Employers Mutual Casualty v. Roll-Rite et al
Plaintiff: EMC Insurance and Employers Mutual Casualty
Defendant: Roll-Rite, Safe Fleet Acquisition and Pulltarps
Case Number: 2:2022cv00393
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Daphne A Oberg
2 Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 8/8/22. (dla)
July 12, 2022 Filing 16 Case Reassigned to District Judge per #15 Attorney Planning Meeting Report. Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to the case. (mh)
July 8, 2022 Filing 15 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order (proposed))(Simon, Kevin)
July 1, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Pulltarps, Roll-Rite, Safe Fleet Acquisition.(Trayner, Stephen)
June 30, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #5 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jennifer A. Poynter for Employers Mutual Casualty.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 6/23/22. (alf)
June 22, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer A. Poynter , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4368494,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Employers Mutual Casualty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Simon, Kevin)
June 22, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Roll-Rite, Safe Fleet Acquisition. New Plaintiffs: Employers Mutual Casualty Company a/s/o Atmosphere Studios LLC and Fabrizio Transport, Inc.. Removed Plaintiffs: EMC Insurance Companies. Removed Defendants: Pulltarps. filed by EMC Insurance. (Simon, Kevin)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend Complaint - Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint within ten days of this order. Once filed on the docket, the amended complaint will be the operative complaint in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 06/21/2022. (jl)
June 20, 2022 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff EMC Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Simon, Kevin)
June 15, 2022 Filing 7 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Pulltarps, Roll-Rite, Safe Fleet Acquisition. (alf)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 6/14/22. (alf)
June 14, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff EMC Insurance, Defendants Pulltarps, Roll-Rite, Safe Fleet Acquisition. Form due by 6/29/2022. (alf)
June 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Jennifer A. Poynter, for Plaintiff EMC Insurance. (mh)
June 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff EMC Insurance, Defendants Pulltarps, Roll-Rite, Safe Fleet Acquisition. (mh)
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt lake County, case number 220902931, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number CUTDC-4361067) filed by Safe Fleet Acquisition, Roll-Rite, Pulltarps. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Trayner, Stephen)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Defendants Pulltarps, Roll-Rite, Safe Fleet Acquisition are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Employers Mutual Casualty v. Roll-Rite et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMC Insurance
Represented By: Kevin J. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers Mutual Casualty
Represented By: Jennifer A. Poynter
Represented By: Kevin J. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roll-Rite
Represented By: Stephen J. Trayner
Represented By: John M. Zidow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safe Fleet Acquisition
Represented By: Stephen J. Trayner
Represented By: John M. Zidow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulltarps
Represented By: Stephen J. Trayner
Represented By: John M. Zidow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?