Vigil et al v. Salt Lake City et al
Plaintiff: John Vigil, Letitia Vigil, Abriana Vigil and Dylan Beckstead
Defendant: Salt Lake City, Salt Lake County, Unified Police Department, Orin J Neal, Jerry Valdez, Jason Albrecht and Jared Stillion
Case Number: 2:2022cv00462
Filed: July 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Howard C Nielson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2022 Filing 17 Remark: The deadline to submit the Magistrate Availability Form has now passed. The form was not submitted, therefore the case is ineligible for magistrate presider assignment and shall remain with District Judge. (alf)
August 16, 2022 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Salt Lake City. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks)
August 16, 2022 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Salt Lake County. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks)
August 16, 2022 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Unified Police Department. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks)
July 26, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE to Plaintiffs - Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. The magistrate judge may only preside over this case if all parties voluntarily sign and return the #Consent Form To consent, to have a magistrate judge preside over this case, please complete and return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not file the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Dylan Beckstead, Abriana Vigil, John Vigil, Letitia Vigil. Form due by 8/16/2022. (alf)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 7/14/22. (dla)
July 13, 2022 Filing 11 Modification of Docket: Error: Counsel submitted a new complaint to the court by email on 7/11/2022, but did not efile the complaint and pay the filing fee until 7/12/2022. Correction: The filing date has been changed to 7/12/2022 to reflect the date the fee was paid and complaint efiled, re #2 Complaint. (ks)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 7/13/22. (dla)
July 12, 2022 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Orin J Neal. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
July 12, 2022 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Salt Lake City. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
July 12, 2022 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Salt Lake County. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
July 12, 2022 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jason Albrecht. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
July 12, 2022 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Unified Police Department. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
July 12, 2022 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jared Stillion. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
July 12, 2022 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jerry Valdez. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
July 12, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 012306) filed by Abriana Vigil, John Vigil, Letitia Vigil, Dylan Beckstead. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Bourg, Brandon)
July 11, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Plaintiffs Dylan Beckstead, Abriana Vigil, John Vigil, and Letitia Vigil are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402. by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vigil et al v. Salt Lake City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Vigil
Represented By: Michael K. Hepworth
Represented By: Brandon Bourg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Letitia Vigil
Represented By: Michael K. Hepworth
Represented By: Brandon Bourg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abriana Vigil
Represented By: Michael K. Hepworth
Represented By: Brandon Bourg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Beckstead
Represented By: Michael K. Hepworth
Represented By: Brandon Bourg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orin J Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Albrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Stillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?