Fortson et al v. Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Elizabeth V. Fortson
Defendant: Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Petitioner: InMoment
Case Number: 2:2021mc00588
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Howard C Nielson
2 Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to case. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/09/2021. (jl)
October 27, 2021 Filing 20 **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #17 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #2 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum (Short Form Discovery Motion) filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth V. FortsonNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Lance Kaufman)(Destefano, John)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 10/25/21. (dla)
October 21, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re #17 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth V. Fortson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Destefano, John)
October 21, 2021 Filing 17 Redacted MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum (Short Form Discovery Motion) filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth V. Fortson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of John DeStefano, #2 Exhibit [REDACTED] Declaration of Lance Kaufman)(Destefano, John)
October 21, 2021 Filing 16 Modification of Docket: Error: Documents #14 and #15 are stricken per request of counsel and on advice of docketing clerk. Documents will be refiled. (alf)
October 20, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re #14 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth V. Fortson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Destefano, John) Modified on 10/21/2021 - stricken at counsel's request, will refile (alf).
October 20, 2021 Filing 14 Redacted MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum (Short Form Discovery Motion) filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth V. Fortson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of John DeStefano, #2 Exhibit [Redacted] Declaration of Lance Kaufman)(Destefano, John) Modified on 10/21/2021 - stricken at counsel's request (alf).
October 18, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion to Transfer Related Case Pursuant to Local Rule DUCivR 83-2(g) by InMoment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lewis, Matthew)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Quash Subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 10/18/2021. (dla)
October 15, 2021 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth V. Fortson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Destefano, John)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John DeStefano, III for Elizabeth V. Fortson.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 10/15/21. (dla)
October 14, 2021 Filing 9 Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John DeStefano III , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4139879,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth V. Fortson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Application)(North, Kara)
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kara H. North on behalf of Elizabeth V. Fortson (North, Kara)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney George C. Chipev for InMoment.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 10/12/21. (dla)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Marguerite M. Sullivan for InMoment.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 10/12/21. (dla)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 10/12/21. (dla)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of George C. Chipev , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4134158,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Petitioner InMoment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of George C. Chipev)(Lewis, Matthew)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marguerite M. Sullivan , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4134152,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Petitioner InMoment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Marguerite M. Sullivan)(Lewis, Matthew)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum (Short Form Discovery Motion) filed by Petitioner InMoment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena Duces Tecum, #2 Declaration of Robert C. Levels in Support of Non-Party InMoment, Inc.'s Short Form Discovery Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, Matthew)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Petitioner InMoment is directed to E-File the Miscellaneous Case FIling Fee - Motion to Quash and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 49.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nmt)
October 7, 2021 Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee for Short Form Discovery Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum received from Petitioner InMoment. (Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AUTDC-4134108). (Lewis, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortson et al v. Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth V. Fortson
Represented By: J. Michael Malone
Represented By: Jason Lanier Hendren
Represented By: John M. Destefano
Represented By: Robert B. Carey
Represented By: John M. Destefano, III
Represented By: Kara H. North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: InMoment
Represented By: Matthew R. Lewis
Represented By: Jason R. Burt
Represented By: George C. Chipev
Represented By: Marguerite M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Albert G. Lin
Represented By: Andrea C. Wiltrout
Represented By: Kevin P. Zimmerman
Represented By: Kimberly M. Marston
Represented By: Martina T. Ellerbe
Represented By: Mathew G. Drocton
Represented By: Matthew B. Tynan
Represented By: Reid L. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?