 EXHIBITS filed by Cricut re #2 Complaint,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2005 Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - 2007 Agreement)(Stewart, Jeremy)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Susan Cannon Kennedy for Cricut.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 10/14/2021. (jl)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David Tobin for Cricut.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 10/14/2021. (jl)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 10/14/2021. (jl)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Susan Kennedy , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4138403,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Cricut. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Susan Kennedy Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Susan Kennedy)(Stewart, Jeremy)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David Tobin , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4138379,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Cricut. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - David Tobin Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of David Tobin)(Stewart, Jeremy)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re #2 Complaint,,, Exhibits A and B filed by Plaintiff Cricut. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits A & B to the Complaint)(Stewart, Jeremy)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Desiree Tanner. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Enough For Everyone. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Paul J. Reilly, David Tobin, and Susan Kennedy, for Plaintiff Cricut (nmt)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4137579) filed by Cricut. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Consulting Agreement (2005 Agreement) (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit B - Consulting Services and Royalty Agreement (2007 Agreement) (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit C - United States design patent D533,582, #5 Exhibit D - United States design patent D533,897, #6 Exhibit E - United States design patent D534,204, #7 Exhibit F - United States design patent D534,205, #8 Exhibit G - United States design patent D541,843, #9 Exhibit H - United States design patent D541,844, #10 Errata I - United States desigin patent D543,583, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Barlow (Stewart, Jeremy)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Barlow. Plaintiff Cricut is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cricut v. Enough For Everyone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cricut
Represented By: Matthew L. Lalli
Represented By: Jeremy J. Stewart
Represented By: Sarah Anne Hafen
Represented By: David Tobin
Represented By: Paul J. Reilly
Represented By: Susan Cannon Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enough For Everyone
Represented By: Sterling Arthur Brennan
Represented By: Lannie Rex Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desiree Tanner
Represented By: Sterling Arthur Brennan
Represented By: Lannie Rex Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?