Ravines de Schur et al v. Berntsen et al
Plaintiff: Ana Maria Ravines de Schur, Nathan Schur and Jessica Johannes
Defendant: Lori Bernsten, Coleman Plummer and Lori Berntsen
Case Number: 2:2022cv00013
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. The court ORDERS that the listed cases be transferred to Judge David Barlow and referred to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) for all future proceedings. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 02/09/2022. (jl)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REGARDING PENDING SCREENING UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915. See order. Plaintiffs must not file any motions or other documents during the time the case is screened or until the court orders otherwise. If such documents are filed, they will be lodged on the docket and will not be addressed until screening is completed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 2/7/22. (alf)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying #17 Motion to Request Merging Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 02/07/2022. (jl)
February 7, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION "to Request Access to PACER" filed by Plaintiff Ana Maria Ravines de Schur. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(alf) Modified on 2/7/2022 to correct document title (alf).
February 7, 2022 Filing 23 WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Plaintiffs Jessica Johannes, Ana Maria Ravines de Schur, Nathan Schur re #22 MOTION "to Review Intend by Plaintiff Jessica Johannes". filed by Ana Maria Ravines de Schur. Document entitled "Reverse Motion to Review Intend by Jessica Johannes". (alf)
February 4, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION "to Review Intend by Plaintiff Jessica Johannes". filed by Plaintiff Ana Maria Ravines de Schur. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(alf)
February 4, 2022 Filing 21 The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment Form has now passed. The parties did not file, therefore the case is ineligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge David Barlow as presider and Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg as (b)(1)(B) referral judge. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to the case as presider. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(alf)
February 3, 2022 Filing 20 **SEALED DOCUMENT** filed by Plaintiff Ana Maria Ravines de Schur. (alf)
February 3, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF FILING of "Reconciliation Imagine Nations" filed by Plaintiff Ana Maria Ravines de Schur. (alf)
February 3, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF FILING of "Germanic Race Ideologies" filed by Plaintiff Ana Maria Ravines de Schur. (alf)
February 3, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Request Merging Cases to Judge Aberg (sic) filed by Plaintiff Ana Maria Ravines de Schur. (alf)
January 21, 2022 Filing 16 OBJECTIONS to #15 Order on Motion to Expedite filed by Jessica Johannes, Ana Maria Ravines de Schur, Nathan Schur. (alf)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Expedite Service of Process by USMS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/21/22. (alf) Modified on 1/24/2022 to correct date. (alf).
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to File Amended Complaint by 2/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/21/22. (alf)
January 20, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Email Filing and Notification Form by Jessica Johannes. (alf)
January 20, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Email Filing and Notification Form by Nathan Schur. (alf)
January 20, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Email Filing and Notification Form by Ana Maria Ravines de Schur. (alf)
January 19, 2022 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Insufficient Address. Mail sent to Ana Maria Ravines de Schur - NEF re: Lodged Summonses #8 . (alf) Modified on 1/19/2022 to correct spelling error (alf).
January 19, 2022 NAME CORRECTION of Lori Bernsten. Corrected Name: Lori Berntsen. (jwt)
January 13, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Expedite Service of Process by USMS filed by Plaintiffs Jessica Johannes, Ana Maria Ravines de Schur, Nathan Schur. (alf)
January 11, 2022 Filing 8 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Summonses. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mh)
January 6, 2022 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Lori Bernsten, Coleman Plummer (Originally received by the court on 01/06/2022). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Ana Maria Ravines de Schur, Jessica Johannes, Nathan Schur. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (nmt)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ; granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 01/06/2022. (nmt)
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE to Pro Se Plaintiffs - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 28 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Jessica Johannes, Ana Maria Ravines de Schur, Nathan Schur. Form due by 2/3/2022. (alf)
January 6, 2022 Filing 4 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmt)
January 6, 2022 Filing 3 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 01/06/2022) filed by Plaintiff Jessica Johannes. (nmt)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 01/06/2022) filed by Plaintiff Nathan Schur. (nmt)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 01/06/2022) filed by Plaintiff Ana Maria Ravines de Schur. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ravines de Schur et al v. Berntsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Maria Ravines de Schur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Schur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Johannes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Bernsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coleman Plummer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Berntsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?