Sivatia et al v. Fox et al
Plaintiff: Atonio Sivatia and Nonnie L. Masaniai Pea
Defendant: Ammon Fox, James Williams, Nick Green, Chad Faubion and West Valley City
Case Number: 2:2021cv00761
Filed: December 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atonio Sivatia, Nonnie L. Masaniai Pea as to Chad Faubion served on 2/3/2022, answer due 2/24/2022. (Sykes, Robert)
February 4, 2022 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atonio Sivatia, Nonnie L. Masaniai Pea as to Nick Green served on 2/1/2022, answer due 2/22/2022. (Sykes, Robert)
February 4, 2022 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atonio Sivatia, Nonnie L. Masaniai Pea as to James Williams served on 1/31/2022, answer due 2/22/2022. (Sykes, Robert)
February 4, 2022 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atonio Sivatia, Nonnie L. Masaniai Pea as to Ammon Fox served on 1/31/2022, answer due 2/22/2022. (Sykes, Robert)
February 4, 2022 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atonio Sivatia, Nonnie L. Masaniai Pea as to West Valley City served on 1/31/2022, answer due 2/22/2022. (Sykes, Robert)
January 28, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Atonio Sivatia, Nonnie L. Masaniai Pea. (Sorensen, Christopher)
December 29, 2021 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Chad Faubion. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
December 29, 2021 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Nick Green. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to James Williams. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Ammon Fox. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to West Valley City. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4204154) filed by Atonio Sivatia, Nonnie L. Masaniai Pea. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet to Complaint) Assigned to Judge David Barlow (Sykes, Robert)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Barlow. Plaintiffs Nonnie L. Masaniai Pea, Atonio Sivatia is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sivatia et al v. Fox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atonio Sivatia
Represented By: Robert B. Sykes
Represented By: Christina Dawn Isom
Represented By: Christopher Peter Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nonnie L. Masaniai Pea
Represented By: Robert B. Sykes
Represented By: Christina Dawn Isom
Represented By: Christopher Peter Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ammon Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Faubion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Valley City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?