Slim Ventures v. USA et al
Petitioner: Slim Ventures
Respondent: USA, Internal Revenue Service and Timothy Bauer
Case Number: 2:2022cv00345
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Daphne A Oberg
2 Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7609 IRS: Petition to Quash IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A). Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 06/06/2022. (dah)
May 31, 2022 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Slim Ventures. (Witte, Daniel)
May 24, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Summons- US Attorney Office by Slim Ventures. Summons issued per counsel's request. (mh)
May 24, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Summons- Timothy Bauer by Slim Ventures. Summons issued per counsel's request. (mh)
May 24, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Summons- Attorney General for Administration by Slim Ventures. Summons issued per counsel's request. (mh)
May 23, 2022 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to District Judge per Docket Text Order 4 . Case randomly assigned to Judge David Barlow. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED: Due to the procedural posture of the case, including the filing of a petition to quash a summons with a compliance date of June 6, 2022, the court orders that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 5/23/2022. (med)
May 23, 2022 Filing 3 STRICKEN MOTION to Quash IRS Summons On Third Party Zions and Memorandum in Support (Petition To Quash) filed by Petitioner Slim Ventures. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Slim Quash Zions, #2 Supplement Petition Verification Signature, #3 Affidavit -- Bishop Declaration, #4 Affidavit -- Bishop Declaration Signature Page, #5 Exhibit -- Regarding Third Party Presence In Utah, #6 Exhibit -- Copy Of IRS Summons To Be Quashed, #7 Text of Proposed Order -- To Quash Summons)(Witte, Daniel) Modified on 5/23/2022 Striking motion per telephone conversation had with counsel (mh).
May 23, 2022 STRICKEN Civil Case Filing Fee for Motion to Quash IRS Summons received from Petitioner Slim Ventures. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4339643). (Witte, Daniel) Modified on 5/23/2022 payment to be applied to case 2:22cv348 (mh).
May 23, 2022 Motions terminated: #3 MOTION to Quash IRS Summons On Third Party Zions and Memorandum in Support (Petition To Quash) filed by Slim Ventures per phone conservation with counsel. (mh)
May 20, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Quash IRS Summons and Memorandum in Support (Petition To Quash) filed by Petitioner Slim Ventures. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Slim & Summit, #2 Supplement --Petition Verification Signature, #3 Affidavit --Bishop Declaration, #4 Affidavit -- Bishop Declaration Signature Page, #5 Exhibit --Regarding Presence Of Third Parties In Utah, #6 Exhibit -- Copy of IRS Summons To Be Quashed, #7 Text of Proposed Order -- To Quash Summons)(Witte, Daniel)
May 20, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Petitioner Slim Ventures is directed to E-File the Civil Case Filing Fee (found under Other Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day. Once the filing fee event is completed the initiating document (Motion to Quash IRS Summons and cover sheet ) may be E-filed.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)
May 20, 2022 Civil Case Filing Fee for Petition to Quash IRS Summons received from Petitioner Slim Ventures. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4339223). (Witte, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slim Ventures v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Slim Ventures
Represented By: Daniel E. Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?