Bernacchi v. State of Utah et al
Plaintiff: Doug Allen Bernacchi
Defendant: State of Utah, The Supreme Court of Utah, Thomas Rex Lee, Barbara Townsend, Nicole Gray, Utah Supreme Court and Hon. Thomas Rex Lee
Case Number: 2:2022cv00308
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER consolidating this case into case 2:22cv00256 TC. Cases associated. Set NO_DOCKETING, CONSOLIDATED, CLOSED Flag(s). All future filings must be made in case 2:22cv00256 TC. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 5/26/22 (alt)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Civil Case Terminated per merge into case 2:22cv00256 TC - CASE CLOSED (alt)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Doug Allen Bernacchi (Attachments: #1 Docs filed in We Dist of VA) (alt)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying #10 Motion to Reconsider #8 Memorandum Decision. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 5/18/22 (alt)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Emergency MOTION to Reconsider re #8 Memorandum Decision denying TRO and Memorandum in Support, filed by Plaintiff Doug Allen Bernacchi (alt)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that case 2:22cv00308 is to be consolidated into case 2:22cv00256 on 5/26/22 barring an objection from a party in interest being filed - objections must be filed by no later than 5/25/22. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 5/11/22 (alt)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying request for temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 5/11/22 (alt)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Tena Campbell for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 5/9/22. (alf)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case transferred in from USDC of Virginia Western; Case Number 3:22-cv-00019. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. USDC District of Utah case number 2:22-cv-00308 assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett.
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order transferring case to United States District Court for the District of Utah. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 5/5/2022. (hnw) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/5/2022.]
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #2 Complaint, by Doug Allen Bernacchi (hnw) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/5/2022.]
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Additional Evidence - Exhibit B re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Doug Allen Bernacchi (hnw) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/5/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Emergency TRO and Injunctive Relief against Nicole Gray, Thomas Rex Lee, State of Utah, The Supreme Court of Utah, Barbara Townsend, Unknown Defendants, filed by Doug Allen Bernacchi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Ex 1-13, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/5/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Doug Allen Bernacchi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(hnw) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 5/5/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernacchi v. State of Utah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Allen Bernacchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Supreme Court of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Rex Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Thomas Rex Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?