DevIntent v. HeroDevs
Plaintiff: DevIntent
Defendant: HeroDevs
Case Number: 2:2022cv00698
Filed: November 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Referring Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Administratively Closing this Case. Case may be reopened upon motion of pla(s) or dft(s). Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 12/14/2022. (jl)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order granting in part and denying in part #27 Motion to Seal Document, Compelling Arbitration and Administraively Closing Case without Prejudice. The Documents are to remain unsealed; Arbitration of the claims asserted in the above-captioned case is compelled; The proceedings are stayed pending the completion of arbitration, except that the parties may seek to redact previously filed documents upon separate application to the court; and The parties shall promptly notify the court when arbitration has concluded, or if arbitration has not concluded within six months of the date hereof, provide a status report. The Clerk of Court is directed to administratively close this case without prejudice to any party's rights to reopen it at the conclusion of arbitration. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 12/15/2022. (jl)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Stipulated MOTION to Seal Document #10 Order to Show Cause,, #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support Compelling Arbitration and Administraively Closing Case without Prejudice filed by Defendant HeroDevs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulation to Arbitration and to Seal Certain Documents)(Williams, Jonathan)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Defendant HeroDevs. (alf)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Plaintiff DevIntent. (alf)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah is available to conduct proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. The magistrate judge may preside over this case only after the relevant parties voluntarily sign and return the Consent Form. To have a magistrate judge preside over this case, please complete and return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not e-file the Consent Form in the case docket. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff DevIntent, Defendant HeroDevs. Form due by 11/30/2022. (alf)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Minute Order. In Person Proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Shelby: Motion Hearing held on 11/8/2022 re: docket entry #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff DevIntent LLC and docket entry #21 Motion to Compel Compliance with Alternative Dispute Resolution Provisions of the Strategic Alliance Agreement filed by Defendant HeroDevs. The court heard oral argument and for the reasons stated on the record DENIED in part and RESERVED in part docket entry #2 Motion for TRO. The court STAYED proceedings as to docket entry #21 Motion to Compel pursuant to the parties Stipulated Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings. The court STAYED briefing for any outstanding issues. The parties are ordered to submit a status report no more than 7 days following Mediation, currently scheduled for 11/19/2022. Written Order to follow oral order: No. Attorney for Plaintiff: R. Thomas Dunn, Jeffery Williams, Jeffrie Hollingworth. Attorney for Defendant: Stephen Hale, Jonathan Williams.Court Reporter: Ed Young. (mjm)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Alternative Dispute Resolution Provisions of the Strategic Alliance Agreement and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant HeroDevs. (Hale, Stephen)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF FILING of Proof of Service as to re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support , #8 Order Setting Hearing or Trial,, #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff DevIntent. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Williams, Jeffery)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DevIntent as to HeroDevs served on 11/3/2022, answer due 11/25/2022. (Williams, Jeffery)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #10 Order to Show Cause,, filed by DevIntent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Jeffery)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Kimberley A. Train in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff DevIntent. (Williams, Jeffery)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF FILING of Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff DevIntent. (Williams, Jeffery)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against HeroDevs. filed by DevIntent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3.1, #4 Exhibit 3.2, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10) (Williams, Jeffery)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff DevIntent. (Williams, Jeffery)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF FILING of Acceptance and Proof of Service in Compliance with Court's Orders re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support , #8 Order Setting Hearing or Trial,, #4 Summons Issued Electronically, #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff DevIntent. (Williams, Jeffery)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen E.W. Hale on behalf of HeroDevs (Hale, Stephen)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan C. Williams on behalf of HeroDevs (Williams, Jonathan)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, no later than Monday, November 7, 2022 at 5:00 PM, why the court should not deny the Motion and dismiss this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Its response to this Order, Plaintiff should identify and allege the citizenship of the parties' members. If any of the parties' members, or sub-members, are unincorporated entities, Plaintiff's response to this Order should also identify those members' or sub-members' respective citizenship. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 11/3/22. (jl)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney R. Thomas Dunn for DevIntent.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 11/3/22. (jl)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING HEARING - Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2022 at 02:00 PM in Rm 3.100 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Ahead of the hearing, Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to do the following: 1. On or before Friday, November 4, 2022 at 4:00 PM, Plaintiff is to serve Defendant HeroDevs with copies of the following: The Complaint, Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, and this Order.2. On or before Monday, November 7, 2022 at 12:00 PM, Plaintiff is to file with the court proof of service that the Defendant was served with the aforementioned documents. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 11/3/22. (jl)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2022 at 2:00 PM in Rm 3.100 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. (mjm)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge Bruce S. Jenkins recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby for all further proceedings. Case Number will now read 2:22-cv-00698-RJS. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 11/3/2022. (nl)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrie L. Hollingworth on behalf of DevIntent (Hollingworth, Jeffrie)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to HeroDevs. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of R. Thomas Dunn , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4494592,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff DevIntent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Jeffery)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff DevIntent LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of R. Thomas Dunn, #2 Affidavit of Kiimberley A. Train)(Williams, Jeffery)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order to be filed separately against HeroDevs, LLC (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4494384) filed by DevIntent LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit of Kimberley A. Train, #3 Affidavit of Thomas R. Dunn, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10) (Williams, Jeffery)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Bruce S. Jenkins added. Case number will now read 2:22-cv-00698- BSJ. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DevIntent v. HeroDevs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DevIntent
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Williams
Represented By: Jeffrie L. Hollingworth
Represented By: R. Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HeroDevs
Represented By: Jonathan C. Williams
Represented By: Stephen E.W. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?