Bacon v. US Marshal Service et al
Plaintiff: Micheal A. Bacon and Michael A. Bacon
Defendant: U.S. Marshal Service, Salt Lake County Jail, Sheriff of Salt Lake County, Salt Lake County Jail Clinical Services Director, Cache County Jail, Sheriff of Cache County, Cache County Jail Clinical Director, Bureau of Prisons, Director of of the BOP, GED Care, Director of the GED Care, US Marshal Service and GEO Care
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 2:2021cv00633
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ERRATA to #6 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Bacon. Signed Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury page. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Request for docket. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. Docket was sent 12/20/21 to address on file. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jl)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A. Bacon re #8 MOTION for Court Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1). (jl)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A. Bacon re #8 MOTION for Court Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1)(jl)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Request for complaint. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. Complaint sent to address on file. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Michael A. Bacon received from Correctional Institution. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl) Modified by correcting filing date on 12/15/2021 (jl).
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Correspondence from Michael Bacon re #8 MOTION for Court Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jl)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Correspondence from Petitioner re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jl)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #8 MOTION for Court Order re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,, Order on Motion for Service of Process - Prisoner, filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Bacon. (kpf)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Correspondence from Petitioner to the Office of the Clerk re: #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jwt)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Court Order re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Bacon. (jwt)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge Jill N. Parrish recused. Case reassigned to Judge David Barlow for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 11/3/21. (alf)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Originally received by the court on 10/25/2021). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Michael A. Bacon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (mh)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #4 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/03/2021. (mh)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Bacon. (mh)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Bacon. (mh)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Motion for Appointment of Counsel, Service of Process, and Envelope.. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #3 Service of Process, #4 Envelope)(nmt)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 10/25/2021) filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Bacon. (nmt) Modified by correcting spelling of name on 10/29/2021 (nmt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bacon v. US Marshal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheal A. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Marshal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff of Salt Lake County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake County Jail Clinical Services Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cache County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff of Cache County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cache County Jail Clinical Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of of the BOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GED Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of the GED Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Marshal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?