Stanfield et al v Lundberg and Associates et al
Plaintiff: Scott Stanfield and Nissa Stanfield
Defendant: Lundberg and Associates, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and NewRez doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Case Number: 2:2022cv00482
Filed: July 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Referring Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Emergency Preliminary Injunctive Relief and Verified Claim for Damages filed by Plaintiffs Nissa Stanfield, Scott Stanfield. Motion was combined with Amended Complaint and not filed separately. See Amended Complaint #19 . Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(alf)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lundberg and Associates, NewRez with Jury Demand. Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing terminated per amended complaint and added to NewRez as dba. filed by Scott Stanfield, Nissa Stanfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (alf)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss , #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiffs Nissa Stanfield, Scott Stanfield. (alf)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Modification of Docket re #11 Notice of Email Filing and Notification Form: Correction: Per phonecall, mail email address should have been nissasworkmail@gmail.com, not nissaworkmail. As secondary email address was entered incorrectly as well, NEFs will be regenerated for entries 13-17. (alt)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Lundberg and Associates. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Parkinson, G.)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Hurst, Alan) Modified on 8/22/2022: removed repetitive entry text (alt)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for L&A to respond to the the Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Scott Stanfield and Nissa Stanfield is hereby extended to September 1, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 08/17/2022. (mh)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Defendant Lundberg and Associates. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Attorney G. Troy Parkinson added to party Lundberg and Associates(pty:dft)(Parkinson, G.) Modified to correct text and event on 8/18/2022 (mh).
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing identifying Newrez LLC as Corporate Parent. (Hurst, Alan)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Stanfield, Nissa Stanfield as to Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing served on 8/1/2022 - answer due 8/22/2022 (alt)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Email Filing and Notification Form by Nissa Stanfield, Scott Stanfield (alt)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan M. Hurst on behalf of Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing (Hurst, Alan)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Stanfield, Nissa Stanfield as to Lundberg and Associates served on 7/28/2022, answer due 8/18/2022. (alf)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Modification of Docket re #7 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction: Error: Court erroneously sent a Magistrate Availability Form and case is ineligible for magistrate assignment. Correction: Entry and due date of 8/16/2022 are stricken. (alf)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE to Plaintiffs- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. The magistrate judge may only preside over this case if all parties voluntarily sign and return the #Consent Form To consent, to have a magistrate judge preside over this case, please complete and return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not file the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Nissa Stanfield, Scott Stanfield. Form due by 8/16/2022. (alf) Modified on 8/1/2022 - entry and due date stricken - case is ineligible for magistrate assignment (alf).
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Lundberg and Associates. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Reassigned to District Judge per ECF No. 3 Docket Text Order for Case to be Reassigned. Case randomly assigned to Judge Ted Stewart and referred to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead as (b)1(B) referral judge per General Order 20-034. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case as the presiding judge. (jwt)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to court policy, Plaintiffs' request for immediate injunctive relief renders this case ineligible for consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge. Accordingly, the court orders that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/22/2022. (jwt)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AFFIDAVITs of Scott Stanfield and Nissa Stanfield re #1 Complaint, filed by Scott Stanfield. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit 1)(ks)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Request for Emergency Preliminary Injunctive Relief & Verified Claim for Damages against Lundberg and Associates, and Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing (Filing fee $ 402, receipt numbers 4681099367 and 9368) (Fee Status: Paid) filed by Scott Stanfield, and Nissa Stanfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit A-6, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (ks) Modified on 7/22/2022 (ks). Modified on 7/22/2022 adding text re: emergency injunctive relief (jwt). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2022: #12 Exhibit D rescanned for missing page) (kb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2022: # 13 rescanned for missing page) (kb). Modified on 7/27/2022 - removed attachment #13 as duplicate of 12 (jwt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanfield et al v Lundberg and Associates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nissa Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lundberg and Associates
Represented By: G. Troy Parkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Alan M. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?