Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S. et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S. and Gardner Denver
Case Number: 2:2022cv00528
Filed: August 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl Notice of Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ryan C. Edwards for Gardner Denver and Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S..Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 10/3/2022. (alf)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathryn L. LaPlante for Gardner Denver and Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S..Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 10/3/2022. (alf)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER:Expert Discovery due by 10/27/2023. Motions due by 11/30/2023. See order for other dates and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 10/3/2022. (alf)
September 30, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kathryn L. LaPlante , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4462568,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Gardner Denver, Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S.. (Attachments: #1 Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Kathryn L. LaPlante)(Spencer, Sarah)
September 30, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan C. Edwards , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4462553,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Gardner Denver, Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S.. (Attachments: #1 Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Ryan C. Edwards)(Spencer, Sarah)
September 29, 2022 Filing 12 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spencer, Sarah)
September 15, 2022 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendants Gardner Denver, Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S., Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (alf)
September 15, 2022 Filing 10 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Gardner Denver. (alf)
September 14, 2022 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S.. (alf)
August 26, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Gardner Denver, Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S..(Spencer, Sarah)
August 24, 2022 Filing 7 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (alf)
August 24, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return #the form on this link To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not file the Consent Form in the case.Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Gardner Denver, Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S., Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Form due by 9/14/2022. (alf)
August 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (nl)
August 19, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Gardner Denver, Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S.. (ks)
August 19, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Kathryn L LaPlante, and Ryan C Edwards, for Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Attachments: #1 PHV Letter) (ks)
August 19, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 220904155, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4422387) filed by Gardner Denver, Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Acceptance of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Sarah Spencer, #4 Exhibit C1 - Travelers Connecticut Registration, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Mark Siler, #6 Exhibit D1 - Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S. Inc. Delaware Registration, #7 Exhibit D2 - Gardner Denver Inc. Delaware Registration, #8 Exhibit D3 - Ingersoll Rand Inc. Delaware Registration, #9 Exhibit E - State Court Docket, #10 Exhibit F - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #11 Exhibit G - Notice of Appearance of Sarah Spencer, #12 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Spencer, Sarah)
August 19, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Defendants Gardner Denver, and Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S. are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402. by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Paul T. Landis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S.
Represented By: Sarah E. Spencer
Represented By: Kathryn L. LaPlante
Represented By: Ryan C. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver
Represented By: Sarah E. Spencer
Represented By: Kathryn L. LaPlante
Represented By: Ryan C. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?