Bacon v. Cache County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Michael A. Bacon
Defendant: Cache County Jail, Chad Jensen, US Marshal Service, Nathan Harris, Salt Lake County Jail, Rosie Rivera and Rob Ballard
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 2:2021cv00648
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 18 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A. Bacon re #7 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1). (jl)
December 17, 2021 Filing 17 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Request for docket. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. Docket sent 12/20/21 to address on file. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
December 17, 2021 Filing 16 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A. Bacon re #8 MOTION for Court Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1). (jl)
December 17, 2021 Filing 15 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A. Bacon re #8 MOTION for Court Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1). (jl)
December 14, 2021 Filing 14 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Request for complaint. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. Complaint sent to address on file. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
December 14, 2021 Filing 13 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Michael A. Bacon received from Correctional Institution. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
December 10, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #8 MOTION for Court Order filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Bacon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
December 8, 2021 Filing 11 Correspondence from Michael Bacon re #8 MOTION for Court Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
December 6, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #8 MOTION for Court Order filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Bacon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jl)
November 29, 2021 Filing 9 Correspondence from Plaintiff re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jl)
November 29, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Court Order filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Bacon. (mh)
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Originally received by the court on 11/01/2021). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Michael A. Bacon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to The Court, #2 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #3 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (mh)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No; denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #5 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/29/2021. (mh)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Bacon. (mh)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Bacon. (mh)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Motion for court order. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint, Motion for Appointment of Counsel, Motion for Service of Process, Letter, Civil Cover Sheet and Envelopes. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #2 Motion for Service of Process, #3 Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Envelope)(mh)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 11/01/2021) filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Bacon. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bacon v. Cache County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cache County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Marshal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosie Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?