A.K.B v. Amazon.com Services et al
Plaintiff: A.K.B, Great American Insurance Company and Oxspring Paul LLC
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, Motorola Mobility and ICEASI
Case Number: 2:2022cv00405
Filed: June 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Jared C Bennett
2 Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Consolidate Cases - Case No. 2:22-cv-00465-BSJ is hereby CONSOLIDATED into Case No. 2:22-cv-00405-DBB-JCB for all purposes. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 08/08/2022. (jl)
August 7, 2022 Filing 24 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum in Support (Notice of Non-Opppositon to Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC's Motion for Consolidation of Actions) filed by Plaintiff A.K.B. (Simon, Kevin)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DOCKET TEXT ORDER: On July 20, 2022, Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC filed #12 Motion for Consolidation of Actions. Under DUCivR 7-1(a)(4)(D), any response to this motion was due 14 days after the service thereof. More than 14 days have passed since this motion was filed, and Plaintiff A.K.B., Inc. has filed no response. Plaintiff is therefore ordered to submit a response, no later than August 11, 2022, stating its intention to not file a response, or providing good cause as to why the deadline to respond should be further extended. Failure to do so will result in the court considering Defendant's motion to be unopposed. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 08/04/2022. (docket text order; no attached document) (aja)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Steven L. Theesfeld for A.K.B.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 08/04/2022. (jl)
August 4, 2022 Filing 21 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services. (Venti, Katherine)
August 3, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven L. Theesfeld , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4407091,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff A.K.B. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Simon, Kevin)
July 21, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Motorola Mobility.(Seminario, Rafael)
July 21, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Rafael A. Seminario on behalf of Motorola Mobility (Seminario, Rafael)
July 21, 2022 Filing 17 Motions No Longer Referred: #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum in Support. (dah)
July 21, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Amazon.com Services.(Venti, Katherine)
July 20, 2022 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services identifying Amazon.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Venti, Katherine)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge Ted Stewart recused. Case reassigned to Judge David Barlow for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 07/20/2022. (jl)
July 20, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order) Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Venti, Katherine)
July 20, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine E. Venti on behalf of Amazon.com Services (Venti, Katherine)
July 1, 2022 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by A.K.B as to Amazon.com Services served on 6/30/2022, answer due 7/21/2022. (Simon, Kevin)
July 1, 2022 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by A.K.B as to Motorola Mobility served on 6/30/2022, answer due 7/21/2022. (Simon, Kevin)
June 29, 2022 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Motorola Mobility. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
June 29, 2022 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to ICEASI. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
June 29, 2022 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Amazon.com Services. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 06/17/2022. (jl)
June 16, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Steven Theesfeld, for Plaintiff A.K.B.. (mh)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 6/16/2022. (tlc)
June 16, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4364844) filed by A.K.B. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (Simon, Kevin)
June 16, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Plaintiff A.K.B is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.K.B v. Amazon.com Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.K.B
Represented By: Kevin J. Simon
Represented By: Steven L. Theesfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce C. Burt
Represented By: Jason J. Fratts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oxspring Paul LLC
Represented By: Bruce C. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services
Represented By: Katherine E. Venti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility
Represented By: Rafael A. Seminario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICEASI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?