Utah Democratic Party et al v. Henderson et al
Plaintiff: Utah Democratic Party and Joshua Hardy
Defendant: Diedre M Henderson and Joel Ferry
Case Number: 2:2022cv00581
Filed: September 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2022 Filing 33 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Proceedings Conducted via Zoom held on September 15, 2022 before Judge Jill N. Parrish. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patti Walker, CSR, RPR, CP, Telephone number 801-364-5440. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. To redact additional information a Motion to Redact must be filed. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/27/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2023. (jrj)
September 23, 2022 Civil Case Terminated per Notice #32 . Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to case. (alf)
September 23, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice filed by Plaintiffs Joshua Hardy, Utah Democratic Party (Billings, David) Modified on 9/26/2022 to add docket text(alf).
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 09/21/2022. (mh)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to November 15, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 9/21/2022. No attached document. (med)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 09/21/2022. (lwh)
September 20, 2022 Filing 28 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, (for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond) filed by Defendant Joel Ferry. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order )(Hatch, Brent)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DOCKET TEXT ORDER denying #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Opinion to follow. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 09/15/2022. No attached document. (lwh)
September 15, 2022 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jill N. Parrish: Motion Hearing held on 9/15/2022 re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Utah Democratic Party, Joshua Hardy. All parties appeared via zoom due to continued concerns with Covid 19. Court heard oral argument from counsel. Court will announce its decision by the end of the day with an opinion to follow. Court adjourned. Attorney for Plaintiff: David P. Billings, Attorney for Defendant: Bradley Ross Blackham, Jason Neil Dupree, Joni Jones, Brent Hatch. Court Reporter: Patti Walker.(lwh)
September 15, 2022 Filing 25 EXHIBITS filed by Joel Ferry re #23 Response to Motion. (Hatch, Brent)
September 15, 2022 Filing 24 ERRATA to #22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Defendant Diedre M Henderson . (Blackham, Bradley)
September 14, 2022 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Joel Ferry. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Declaration) of Roger Lewis)(Hatch, Brent)
September 14, 2022 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Diedre M Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Decl of Ryan Cowley)(Dupree, Jason)
September 13, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Joni J. Jones on behalf of Joel Ferry (Jones, Joni)
September 13, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent O. Hatch on behalf of Joel Ferry (Hatch, Brent)
September 13, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : (Notice generated by JNP Chambers) Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2022 at 10:00 AM VIA ZOOM before Judge Jill N. Parrish. (lwh)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/12/2022. (poh)
September 12, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Neil Dupree on behalf of Diedre M Henderson (Dupree, Jason)
September 12, 2022 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Complaint, Acknowledgment filed by Diedre M Henderson.Diedre M Henderson served on 9/9/2022, answer due 9/30/2022. (Blackham, Bradley)
September 12, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #12 Return of Service. The document is stricken as improperly filed. Document should be refiled using the event Acknowledgment of Service or if an executed summons, filed as Summons Returned Executed (if using this event, filer must attach a copy of the court issued summons). Filing should be linked to #2 complaint. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (alf)
September 12, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #11 Order to Show Cause, filed by Joshua Hardy, Utah Democratic Party. (Billings, David)
September 9, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Ross Blackham on behalf of Diedre M Henderson (Blackham, Bradley)
September 9, 2022 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Acceptance served on Lieutenant Governor Diedre Henderson, filed by Defendant Diedre M Henderson. (Blackham, Bradley) Modified on 9/12/2022, stricken as improperly filed (alf).
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court hereby ORDERS Plaintiffs to show cause, no later than September 12, 2022 at 8:00 AM, as to why it should exercise supplemental jurisdiction to hear Plaintiffs claims made under state law. See order. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/9/2022. (alf)
September 8, 2022 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to District Judge per Docket Text Order 9 . Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED: In light of the time sensitive dates set forth in Plaintiff's pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction #3 , consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge is not feasible and reassignment of this case to a District Court Judge is warranted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 09/08/2022.
September 8, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joshua Hardy, Utah Democratic Party re #4 Declaration, #6 Summons Issued Electronically, #7 Summons Issued Electronically, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #2 Complaint, (Billings, David)
September 8, 2022 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Diedre M Henderson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
September 8, 2022 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Joel Ferry. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff(s) must propose a discovery schedule to defendant(s) in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 09/08/2022. (mh)
September 7, 2022 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Diane Lewis re #1 Remark - New Case,, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #2 Complaint, filed by Joshua Hardy, Utah Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Errata 2)(Billings, David)
September 7, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Joshua Hardy, Utah Democratic Party. (Billings, David)
September 7, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4439675) filed by Utah Democratic Party, Joshua Hardy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Billings, David)
September 7, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiffs Joshua Hardy, and Utah Democratic Party are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402. by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Utah Democratic Party et al v. Henderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah Democratic Party
Represented By: David P. Billings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Hardy
Represented By: David P. Billings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diedre M Henderson
Represented By: Bradley Ross Blackham
Represented By: Jason N. Dupree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Ferry
Represented By: Brent O. Hatch
Represented By: Joni J. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?