Lewis v. Eassist
Plaintiff: Christina Lewis
Defendant: Eassist
Case Number: 2:2022cv00121
Filed: February 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Howard C Nielson
2 Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #27 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown, Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's #17 Motion for Conditional Certification is temporarily extended until fourteen days after the court's ruling on Defendant's #18 Motion to Continue Deadlines Regarding Conditional Certification, pending further order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 4/20/2022. No attached document. (med)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time Continue Deadlines filed by Defendant Eassist. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Monson, Sean)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support to Compel Mediation filed by Defendant Eassist. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Taylor Anderson)(Monson, Sean)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DOCKET TEXT ORDER: Defendant has filed a #18 motion to continue deadlines related to Plaintiff's #17 Motion for Conditional Certification, seeking to extend Defendant's response deadline pending a ruling on Defendant's #16 Motion to Dismiss. The motion to continue was fully briefed on April 7, 2022, and the deadline Defendant seeks to extend--the deadline to respond to the Motion for Conditional Certification--is April 11, 2022. To permit the court adequate time to address the issues raised in the parties' briefing and to rule on the motion to continue before this response deadline passes, the court hereby grants a limited extension of Defendant's deadline to respond to the Motion for Conditional Certification through April 22, 2022. The court finds good cause for this limited extension pending a ruling on Defendant's motion to continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 4/7/2022. No attached document.(med)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Continue deadlines related to motion for conditional certification and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Eassist. (Monson, Sean)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support to Compel Mediation filed by Plaintiff Christina Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Kuklinski, Amanda)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DOCKET TEXT ORDER: Defendant may file a reply in support of its Motion to Continue Deadlines Regarding Conditional Certification #18 no later than 5:00 PM on April 7, 2022. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 4/6/2022. (med)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Continue deadlines related to motion for conditional certification and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Christina Lewis. (Kuklinski, Amanda)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric U. Johnson on behalf of Eassist (Johnson, Eric)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DOCKET TEXT ORDER: Any response or opposition to Defendant's Motion to Continue Deadlines Regarding Conditional Certification #18 shall be filed by April 5, 2022. No reply is permitted unless ordered by the court. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/31/2022. (med)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Continue deadlines related to motion for conditional certification and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Eassist. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg. Attorney Aaron M. Worthen added to party Eassist(pty:dft)(Worthen, Aaron)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Christina Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Attachment 1, #3 Exhibit Attachment 2, #4 Exhibit Attachment 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Kuklinski, Amanda)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support to Compel Mediation filed by Defendant Eassist. Attorney Sean A. Monson added to party Eassist(pty:dft)(Monson, Sean)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christina Lewis as to Christina Lewis served on 3/2/2022, answer due 3/23/2022. (Kuklinski, Amanda)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #13 Certificate of Service. The document should be docketed as a "Summons Returned Executed", with a copy of the summons and summons return attached. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading using the event noted above. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (dla)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christina Lewis SUMMONS; CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION AS NAMED PLAINTIFF; CIVIL COVERSHEET; COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT FOR COMPENSATION UNDER 29 U.S.C. 201, ET SEQ. AND JURY DEMAND; ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE to TAYLOR ANDERSON (Kuklinski, Amanda)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Amanda Kuklinski for Christina Lewis.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 2/28/22. (dla)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 2/28/22. (dla)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING MOTION #8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amanda Kuklinski , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4259619,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case filed by Christina Lewis. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr., on 2/25/2022. (mlp)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 2/25/22. (dla)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amanda Kuklinski , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4259619,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Christina Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Sipherd, Brandon)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Reassigned to District Judge per docket text order 6 . Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Because this case is a proposed collective action, it is not feasible to obtain consent from all parties to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the court orders that this case be reassigned to a District Judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 02/24/2022. (docket text order; no attached document) (aja)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent to Join Collective Action as Named Plaintiff by Christina Lewis re #2 Complaint (Sipherd, Brandon)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Eassist. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Amanda Kuklinski, for Plaintiff Christina Lewis. (mh)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Eassist (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4256120) filed by Christina Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Sipherd, Brandon)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiff Christina Lewis is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Eassist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Lewis
Represented By: Jason D. Haymore
Represented By: Brandon Scott Sipherd
Represented By: Amanda M. Kuklinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eassist
Represented By: Eric U. Johnson
Represented By: Sean A. Monson
Represented By: Aaron M. Worthen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?