Combs et al v. SafeMoon LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bill Merewhuader, Christopher Polite, Tim Viane, Mark Combs, Vlad Iacob and Benjamin Northey
Defendant: SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon US, SafeMoon Connect, SafeMoon LTD, SafeMoon Protocol, SafeMoon Media Group, Braden John Karony, Jack Haines-Davies, Ryan Arriaga, Shaun Witriol, Henry Wyatt, Jake Paul, Nick Carter, DeAndre Cortez Way, Ben Phillips, Miles Parks McCollum, David Portnoy, Kyle Nagy, Daniel M. Keem, Tano LLC and Thomas Smith
Petitioner: Safemoon Investor Group
Case Number: 2:2022cv00642
Filed: October 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Jared C Bennett
2 Judge: Tena Campbell
3 Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2023 Filing 181 Conflict of Law Analysis in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint BRIEF re 176 Order,,,, filed by Defendant Thomas Smith. (Smith, Taylor)
November 14, 2023 Filing 180 Conflict of Law Analysis in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint BRIEF re 176 Order,,,, filed by Defendant Henry Wyatt. (Smith, Taylor)
November 14, 2023 Filing 179 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #152 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Kyle Nagy. (Lahti, Brian)
November 14, 2023 Filing 178 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #150 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group, SafeMoon US, Tano LLC. (Celio, Michael)
November 14, 2023 Filing 177 REPLY to Response to Motion re #152 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support First Amended Complaint, #150 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support First Amended Complaint, #149 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support re Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #156 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support ; Lead Plaintiffs' Brief In Response to Court Order (ECF No. 176) filed by Plaintiffs Mark Combs, Vlad Iacob, Benjamin Northey. (Jasnoch, John)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 176 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. No attached document. On May 16 and May 23, 2023, several Defendants filed their #149 #150 #152 #156 motions to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. By July 24, 2023, Plaintiffs had filed their oppositions #165 #166 #167 #168 to each of these motions. And by September 7, 2023, each group of moving Defendants had filed their replies #170 #171 #173 #175 . Defendants make several arguments related to dismissal of Plaintiffs' state law claims that implicate the issue of which state's law applies to a given claim, yet no party has briefed a conflict of laws analysis. Therefore, the court orders the parties to brief a conflict of laws analysis that includes: (1) which state's conflict of law rules apply; and (2) which state's substantive law applies to each of Plaintiffs' state law claims. The parties shall each file their respective briefs by November 14, 2023, and each party will have until December 4, 2023 to file a response. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 10/31/2023. (jal)
September 7, 2023 Filing 175 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #156 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Thomas Smith. (Smith, Taylor)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting #172 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Mr. Smith's deadline to file his reply in supportof his motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' first amended complaint is extended to September 7, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 9/1/2023. (mh)
August 31, 2023 Filing 173 REPLY to Response to Motion re #152 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Kyle Nagy. (Lahti, Brian)
August 31, 2023 Filing 172 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #156 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Thomas Smith. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Defendant Thomas Smith's Time to File Reply in Support of His Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint) Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Lewis, Matthew)
August 31, 2023 Filing 171 REPLY to Response to Motion re #150 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group, SafeMoon US, Tano LLC. (Celio, Michael)
August 31, 2023 Filing 170 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #149 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support re Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Henry Wyatt. (Adamson, R.)
August 21, 2023 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor J. Smith on behalf of Thomas Smith (Smith, Taylor)
July 24, 2023 Filing 168 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #156 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Mark Combs, Vlad Iacob, Benjamin Northey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John T. Jasnoch, #2 Exhibit A)(Jasnoch, John)
July 17, 2023 Filing 167 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #152 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Mark Combs, Vlad Iacob, Benjamin Northey. (Jasnoch, John)
July 17, 2023 Filing 166 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #149 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support re Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Mark Combs, Vlad Iacob, Benjamin Northey. (Jasnoch, John)
July 17, 2023 Filing 165 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #150 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Mark Combs, Vlad Iacob, Benjamin Northey. (Jasnoch, John)
July 12, 2023 Filing 164 NOTICE of Change of Address by Chad R. Derum for Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP (Derum, Chad)
June 12, 2023 Filing 163 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Miles Parks McCollum filed by Plaintiffs Mark Combs, Vlad Iacob, Benjamin Northey (Jasnoch, John)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #157 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason De Bretteville for Henry Wyatt.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 6/9/2023. (mh)
June 9, 2023 Filing 161 ERRATA to #157 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason de Bretteville , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-4706112,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of filed by Defendant Henry Wyatt . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission (Jason de Bretteville))(Adamson, R.)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #158 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tucker S. Atkins for Henry Wyatt.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 6/9/2023. (mh)
June 9, 2023 Filing 159 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #157 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason de Bretteville : Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission attached is for Tucker S. Atkins and not for Jason de Bretteville. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to file the correct application as an errata found under civil event-other filing-other documents and link back to #157 . (mh)
June 8, 2023 Filing 158 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tucker S. Atkins , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-4706114,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Henry Wyatt. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Adamson, R.)
June 8, 2023 Filing 157 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason de Bretteville , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-4706112,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Henry Wyatt. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Adamson, R.)
May 23, 2023 Filing 156 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Thomas Smith. (Lewis, Matthew)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #151 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #133 Amended Complaint. Mr. McCollum's deadline to file a response to Plaintiffs' amended complaint is extended from May 16, 2023, to June 15, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 5/17/2023. (mh)
May 17, 2023 Filing 154 Modification of Docket: re #151 : Pleading filed under Stipulated event. #151 corrected to a MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Motion referred to Judge Bennett for review. No further action needed. (mh)
May 17, 2023 Filing 153 MOTIONS REFERRED - #151 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(mh)
May 16, 2023 Filing 152 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Kyle Nagy. (Lahti, Brian)
May 16, 2023 Filing 151 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Extending Time to Answer Complaint by Miles Parks McCollum. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Hinkle, Lawrence) Modified by correcting event to a motion and text on 5/17/2023 (mh).
May 16, 2023 Filing 150 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group, SafeMoon US, Tano LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jacob U. Arber)(Celio, Michael)
May 16, 2023 Filing 149 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support re Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Henry Wyatt. Attorney R. Jeremy Adamson added to party Henry Wyatt(pty:dft)(Adamson, R.)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting #145 Motion to Stay. The court HEREBY ORDERS that all case deadlines related to Mr. Keem are STAYED pending the submission of the formal settlement and Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary approval. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 05/10/2023. (jl)
May 9, 2023 Filing 147 Modification of Docket re #145 MOTION: A Motion to Stay was added to the Notice of Settlement per chambers. (mh)
May 9, 2023 Filing 146 MOTIONS REFERRED - #145 MOTION to Stay Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(mh)
May 9, 2023 Filing 145 MOTION to Stay and NOTICE of Settlement Joint Notice of Settlement in Principle (re Defendant Daniel Keem) by Mark Combs, Vlad Iacob, Benjamin Northey (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Staying Case Deadlines as to Defendant Daniel Keem) (Jasnoch, John) Modified by adding Motion and referring motion on 5/9/2023 (mh).
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #141 Motion to Stay Case Deadlines as to Defendant Jake Paul. All case deadlines related to Mr. Paul are STAYED pending the submission of the formal settlement and Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary approval. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 4/24/2023. (mh)
April 24, 2023 Filing 143 MOTIONS REFERRED - #141 MOTION to Stay Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(mh)
April 24, 2023 Filing 142 Modification of Docket re #141 MOTION: A Motion to Stay was added to the Notice of Settlement per chambers. (mh)
April 24, 2023 Filing 141 MOTION to Stay and NOTICE of Settlement Joint Notice of Settlement in Principle (re Defendant Jake Paul) by Mark Combs, Vlad Iacob, Bill Merewhuader (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jasnoch, John) Modified by adding motion on 4/24/2023 (mh).
April 4, 2023 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor John Hadfield on behalf of Thomas Smith (Hadfield, Taylor)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #137 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants SafeMoon LLC; SafeMoon US, LLC; SafeMoon Connect, LLC; SafeMoon Media Group Ltd.; Tano LLC; and Braden John Karony have leave to file a motion to dismiss comprising up to 30 pages. Plaintiffs have leave to file a response in opposition to the motion to dismiss comprising up to 30 pages. SafeMoon has leave to file a reply in support of its motion to dismiss comprising up to 15 pages. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 4/3/2023. (mh)
April 3, 2023 Filing 138 Motion No Longer Referred: #137 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Memorandum in Support. District judge will handle. (skw)
March 31, 2023 Filing 137 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group, SafeMoon US, Tano LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Bradshaw, Alan)
March 31, 2023 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad R. Derum on behalf of Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group, SafeMoon US, Tano LLC (Derum, Chad)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #134 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael D. Celio for Braden John Karony,Michael D. Celio for SafeMoon Connect,Michael D. Celio for SafeMoon LLC,Michael D. Celio for SafeMoon Media Group,Michael D. Celio for SafeMoon US,Michael D. Celio for Tano LLC.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 3/24/2023. (mh)
March 24, 2023 Filing 134 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael D. Celio , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4629674,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group, SafeMoon US, Tano LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bradshaw, Alan)
March 17, 2023 Filing 133 AMENDED COMPLAINT , Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint against Ryan Arriaga, Nick Carter, Jack Haines-Davies, Braden John Karony, Daniel M. Keem, Miles Parks McCollum, Kyle Nagy, Jake Paul, Ben Phillips, David Portnoy, SafeMoon Connect, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon LTD, SafeMoon Media Group, SafeMoon Protocol, SafeMoon US, Thomas Smith, Tano LLC, DeAndre Cortez Way, Henry Wyatt with Jury Demand. filed by Mark Combs, Benjamin Northey, Vlad Iacob. (Jasnoch, John)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #131 Motion to Set Schedule for the Filing of Amended Complaint and Response Thereto. Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint on or before March 17, 2023. Defendants' response(s) to the amended complaint shall be filed on or before May 16, 2023. Plaintiffs' opposition to any motion(s) to dismiss shall be filed on or before July 17, 2023. Defendants' replies in support of any motion(s) to dismiss shall be filed on or before August 31, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 3/14/2023. (mh)
March 14, 2023 Filing 131 Stipulated MOTION for Scheduling Order for the Filing of Amended Complaint and Responses Thereto filed by Plaintiff Mark Combs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ) Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Hatch, Brent)
March 13, 2023 Filing 130 STATUS REPORT of Lead Plaintiffs by Mark Combs, Vlad Iacob, Benjamin Northey. (Masson, Sean )
March 9, 2023 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Lewis on behalf of Thomas Smith (Lewis, Matthew)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STATUS REPORT ORDER. On 12/15/2022, the parties filed #120 Stipulated MOTION to Stay Deadline for Defendant Tano LLC to Respond to Consolidated Complaint. In that motion, the parties indicated that they were negotiating a schedule for Plaintiffs to file an amended complaint and for Defendants to respond to the amended complaint. On 12/20/2022, the court granted the parties' motion. ECF No. #121 . As of the date of this order, more than 60 days have passed since the date of the court's order granting the parties' motion, and Plaintiffs have not filed an amended complaint. Accordingly, the court HEREBY ORDERS the parties to file a joint status report on or before 03/09/2023 to inform the court of the status of this action and their intentions to proceed. Status Report due by 03/09/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 02/23/2023. (docket text order; no attached document) (jcd)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #125 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew D. Barzman for Miles Parks McCollum.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utah's local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 01/23/2023. (jl)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #124 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lawrence C. Hinkle, II for Miles Parks McCollum.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utah's local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 01/23/2023. (jl)
January 23, 2023 Filing 125 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew D. Barzman , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4565049,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Miles Parks McCollum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice - Matthew D. Barzman Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Brennan)
January 23, 2023 Filing 124 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lawrence C. Hinkle II , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4565039,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Miles Parks McCollum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice - Lawrence C. Hinkle II Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Brennan)
January 17, 2023 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Brennan H. Moss on behalf of Miles Parks McCollum (Moss, Brennan)
December 20, 2022 Filing 122 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Brandon S. Fuller filed by Alan C. Bradshaw on behalf of Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group, SafeMoon US, Tano LLC (Bradshaw, Alan)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #120 Motion to Stay Deadline for Defendant Tano to Respond to Consolidated Complaint. The deadline for Tano to respond to Plaintiffs' #109 Consolidated Complaint is stayed pending the parties' negotiation of a new schedule regarding Plaintiffs' proposed amended complaint and Defendants' responses thereto. Tano's deadline to respond to the operative complaint shall be the same as the response deadline set for Defendants SafeMoon LLC; SafeMoon US, LLC; SafeMoon Connect, LLC; SafeMoon Media Group Ltd.; and Braden John Karony, as determined by the parties' forthcoming stipulated schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 12/20/2022. (mh)
December 15, 2022 Filing 120 Stipulated MOTION to Stay re #109 Amended Complaint,, Deadline to Respond to Consolidated Complaint filed by Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group, SafeMoon US, Tano LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Stay Answer Deadline) Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett. Attorney Alan C. Bradshaw added to party Tano LLC(pty:dft)(Bradshaw, Alan)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #117 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tanya Schierling for Jake Paul.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 11/09/2022. (mh)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #116 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Levi Y. Silver for Jake Paul.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 11/09/2022. (mh)
November 9, 2022 Filing 117 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tanya Schierling , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4501638,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Jake Paul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission for Tanya Schierling)(Johansen, Bryan)
November 9, 2022 Filing 116 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Levi Y. Silver , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4501615,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Jake Paul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission for Levi Y. Silver)(Johansen, Bryan)
November 7, 2022 Filing 115 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Mark Combs, Benjamin Northey, Vlad Iacob as to Thomas Smith Waiver sent on 11/4/2022, answer due 1/3/2023. (Jasnoch, John)
November 4, 2022 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan S. Johansen on behalf of Jake Paul (Johansen, Bryan)
November 3, 2022 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Reymann on behalf of Jake Paul (Reymann, David)
November 1, 2022 Filing 112 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Mark Combs, Benjamin Northey, Vlad Iacob as to Tano LLC Waiver sent on 11/1/2022, answer due 1/3/2023. (Jasnoch, John)
November 1, 2022 Filing 111 Summons Issued Electronically as to Thomas Smith. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
November 1, 2022 Filing 110 Summons Issued Electronically as to Tano LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
October 31, 2022 Filing 109 AMENDED COMPLAINT Corrected Complaint against Jack Haines-Davies, Braden John Karony, Daniel M. Keem, Miles Parks McCollum, Kyle Nagy, Jake Paul, Ben Phillips, SafeMoon Connect, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon LTD, SafeMoon Media Group, SafeMoon Protocol, SafeMoon US, DeAndre Cortez Way, Henry Wyatt, Tano LLC, Thomas Smith with Jury Demand. New Defendants: Tano LLC, Thomas Smith. Removed Defendants: Ryan Arriaga, Shaun Witriol, David Portnoy. filed by Mark Combs, Benjamin Northey, Vlad Iacob. (Jasnoch, John)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. On Thursday, October 20, 2022, counsel for Plaintiffs sought the court's assistance with the procedure by which counsel could prompt the court to issue a summons to a certain defendant. However, Plaintiffs' #59 Consolidated Complaint fails to include this defendant in its caption. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file a corrected complaint listing all of the parties in the complaint's caption by no later than October 31. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 10/24/22. (skw)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #101 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael S. Dicke for Kyle Nagy.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 10/19/2022. (mh)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #100 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Marie C. Bafus for Kyle Nagy.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 10/19/2022. (mh)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #97 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John T. Jasnoch for Mark Combs,John T. Jasnoch for Vlad Iacob,John T. Jasnoch for Benjamin Northey.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 10/19/2022. (mh)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #96 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sean T. Masson for Mark Combs,Sean T. Masson for Vlad Iacob,Sean T. Masson for Benjamin Northey.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 10/19/2022. (mh)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 10/19/22. (skw)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Tena Campbell recused. Case reassigned to Judge David Barlow for all further proceedings - case number is now 2:22cv00642 DBB. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 10/18/22 (alt)
October 14, 2022 Filing 101 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael S. Dicke On Behalf Of Kyle Nagy, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4476055,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Kyle Nagy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application of Michael S. Dicke, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahti, Brian)
October 14, 2022 Filing 100 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marie C. Bafus On Behalf Of Kyle Nagy, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4476044,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Kyle Nagy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application of Marie C. Bafus, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahti, Brian)
October 14, 2022 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Lahti on behalf of Kyle Nagy (Lahti, Brian)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge Robert J. Shelby recused. Case reassigned to Judge Tena Campbell for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/13/2022. (alf)
October 13, 2022 Filing 97 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John T. Jasnoch , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4474997,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Bill Merewhuader. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Pro Hac Vice Application - Jasnoch, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order - Jasnoch)(Hatch, Brent)
October 13, 2022 Filing 96 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sean T. Masson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4474980,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Bill Merewhuader. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Pro Hac Vice Application - Masson, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order - Masson) Attorney Brent O. Hatch added to party Bill Merewhuader(pty:pla)(Hatch, Brent)
October 13, 2022 Filing 95 Case Reassigned to District Judge per Docket Text Order 94 . Case randomly assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Based upon the procedural posture of this case, and the fact that defendants have not yet all appeared in this case, consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge is not feasible at this time. Accordingly, the undersigned orders that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/12/2022. (afm)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #87 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jacob U. Arber for Braden John Karony,Jacob U. Arber for SafeMoon Connect,Jacob U. Arber for SafeMoon LLC,Jacob U. Arber for SafeMoon Media Group,Jacob U. Arber for SafeMoon US.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/11/2022. (mh)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #86 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Paul J. Collins for Braden John Karony,Paul J. Collins for SafeMoon Connect,Paul J. Collins for SafeMoon LLC,Paul J. Collins for SafeMoon Media Group,Paul J. Collins for SafeMoon US.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/11/2022. (mh)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #85 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Linda D. Lam for Braden John Karony,Linda D. Lam for SafeMoon Connect,Linda D. Lam for SafeMoon LLC,Linda D. Lam for SafeMoon Media Group,Linda D. Lam for SafeMoon US.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/11/2022. (mh)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #84 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael J. Kahn for Braden John Karony,Michael J. Kahn for SafeMoon Connect,Michael J. Kahn for SafeMoon LLC,Michael J. Kahn for SafeMoon Media Group,Michael J. Kahn for SafeMoon US.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/11/2022. (mh)
October 7, 2022 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor J. Lee on behalf of Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group, SafeMoon US (Lee, Trevor)
October 7, 2022 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Scott Fuller on behalf of Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group, SafeMoon US (Fuller, Brandon)
October 7, 2022 Filing 87 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jacob U. Arber , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4469469,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group, SafeMoon US. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bradshaw, Alan)
October 7, 2022 Filing 86 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul J. Collins , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4469453,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group, SafeMoon US. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bradshaw, Alan)
October 7, 2022 Filing 85 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Linda D. Lam , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4469448,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group, SafeMoon US. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bradshaw, Alan)
October 7, 2022 Filing 84 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Kahn , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4469442,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group, SafeMoon US. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bradshaw, Alan)
October 7, 2022 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan C. Bradshaw on behalf of Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group, SafeMoon US (Bradshaw, Alan)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/7/2022. (alf)
October 6, 2022 Filing 81 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Marie Bafus, for Defendant Kyle Nagy. (nl)
October 6, 2022 Filing 80 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Lawrence C. Hinkle II, and Matthew Devin Barzman, for Defendant Miles Parks McCollum. (nl)
October 6, 2022 Filing 79 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Neal R. Marder and Peter Ian Altman, for Defendant Henry Wyatt. (nl)
October 6, 2022 Filing 78 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Jacob Usher Arber, Miahel J. Kahn, Paul J. Collins and Linda Diep Lam, for Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group, SafeMoon US (Attachments: #1 Michael J. Kahn, #2 Linda Diep Lam) (nl)
October 6, 2022 Filing 77 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney John T. Jasnoch, for Plaintiffs Mark Combs, Vlad Iacob, Benjamin Northey. (nl)
October 5, 2022 Filing 76 Case transferred in from USDC of California Central; Case Number 2:22-cv-01108. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. USDC District of Utah Case Number 2:22-cv-00642-CMR, Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero.
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER ON STIPULATION RE: VENUE TRANSFER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. In the interest of justice and for the convenience of the parties and witnesses, this action is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Utah. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
September 30, 2022 Filing 74 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mark Combs, Safemoon Investor Group, Benjamin Northey, Vlad Iacob, upon Defendant DeAndre Cortez Way served on 8/10/2022, answer due 8/31/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Deandre Cortez Way in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than October 7, 2022 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. (See document for further details). (aco) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
September 9, 2022 Filing 72 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Polite, Bill Merewhuader, Mark Combs, Tim Viane, Vlad Iacob pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) Only as to David Portnoy. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
August 22, 2022 Filing 71 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant David Portnoy, identifying None. (Brettler, Andrew) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
August 22, 2022 Filing 70 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to David Portnoy answer now due 9/19/2022, re Consolidated Complaint #59 filed by defendant David Portnoy.(Brettler, Andrew) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
August 10, 2022 Filing 69 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew B Brettler counsel for Defendant David Portnoy. Adding Andrew B. Brettler as counsel of record for David Portnoy for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant David Portnoy. (Attorney Andrew B Brettler added to party David Portnoy(pty:dft))(Brettler, Andrew) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
July 27, 2022 Filing 68 Joint STIPULATION to Transfer Case to USDC, District of Utah filed by Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, LLC, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group LTD, SafeMoon US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jacob Arber)(Collins, Paul) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
July 8, 2022 Filing 67 DECLARATION of Jacob Arber re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #66 filed by Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, LLC, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group LTD, SafeMoon US, LLC. (Arber, Jacob) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
July 8, 2022 Filing 66 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Consolidated Complaint filed by Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, LLC, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group LTD, SafeMoon US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arber, Jacob) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
July 1, 2022 Filing 65 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marie Bafus counsel for Defendant Kyle Nagy. Adding Marie C. Bafus as counsel of record for Defendant Kyle Nagy for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kyle Nagy. (Attorney Marie Bafus added to party Kyle Nagy(pty:dft))(Bafus, Marie) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
June 30, 2022 Filing 64 21 DAY Summons Issued re Consolidated Complaint #59 as to Defendant David Portnoy. (aco) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
June 29, 2022 Filing 63 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Consolidated Complaint #59 filed by Lead Plaintiff Safemoon Investor Group. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
June 29, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #60 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached. Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (aco) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
June 29, 2022 Filing 61 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Lead Plaintiff Safemoon Investor Group, re Consolidated Complaint #59 Upon Defendant Shaun Witriol served on June 29, 2022. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
June 29, 2022 Filing 60 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Consolidated Complaint #59 filed by Lead Plaintiff Safemoon Investor Group. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
June 29, 2022 Filing 59 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT related to: #1 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, filed by Lead Plaintiff Safemoon Investor Group(Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
June 29, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #54 . The following error(s) was found: Request for Summons is in reference to a document that has been stricken per Order on 06/29/2022. See Docket Entry No. 57. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (aco) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
June 29, 2022 Filing 57 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The complaint is stricken. Plaintiff will file a corrected complaint. The new complaint will include all the parties in the action in the caption. RE: Consolidated Complaint #53 . (aco) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
June 28, 2022 Filing 56 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consolidated Complaint #53 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Parties listed on Consolidated Complaint do not match parties on Complaint (Docket Entry No. 1) In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
June 28, 2022 Filing 55 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Lead Plaintiff Safemoon Investor Group, re Consolidated Complaint #53 Upon Defendant Shaun Witriol served on June 28, 2022. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
June 28, 2022 Filing 54 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Consolidated Complaint #53 filed by Lead Plaintiff Safemoon Investor Group. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
June 28, 2022 Filing 53 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 06/29/2022. SEE DOCKET NO. 57] CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT related to: #1 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, filed by Lead Plaintiff Safemoon Investor Group(Jasnoch, John) Modified on 6/29/2022 (aco). [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF LEAD PLAINTIFF MOVANT THE SAFEMOON INVESTORS GROUP FOR: (1) CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS; (2) APPOINTMENT AS CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS FOR SECURITIES CLAIMS; (3) APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL FOR SECURITIES CLAIMS; (4) APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL FOR NON-SECURITIES CLAIMS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court orders these cases consolidated, with 2:22-cv-01108-SVW-MRW as the lead case. Case 2:22-cv-01527-SVW-MRW is administratively closed and moved to the inactive calendar. All future filings shall be made in the lead case. Plaintiffs shall designate an existing complaint as the operative complaint or file an amended complaint within 21 days.; granting #40 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel ; granting #40 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jacob Usher Arber on behalf of Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, LLC, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group LTD, SafeMoon US, LLC (Attorney Jacob Usher Arber added to party Braden John Karony(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Usher Arber added to party SafeMoon Connect, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Usher Arber added to party SafeMoon LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Usher Arber added to party SafeMoon Media Group LTD(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Usher Arber added to party SafeMoon US, LLC(pty:dft))(Arber, Jacob) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Paul J Collins on behalf of Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, LLC, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group LTD, SafeMoon US, LLC (Attorney Paul J Collins added to party Braden John Karony(pty:dft), Attorney Paul J Collins added to party SafeMoon Connect, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Paul J Collins added to party SafeMoon LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Paul J Collins added to party SafeMoon Media Group LTD(pty:dft), Attorney Paul J Collins added to party SafeMoon US, LLC(pty:dft))(Collins, Paul) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael J Kahn on behalf of Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, LLC, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group LTD, SafeMoon US, LLC (Attorney Michael J Kahn added to party Braden John Karony(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Kahn added to party SafeMoon Connect, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Kahn added to party SafeMoon LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Kahn added to party SafeMoon Media Group LTD(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Kahn added to party SafeMoon US, LLC(pty:dft))(Kahn, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
May 13, 2022 Filing 48 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nick Carter, identifying Nick Carter, Defendant. (Holtz, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
May 13, 2022 Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Nick Carter.(Attorney Michael D Holtz added to party Nick Carter(pty:dft))(Holtz, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
May 10, 2022 Filing 46 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Lead Plaintiff Movant Safemoon Investor Group, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #45 Upon Defendant Shaun Witriol, served on May 10, 2022. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
May 10, 2022 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Lead Plaintiff Movant Safemoon Investor Group, (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
May 10, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel , Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiffs NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:22-cv-01108, and 2:22-cv-01527, #40 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
May 10, 2022 Filing 43 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Lead Plaintiff Movant Safemoon Investor Group, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel , Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiffs NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:22-cv-01108, and 2:22-cv-01527, #40 , Memorandum in Support of Motion, #41 , Declaration (Motion related),, #42 Upon Defendant Shaun Witriol, served on May 10, 2022. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
May 9, 2022 Filing 42 DECLARATION of John T. Jasnoch In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel , Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiffs NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:22-cv-01108, and 2:22-cv-01527, #40 filed by Movant Safemoon Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Movants Certifications, #3 Exhibit C - Movants Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Joint Declaration of Movants, #5 Exhibit E - Scott+Scott Firm Resume)(Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
May 9, 2022 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel , Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiffs NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:22-cv-01108, and 2:22-cv-01527, #40 filed by Movant Safemoon Investor Group. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
May 9, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel , Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiffs, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:22-cv-01108, and 2:22-cv-01527, filed by Lead Plaintiff Movant Safemoon Investor Group. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney John T Jasnoch added to party Safemoon Investor Group(pty:bkmov)) (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ON STIPULATION RE: RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Upon Stipulation #38 , Defendants SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon US, LLC, SafeMoon Connect, LLC, SafeMoon Media Group LTD, Miles Parks McCollum, Henry Wyatt, and Jake Paul shall not be required to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in this action pending appointment of a lead plaintiff in the litigation captioned Blacksher v. SafeMoon LLC et al., Case No. 2:22-cv-01527 ("Blacksher") and the lead plaintiff's filing of a complaint or designation of an existing complaint as the operative complaint. After the appointment of a lead plaintiff in Blacksher, Defendants will promptly meet and confer with Plaintiffs Bill Merewhuader, Christopher Polite, and Tim Viane as well as the lead plaintiff in Blacksher and submit to the Court a proposed schedule for a response to the operative complaint. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
April 19, 2022 Filing 38 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Date Approved by Court Following Submission To Court of Proposed Schedule for Response to Operative Complaint Following Appointment of Lead Plaintiff in Blacksher Lawsuit filed by Defendants SafeMoon Connect, LLC, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group LTD, SafeMoon US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order on Stipulation Re: Response to Complaint, #2 Declaration Declaration of Linda D. Lam ISO Stipulation Re: Response to Complaint, #3 Declaration Proof of Service by Mail Certification/Declaration)(Lam, Linda) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Having considered Plaintiffs response, the Court declines to consolidate cases 2:22-cv-01527 and 2:22-cv-01108 at this time, prior to the selection of a lead plaintiff and lead counsel in the federal securities action. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
April 15, 2022 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Bill Merewhuader, Christopher Polite, Tim Viane, re Response #33 served on April 15, 2022. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
April 14, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Response #33 . The following error(s) was/were found: Lacking proof of service upon pro se party, F.R.Civ.P. 5. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
April 13, 2022 Filing 34 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Miles Parks McCollum answer now due 5/11/2022, filed by Defendant Miles Parks McCollum.(Attorney Matthew Devin Barzman added to party Miles Parks McCollum(pty:dft))(Barzman, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
April 12, 2022 Filing 33 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Bill Merewhuader, Christopher Polite, Tim Vianeto Text Only Scheduling Notice, 29 re Order to Show Cause (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
April 8, 2022 Filing 32 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Henry Wyatt answer now due 5/11/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant Henry Wyatt.(Altman, Peter) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
April 8, 2022 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Neal R Marder counsel for Defendant Henry Wyatt. Filed by defendant Henry Wyatt. (Attorney Neal R Marder added to party Henry Wyatt(pty:dft))(Marder, Neal) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
April 8, 2022 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Peter Ian Altman counsel for Defendant Henry Wyatt. Adding Peter I. Altman as counsel of record for Henry Wyatt for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Henry Wyatt. (Attorney Peter Ian Altman added to party Henry Wyatt(pty:dft))(Altman, Peter) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Having reviewed the complaints in each matter, Plaintiffs are hereby ordered to show cause within seven (7) days why this case should not be consolidated with the case at 2:22-cv-01527-SVW-MRW. Plaintiffs response shall not exceed eight (8) pages. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
April 1, 2022 Filing 28 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to SafeMoon LLC answer now due 4/20/2022, filed by defendant SafeMoon LLC.(Attorney Linda Diep Lam added to party SafeMoon LLC(pty:dft))(Lam, Linda) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
March 31, 2022 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Polite, Bill Merewhuader, Tim Viane, upon Defendant SafeMoon US, LLC served on 2/28/2022, answer due 4/20/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Curtis Wolthuis, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
March 31, 2022 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Polite, Bill Merewhuader, Tim Viane, upon Defendant SafeMoon LLC served on 3/9/2022, answer due 3/30/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Braden John Karony, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
March 31, 2022 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Polite, Bill Merewhuader, Tim Viane, upon Defendant SafeMoon Connect, LLC served on 2/28/2022, answer due 4/20/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Curtis Wolthuis, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
March 31, 2022 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Polite, Bill Merewhuader, Tim Viane, upon Defendant Henry Wyatt served on 3/20/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Henry Wyatt, Personally in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
March 31, 2022 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Polite, Bill Merewhuader, Tim Viane, upon Defendant Shaun Witriol served on 2/25/2022, answer due 4/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Shaun Witriol, Personally in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
March 31, 2022 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Polite, Bill Merewhuader, Tim Viane, upon Defendant Miles Parks McCollum served on 3/20/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Venita McCollum, mother/ co-occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
March 29, 2022 Filing 21 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Shaun Witriol answer now due 4/15/2022, filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Polite; Bill Merewhuader; Tim Viane.(Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
March 21, 2022 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Polite, Bill Merewhuader, Tim Viane. upon Jake Paul waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/16/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Levi Y. Silver. (Jasnoch, John)[Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
March 15, 2022 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Polite, Bill Merewhuader, Tim Viane. upon Nick Carter waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/14/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Michael Holtz. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
March 15, 2022 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to SafeMoon Connect, LLC answer now due 4/20/2022; SafeMoon Media Group LTD answer now due 4/20/2022; SafeMoon US, LLC answer now due 4/20/2022, filed by Defendants SafeMoon Connect, LLC; SafeMoon Media Group LTD; SafeMoon US, LLC.(Attorney Linda Diep Lam added to party SafeMoon Connect, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Linda Diep Lam added to party SafeMoon Media Group LTD(pty:dft), Attorney Linda Diep Lam added to party SafeMoon US, LLC(pty:dft))(Lam, Linda) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
March 10, 2022 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Polite, Bill Merewhuader, Tim Viane, upon Defendant SafeMoon Protocol LTD served on 3/2/2022, answer due 3/23/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon SafeMoon Protocol LTD in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
March 10, 2022 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Polite, Bill Merewhuader, Tim Viane, upon Defendant SafeMoon Media Group LTD served on 3/2/2022, answer due 3/23/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon SafeMoon Media group LTD in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
March 10, 2022 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Polite, Bill Merewhuader, Tim Viane, upon Defendant SafeMoon LTD served on 3/2/2022, answer due 3/23/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon SafeMoon LTD in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
March 10, 2022 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Polite, Bill Merewhuader, Tim Viane, upon Defendant Ben Phillips served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ben Phillips in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
March 10, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Polite, Bill Merewhuader, Tim Viane, upon Defendant Jack Haines-Davies served on 3/2/2022, answer due 3/23/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jack Haines-Davies in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
February 22, 2022 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendants Ryan Arriaga, Nick Carter, Jack Haines-Davies, Braden John Karony, Miles Parks McCollum, Jake Paul, Ben Phillips, SafeMoon Connect, LLC, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon LTD, SafeMoon Media Group LTD, SafeMoon Protocol LTD, SafeMoon US, LLC, DeAndre Cortez Way, Shaun Witriol, Henry Wyatt. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
February 21, 2022 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Bill Merewhuader, Christopher Polite, Tim Viane. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
February 18, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
February 18, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
February 18, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
February 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
February 17, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Bill Merewhuader, Christopher Polite, Tim Viane, (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
February 17, 2022 Filing 4 DECLARATION of John T. Jasnoch re: Proper Venue Pursuant to Cal. Civil Code 1780(d) filed by Plaintiffs Bill Merewhuader, Christopher Polite, Tim Viane. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
February 17, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Bill Merewhuader, Christopher Polite, Tim Viane. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Bill Merewhuader, Christopher Polite, Tim Viane. (Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32813379 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Polite, Bill Merewhuader, Tim Viane. (Attorney John T Jasnoch added to party Bill Merewhuader(pty:pla), Attorney John T Jasnoch added to party Christopher Polite(pty:pla), Attorney John T Jasnoch added to party Tim Viane(pty:pla))(Jasnoch, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/5/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Combs et al v. SafeMoon LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Merewhuader
Represented By: Brent O. Hatch
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Polite
Represented By: Brent O. Hatch
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Viane
Represented By: Brent O. Hatch
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Combs
Represented By: Brent O. Hatch
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vlad Iacob
Represented By: Brent O. Hatch
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Northey
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Represented By: Brent O. Hatch
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SafeMoon LLC
Represented By: Alan C. Bradshaw
Represented By: Brandon Scott Fuller
Represented By: Michael J. Kahn
Represented By: Trevor J. Lee
Represented By: Jacob U. Arber
Represented By: Linda D. Lam
Represented By: Paul J. Collins
Represented By: Chad R. Derum
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SafeMoon US
Represented By: Alan C. Bradshaw
Represented By: Brandon Scott Fuller
Represented By: Michael J. Kahn
Represented By: Trevor J. Lee
Represented By: Jacob U. Arber
Represented By: Linda D. Lam
Represented By: Paul J. Collins
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Chad R. Derum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SafeMoon Connect
Represented By: Alan C. Bradshaw
Represented By: Brandon Scott Fuller
Represented By: Michael J. Kahn
Represented By: Trevor J. Lee
Represented By: Jacob U. Arber
Represented By: Linda D. Lam
Represented By: Paul J. Collins
Represented By: Chad R. Derum
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SafeMoon LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SafeMoon Protocol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SafeMoon Media Group
Represented By: Alan C. Bradshaw
Represented By: Brandon Scott Fuller
Represented By: Michael J. Kahn
Represented By: Trevor J. Lee
Represented By: Jacob U. Arber
Represented By: Linda D. Lam
Represented By: Paul J. Collins
Represented By: Chad R. Derum
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Braden John Karony
Represented By: Alan C. Bradshaw
Represented By: Brandon Scott Fuller
Represented By: Michael J. Kahn
Represented By: Trevor J. Lee
Represented By: Jacob U. Arber
Represented By: Linda D. Lam
Represented By: Paul J. Collins
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Chad R. Derum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Haines-Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Arriaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Witriol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Wyatt
Represented By: Neal R. Marder
Represented By: R. Jeremy Adamson
Represented By: Tucker S. Atkins
Represented By: Jason De Bretteville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Paul
Represented By: Bryan S. Johansen
Represented By: Levi Y. Silver
Represented By: David C. Reymann
Represented By: Tanya Schierling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Carter
Represented By: Michael D. Holtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeAndre Cortez Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles Parks McCollum
Represented By: Brennan H. Moss
Represented By: Lawrence C. Hinkle, II
Represented By: Matthew D. Barzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Portnoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Nagy
Represented By: Brian E. Lahti
Represented By: Marie C. Bafus
Represented By: Michael S. Dicke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel M. Keem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tano LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Kahn
Represented By: Alan C. Bradshaw
Represented By: Chad R. Derum
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Smith
Represented By: Matthew R. Lewis
Represented By: Taylor John Hadfield
Represented By: Taylor J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Safemoon Investor Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?