Great American Insurance Company et al v. Amazon.com Services et al
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company and Oxspring Paul LLC
Defendant: Amazon.com Services and Motorola Mobility
Case Number: 2:2022cv00465
Filed: July 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Jared C Bennett
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2022 Filing 16 THIS CASE HAS BEEN CLOSED pursuant to order of consolidation. All docketing will be in the lead case 2:22-cv-00405-DBB-JCB. Case Reassigned to Judge David Barlow. Judge Bruce S. Jenkins no longer assigned to the case. NO FURTHER DOCKETING ON THIS CASE. (jl)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER of Consolidation - Case No. 2:22-cv-00465-BSJ is hereby CONSOLIDATED into Case No. 2:22-cv-00405-DBB-JCB for all purposes. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 08/08/2022. (jl)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge Ted Stewart recused. Case reassigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 08/05/2022. (jl)
August 4, 2022 Filing 13 The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment Forms has now passed. One or more of the parties failed to file, therefore the case is ineligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
August 3, 2022 Filing 12 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Amazon.com Services. (alf)
August 3, 2022 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Motorola Mobility. (alf)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason J. Fratts for Great American Insurance Company.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/3/22. (alf)
August 2, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason J. Fratts , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4405896,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Burt, Bruce)
July 20, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Motorola Mobility.(Seminario, Rafael)
July 20, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services identifying Amazon.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Venti, Katherine)
July 20, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of of Motion for Consolidation of Action by Amazon.com Services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Venti, Katherine)
July 20, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Amazon.com Services.(Venti, Katherine)
July 13, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return #the form on this link To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not file the Consent Form in the case.Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Amazon.com Services, Motorola Mobility, Plaintiffs Great American Insurance Company, Oxspring Paul LLC. Form due by 8/3/2022. (mh)
July 13, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Amazon.com Services, Motorola Mobility, Plaintiffs Great American Insurance Company, Oxspring Paul LLC. (mh)
July 13, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4390410) filed by Amazon.com Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Filed Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Venti, Katherine)
July 13, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Defendants Amazon.com Services, Motorola Mobility are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company et al v. Amazon.com Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce C. Burt
Represented By: Jason J. Fratts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oxspring Paul LLC
Represented By: Bruce C. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services
Represented By: Katherine E. Venti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility
Represented By: Rafael A. Seminario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?