Newpath Mutual Insurance v. Higgins et al
Plaintiff: Newpath Mutual Insurance
Defendant: Jessica Higgins, Robyn Lynn Sztyndor, Jarrod Wilson, Curated Fund of Funds, Curated Financial and Magellan Administration
Case Number: 2:2022cv00709
Filed: November 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Newpath Mutual Insurance as to Magellan Administration Waiver sent on 11/17/2022, answer due 1/17/2023. (Nelson, Mark)
November 30, 2022 Filing 11 RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Plaintiff Newpath Mutual Insurance. (alf)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Benjamin J. Lewis for Newpath Mutual Insurance.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 11/29/22 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
November 28, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin J. Lewis , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4515640,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Newpath Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Nelson, Mark)
November 15, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jarrod Wilson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks)
November 15, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Robyn Lynn Sztyndor. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks)
November 15, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jessica Higgins. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2022: #1 Summons Jessica Higgins) (ks).
November 9, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Newpath Mutual Insurance. (Nelson, Mark)
November 9, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah is available to conduct proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. The magistrate judge may preside over this case only after the relevant parties voluntarily sign and return the Consent Form. To have a magistrate judge preside over this case, please complete and return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not e-file the Consent Form in the case docket. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Newpath Mutual Insurance. (Notice generated by Court) Form due by 11/30/2022. (ks)
November 9, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Benjamin J Lewis, for Plaintiff Newpath Mutual Insurance (ks)
November 9, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Curated Financial, Curated Fund of Funds, Jessica Higgins, Magellan Administration, Robyn Lynn Sztyndor, Jarrod Wilson (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4501838) filed by Newpath Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Jessica Higgins Bio, #3 Exhibit 2 - Florida Referee Acceptance of Consent Judgment, #4 Exhibit 3 - Florida Supreme Court Order of Public Reprimand and Probation, #5 Exhibit 4 - Sztyndor Website, #6 Exhibit 5 - Higgins Instagram Post, #7 Exhibit 6 - The Remedy IV Health Wellness, #8 Exhibit 7 - About - Curate Invest, #9 Exhibit 8 - Burns Estate - Report of Special Administrator, #10 Exhibit 9 - 2/12/21 Newpath Certificate of Public Good, #11 Exhibit 10 - 2/12/21 Newpath Articles of Incorporation, #12 Exhibit 11 - 3/22/21 Newpath Certificate of Authority, #13 Exhibit 12 - 2/24/21 Newpath Action by Board of Directors, #14 Exhibit 13 - 3/9/21 NMIC Surplus Note from Redirect, #15 Exhibit 14 - 2/17/21 Bylaws, #16 Exhibit 15 - 10/18/18 WSJ SEC Charges Financier with Fraud, #17 Exhibit 16 - 3/21/15 WSJ Investigators Sift Rubble of Fallen Financier Empire, #18 Exhibit 17 - 10/16/18 SEC v Burns Complaint, #19 Exhibit 18 - 2/14/22 Correspondence of Special Administrator, #20 Exhibit 19 - 1/17/22 Special Administrator Correspondence to Higgins, #21 Exhibit 20 - 1/21/22 Resolutions of Continuum and York, #22 Exhibit 21 - 2/10/22 Higgins Cease and Desist, #23 Exhibit 22 - 1/1/21 York Magellen Contribution Agreement, #24 Exhibit 23 - 1/1/22 Megellan Newpath Mutual Amendment, #25 Exhibit 24 - 9/30/20 Magellan Newpath Mutual Administrative Services Agreement, #26 Exhibit 25 - 10/17/22 Suspension Letter to Higgins, #27 Exhibit 26 - 8/18/22 Written Consent of the Board of Directors to Action) (Nelson, Mark)
November 9, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Plaintiff Newpath Mutual Insurance is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402. by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newpath Mutual Insurance v. Higgins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newpath Mutual Insurance
Represented By: Andrew V. Wright
Represented By: Mark R. Nelson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn Lynn Sztyndor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrod Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curated Fund of Funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curated Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magellan Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?